Simmons v. Managed Care of North America, Inc.

Plaintiff: Karen Simmons
Defendant: Managed Care of North America, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2019cv60359
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
0 Judge: Alicia O Valle
1 Judge: Kathleen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12182
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 3/16/2020 in Miami Division before Judge Kathleen M. Williams. Calendar Call set for 3/10/2020 11:00 AM before Judge Kathleen M. Williams. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 4/1/2019. See attached document for full details. (cds) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
April 1, 2019 Filing 13 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Karen Simmons (Horowitz, Max)
March 12, 2019 Filing 12 Defendant's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Managed Care of North America, Inc.. Attorney Kenneth Mark Rehns added to party Managed Care of North America, Inc. (pty:dft). (Rehns, Kenneth)
March 4, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re 9 Order to Show Cause,, by Karen Simmons. (Horowitz, Max)
March 4, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of Counsel re #6 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge,, Notice of Court Practice,, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings, Regarding Prior Filings Under the ADA by Max Lloyd Horowitz on behalf of Karen Simmons (Horowitz, Max)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PAPERLESS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. On February 11, 2019, the Court issued an order #6 requiring Plaintiff to file a verified statement with the Court by March 1, 2019. The order states that "[n]on-compliance with any provision of this Order... may subject the offending party to sanctions, including dismissal of this case." #6 . To date, Plaintiff has not filed a verified statement. Accordingly, it is ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that Plaintiff shall SHOW CAUSE by March 5, 2019 at 5:00pm why sanctions should not be imposed for failure to comply with a Court order. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 3/4/2019. (jws)
February 14, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Managed Care of North America, Inc.(lbc)
February 13, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Karen Simmons (Georges-Pierre, Anthony)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle for Pretrial Non-Dispositive Matters., Notice of Court Practice IN ADA CASES re Setting Discovery Procedures, ( Responses due by 3/1/2019) Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 2/11/2019. See attached document for full details. (cds)
February 11, 2019 Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres no longer assigned to case. (asl)
February 11, 2019 Filing 5 Clerks Notice of Docket Correction re #4 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge,, Notice of Court Practice,. Document Restricted Due to Error. (asl)
February 11, 2019 Filing 4 Document restricted due to error per 5 Clerks Notice of Correction Modified on 2/11/2019 (asl).
February 8, 2019 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Summons(es) cannot be issued. Summons NOT issued for the following reason - Please Use Form AO 440. (cds)
February 8, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Kathleen M. Williams. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (cds)
February 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Managed Care of North America, Inc.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11381717, filed by Karen Simmons. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Georges-Pierre, Anthony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simmons v. Managed Care of North America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Managed Care of North America, Inc.
Represented By: Kenneth Mark Rehns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Simmons
Represented By: Anthony Maximillien Georges-Pierre
Represented By: Max Lloyd Horowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?