Van Ryn v. Commissioner Of Social Security

Plaintiff: Andrew Van Ryn
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security, US attorney and Attorney General
Case Number: 0:2019cv60379
Filed: February 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Beth Bloom
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:0416
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by U.S. Marshal for Attorney General served on 3/25/2019, answer due 5/24/2019. (mee)
March 26, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by U.S. Marshal for Commissioner of Social Security served on 3/19/2019, answer due 5/20/2019. (mee)
March 14, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by U.S. Marshal for US attorney served on 3/14/2019, answer due 5/13/2019. (mee)
February 21, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (cqs)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. USM Service ordered . Summonses provided for issuance by Clerk for USM Service. Re: #1 Complaint, filed by Andrew Van Ryn. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
February 19, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION TO PROCEED in forma pauperis / AFFIDAVIT in Support re #4 Order, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings, Terminate Motions to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Andrew Van Ryn. (Goetz, David) Modified on 2/21/2019 (ch1)per chambers.
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE: #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Andrew Van Ryn. ( Motion due by 2/20/2019.) Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 2/12/2019. See attached document for full details. (cds)
February 12, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Andrew Van Ryn. (cds)
February 12, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Beth Bloom. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (cds)
February 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Denial of Social Security Benefits against Nancy A Berryhill. Filing fees $ 400.00. IFP Filed, filed by Andrew Van Ryn. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s) Region IV, #3 Summon(s) Fort Lauderdale US Attorney's Office, #4 Summon(s) Attorney General of USA, #5 Affidavit IFP Application)(Goetz, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Van Ryn v. Commissioner Of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Van Ryn
Represented By: David B. Goetz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Noticing Social Security US Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?