Snyder v. Coldwell Solar, Inc.

Plaintiff: Johnathan Snyder
Defendant: Coldwell Solar, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2019cv60562
Filed: March 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: William P Dimitrouleas
Referring Judge: Lurana S Snow
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 25, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Luger McManus on behalf of Coldwell Solar, Inc.. Attorney John Luger McManus added to party Coldwell Solar, Inc.(pty:dft). (McManus, John)
April 25, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Paul Bernard Ranis on behalf of Coldwell Solar, Inc.. Attorney Paul Bernard Ranis added to party Coldwell Solar, Inc.(pty:dft). (Ranis, Paul)
March 7, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Johnathan Snyder. Coldwell Solar, Inc. waiver sent on 3/1/2019, answer due 4/30/2019. (Richards, Jordan)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REQUIRING COUNSEL TO MEET, FILE JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT AND JOINT DISCOVERY REPORT. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 3/5/2019. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
March 4, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Coldwell Solar, Inc. (bb)
March 1, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge William P. Dimitrouleas and Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (bb)
March 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against Coldwell Solar, Inc.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11439368, filed by Johnathan Snyder. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s) Coldwell Solar, Inc.)(Richards, Jordan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Snyder v. Coldwell Solar, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coldwell Solar, Inc.
Represented By: John Luger McManus
Represented By: Paul Bernard Ranis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnathan Snyder
Represented By: Jordan Lee Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?