Complete Business Solutions Group, Inc. v. Business Capital, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Complete Business Solutions, Inc. and Complete Business Solutions Group, Inc.
Defendant: Business Capital, LLC, HSI Capital, LLC, Main Street Capital Group, LLC, 24 Hour Capital, Inc., Pershin Capital Solutions, LLC, Tzvi Pershin, Commonwealth Merchant Advance, Inc., MP RE 770, LLC, Twenty Four-Seven Capital, Inc., Sovereign Health of Texas, Inc., Tonmoy Sharma, Vedenta Laboratories, Inc., Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc., Sovereign Health of Florida, Inc., Shreya Health of Arizona, Inc., Shreya Health of Florida, Inc., Kingsman Insurance Company, Inc., Shreya Health of California, John Doe(s) #1-100, Fox Capital Group, LLC, Shreya Health of Texas, Inc., Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc. and Grimble & Loguidice, LLC
Case Number: 0:2019cv60542
Filed: February 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Beth Bloom
Referring Judge: Alicia O Valle
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE. All pending motions are denied as MOOT and all deadlines are TERMINATED. The Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE this case. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 4/17/2019. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
April 17, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Complete Business Solutions Group, Inc. (Liss, Michael)
April 17, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael J. Liss on behalf of Complete Business Solutions Group, Inc.. Attorney Michael J. Liss added to party Complete Business Solutions Group, Inc.(pty:pla). (Liss, Michael)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER REQUIRING RESPONSE TO MOTION re #16 Motion.( Responses due by 4/18/2019) Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 4/11/2019. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 4/5/2019. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER ON MOTION TO DISMISS. Order granting #11 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 4/5/2019. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REQUIRING RESPONSE TO #11 MOTION.( Responses due by 4/3/2019). Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 3/29/2019. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
March 28, 2019 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Business Capital, LLC re #16 First MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal with Prejudice #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), (Storfer, Richard)
March 27, 2019 Filing 16 First MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal with Prejudice #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), by Business Capital, LLC. Responses due by 4/10/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E)(Storfer, Richard)
March 27, 2019 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Grimble & Loguidice, LLC (Slade, Roger)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to File Corporate Disclosure Statement by March 27, 2019. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
March 27, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Corporate Disclosure Statement by Grimble & Loguidice, LLC. Responses due by 4/10/2019 (Slade, Roger)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: ( Amended Pleadings due by 5/26/2019., Discovery due by 10/8/2019., Expert Discovery due by 10/8/2019., Joinder of Parties due by 5/26/2019., Mediation Deadline 10/22/2019., In Limine Motions due by 10/30/2019., Dispositive Motions due by 10/30/2019., Motions due by 10/30/2019., Pretrial Stipulation due by 1/21/2020., Jury Trial set for 2/3/2020 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Beth Bloom., Calendar Call set for 1/28/2020 01:45 PM in Miami Division before Judge Beth Bloom.), ( Mediation Deadline 10/22/2019.) Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 3/27/2019. See attached document for full details. (kpe) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
March 14, 2019 Filing 11 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal with Prejudice #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), by Grimble & Loguidice, LLC. Attorney Roger Slade added to party Grimble & Loguidice, LLC (pty:dft). Responses due by 3/28/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Slade, Roger)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorneys Mendy Menachem Piekarski and Todd J. Manister. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
March 7, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE by 24 Hour Capital, Inc., Business Capital, LLC, Commonwealth Merchant Advance, Inc., HSI Capital, LLC, MP RE 770, LLC, Main Street Capital Group, LLC, Pershin Capital Solutions, LLC, Twenty Four-Seven Capital, Inc., Tzvi Pershin of Defendants who have Joined in or Consented to Removal (Storfer, Richard)
March 7, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Mendy Menachem Piekarski and Todd J. Manister. Filing Fee $ 150.00 Receipt # 113C-11453691 by 24 Hour Capital, Inc., Business Capital, LLC, Commonwealth Merchant Advance, Inc., HSI Capital, LLC, MP RE 770, LLC, Main Street Capital Group, LLC, Pershin Capital Solutions, LLC, Twenty Four-Seven Capital, Inc., Tzvi Pershin. Responses due by 3/21/2019 (Storfer, Richard)
March 7, 2019 Reset Deadlines 24 Hour Capital, Inc. answer due 3/27/2019; Business Capital, LLC answer due 3/27/2019; Commonwealth Merchant Advance, Inc. answer due 3/27/2019; HSI Capital, LLC answer due 3/27/2019; Pershin Capital Solutions, LLC answer due 3/27/2019; Twenty Four-Seven Capital, Inc. answer due 3/27/2019 Per DE#7. (cqs)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to Complaint by March 27, 2019. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
March 6, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), by 24 Hour Capital, Inc., Business Capital, LLC, Commonwealth Merchant Advance, Inc., HSI Capital, LLC, MP RE 770, LLC, Main Street Capital Group, LLC, Pershin Capital Solutions, LLC, Twenty Four-Seven Capital, Inc., Tzvi Pershin. (Storfer, Richard)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER ON POST-REMOVAL PROCEDURES, AND REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES( Joint Scheduling Report due by 3/25/2019), (Defendants' response due 3/7/2019) (Motion to Remand due by 4/1/2019.) Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 3/4/2019. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
March 1, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Richard Bernard Storfer on behalf of 24 Hour Capital, Inc., Business Capital, LLC, Commonwealth Merchant Advance, Inc., HSI Capital, LLC, MP RE 770, LLC, Main Street Capital Group, LLC, Pershin Capital Solutions, LLC, Twenty Four-Seven Capital, Inc., Tzvi Pershin (Storfer, Richard)
March 1, 2019 Filing 3 Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Sheldon J. Burnett, mailing date March 1, 2019, (pt)
February 28, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Beth Bloom. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (kpe)
February 28, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint for Damages) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11435482, filed by Pershin Capital Solutions, LLC, Main Street Capital Group, LLC, MP RE 770, LLC, Commonwealth Merchant Advance, Inc., Business Capital, LLC, HSI Capital, LLC, 24 Hour Capital, Inc., Tzvi Pershin, Twenty Four-Seven Capital, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Pugatch, Craig)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Complete Business Solutions Group, Inc. v. Business Capital, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Business Capital, LLC
Represented By: Craig Pugatch
Represented By: Mendy Menachem Piekarski
Represented By: Todd J. Manister
Represented By: Richard Bernard Storfer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSI Capital, LLC
Represented By: Craig Pugatch
Represented By: Mendy Menachem Piekarski
Represented By: Todd J. Manister
Represented By: Richard Bernard Storfer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Main Street Capital Group, LLC
Represented By: Craig Pugatch
Represented By: Mendy Menachem Piekarski
Represented By: Todd J. Manister
Represented By: Richard Bernard Storfer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 24 Hour Capital, Inc.
Represented By: Craig Pugatch
Represented By: Mendy Menachem Piekarski
Represented By: Todd J. Manister
Represented By: Richard Bernard Storfer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pershin Capital Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Craig Pugatch
Represented By: Mendy Menachem Piekarski
Represented By: Todd J. Manister
Represented By: Richard Bernard Storfer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tzvi Pershin
Represented By: Craig Pugatch
Represented By: Mendy Menachem Piekarski
Represented By: Todd J. Manister
Represented By: Richard Bernard Storfer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commonwealth Merchant Advance, Inc.
Represented By: Craig Pugatch
Represented By: Mendy Menachem Piekarski
Represented By: Todd J. Manister
Represented By: Richard Bernard Storfer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MP RE 770, LLC
Represented By: Craig Pugatch
Represented By: Mendy Menachem Piekarski
Represented By: Todd J. Manister
Represented By: Richard Bernard Storfer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Twenty Four-Seven Capital, Inc.
Represented By: Craig Pugatch
Represented By: Mendy Menachem Piekarski
Represented By: Todd J. Manister
Represented By: Richard Bernard Storfer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sovereign Health of Texas, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tonmoy Sharma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vedenta Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sovereign Health of Florida, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shreya Health of Arizona, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shreya Health of Florida, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kingsman Insurance Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shreya Health of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe(s) #1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fox Capital Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shreya Health of Texas, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grimble & Loguidice, LLC
Represented By: Roger Slade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Complete Business Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Complete Business Solutions Group, Inc.
Represented By: Sheldon J Burnett
Represented By: Michael J. Liss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?