Argo Holdings, Inc. et al v. Youngblood Skin Care Products, LLC

Plaintiff: Solu-Med, Inc. and Argo Holdings, Inc.
Defendant: Youngblood Skin Care Products, LLC
Case Number: 0:2019cv60487
Filed: February 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Roy K Altman
Referring Judge: Marcia G Cooke
2 Judge: Patrick M Hunt
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2019 Filing 23 RESPONSE in Opposition re #18 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #1 Complaint, filed by Argo Holdings, Inc., Solu-Med, Inc.. Replies due by 4/26/2019. (Black, Kelsey)
April 16, 2019 Filing 22 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Argo Holdings, Inc., Solu-Med, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Black, Kelsey)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT to Judge Roy K Altman for all further proceedings. Judge Marcia G. Cooke no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 04/11/2019. See attached document for full details. (yar)
April 10, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings as to #18 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #1 Complaint, . Responses due by 4/22/2019. per DE 20 (cbr)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ENDORSED ORDER granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiffs must respond to the Motion to Dismiss by April 22, 2019. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 4/10/2019. (chd)
April 9, 2019 Filing 19 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to Defendant's motion to dismiss re #18 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #1 Complaint, by Argo Holdings, Inc., Solu-Med, Inc.. Responses due by 4/23/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Black, Kelsey)
April 1, 2019 Filing 18 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #1 Complaint, by Youngblood Skin Care Products, LLC. Responses due by 4/15/2019 (Vine, S.)
March 20, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by S. Jonathan Vine on behalf of Youngblood Skin Care Products, LLC (Vine, S.)
March 20, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by S. Jonathan Vine on behalf of Youngblood Skin Care Products, LLC. Attorney S. Jonathan Vine added to party Youngblood Skin Care Products, LLC(pty:dft). (Vine, S.)
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ENDORSED ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to a Complaint. Defendant Youngblood Skin Care Products, LLC must respond to the Complaint by 4/10/2019. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 3/20/2019. (chd)
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney(s) Stanley Goodman. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt on 3/20/2019. (sl00)
March 19, 2019 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Stanley Goodman. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11488840 by Argo Holdings, Inc., Solu-Med, Inc.. Responses due by 4/2/2019 (Attachments: #1 Certification of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Black, Kelsey)
March 15, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE by Youngblood Skin Care Products, LLC re #11 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint, Filing of Proposed Order (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Robinson, Ian)
March 13, 2019 Filing 11 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint, by Youngblood Skin Care Products, LLC. (Robinson, Ian)
March 13, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ian Eldredge Robinson on behalf of Youngblood Skin Care Products, LLC. Attorney Ian Eldredge Robinson added to party Youngblood Skin Care Products, LLC(pty:dft). (Robinson, Ian)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 GENERAL ORDER ON DISCOVERY OBJECTIONS AND PROCEDURES BEFORE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE PATRICK M. HUNT. The parties should carefully review the Order in that it requires expedited briefing, provides for modified page limitations and special conferral requirements before a motion is filed, limits the type of permissible discovery objections as well as modifying other discovery procedures. See attached document for full details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt on 3/7/2019. (sl00)
March 6, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Argo Holdings, Inc., Solu-Med, Inc.. Youngblood Skin Care Products, LLC served on 2/28/2019, answer due 3/21/2019. (Black, Kelsey)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF REFERRAL AND ORDER REGARDING COURT PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES. Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt for Pretrial Non-Dispositive Matters; Notice re Joint Motions; Expedited Service Deadline 5/6/2019. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 3/6/2019. See attached document for full details. (chd)
February 27, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Solu-Med, Inc. (Black, Kelsey)
February 27, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Argo Holdings, Inc. (Black, Kelsey)
February 23, 2019 Filing 4 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Venue on the Civil Cover Sheet does not match the initiating document. The Clerks Office confirmed Broward (Office as the county with the filer. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (mee)
February 23, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Youngblood Skin Care Products, LLC. (mee)
February 23, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Marcia G. Cooke. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (mee)
February 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Youngblood Skin Care Products, LLC. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11418672, filed by Argo Holdings, Inc., Solu-Med, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7)(Black, Kelsey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Argo Holdings, Inc. et al v. Youngblood Skin Care Products, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Solu-Med, Inc.
Represented By: Kelsey K Black
Represented By: Stanley Goodman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Argo Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Kelsey K Black
Represented By: Stanley Goodman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Youngblood Skin Care Products, LLC
Represented By: Ryan M. Ranson
Represented By: Ian Eldredge Robinson
Represented By: S. Jonathan Vine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?