Deane et al v. Crane Co. et al
Plaintiff: Nancy A Deane, Estate of Sydney P. Deane and Nancy Deane
Defendant: Crane Pumps and Systems, Inc. and Crane Co.
Case Number: 0:2019cv60522
Filed: February 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: William P Dimitrouleas
Referring Judge: Lurana S Snow
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 25, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Mediator Selection. Added Nancy Deane. (Vinocur, Rebecca)
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 GENERAL ORDER ON DISCOVERY OBJECTIONS AND PROCEDURES signed by Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow on 4/19/2019. (jz)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE & DISCOVERY DEADLINES, REFERRING CASE TO MEDIATION & REFERRING DISCOVERY MOTIONS TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: ( Jury Trial set for 2/3/2020 in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge William P. Dimitrouleas., Calendar Call set for 1/31/2020 10:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge William P. Dimitrouleas.) Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 4/11/2019. See attached document for full details. (kpe) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
April 10, 2019 Filing 8 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Crane Co., Crane Pumps and Systems, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Simonitsch, William)
March 13, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Crane Pumps and Systems, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Crane Co. for Crane Pumps and Systems, Inc. (McGuinness, Stephen)
March 13, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Crane Co. (McGuinness, Stephen)
March 6, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by Crane Pumps and Systems, Inc.. (McGuinness, Stephen)
March 6, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by Crane Co.. (McGuinness, Stephen)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REQUIRING COUNSEL TO MEET, FILE JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT AND JOINT DISCOVERY REPORT. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 2/28/2019. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
February 27, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge William P. Dimitrouleas and Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (kpe)
February 27, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint (Wrongful Death) ad Demand for Jury Trial) Filing fee $400.00. IFP Filed, filed by Crane Pumps and Systems, Inc., Crane Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Simonitsch, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Deane et al v. Crane Co. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Pumps and Systems, Inc.
Represented By: William John Simonitsch
Represented By: Stephen Allan McGuinness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co.
Represented By: William John Simonitsch
Represented By: Stephen Allan McGuinness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy A Deane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Sydney P. Deane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Deane
Represented By: Rebecca Shull Vinocur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?