Garcia et al v. J & J, INC. et al
Plaintiff: Jose Garcia and Ledvin Alarcon
Defendant: John H Field, Janet S Field, J & J, INC. d/b/a EAGLE PAINTING, J & J, Inc. and J & J, Inc. a Florida corporation doing business as Eagle Painting
Case Number: 0:2019cv60728
Filed: March 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Beth Bloom
Referring Judge: Alicia O Valle
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:203
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 Filing 31 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle: Settlement Conference held on 7/11/2019. The case did not settle. Parties are at an impasse. Total time in court: 3 hour(s) : 30 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Valerie Barton Barnhart, Jorge Freddy Perera, Daniel R. Levine, (Digital 13:35:57) (tpl)
July 10, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE of Courtroom Assignment. The Settlement Conference scheduled on 7/11/2019 at 1:30pm before U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia Valle will be held in Courtroom 110 at the Federal Courthouse in Fort Lauderdale, FL. (tpl)
May 31, 2019 Filing 29 REPLY to Response to Motion re #21 Plaintiff's MOTION to Certify Class Motion for Conditional Certification (Corrected) filed by Ledvin Alarcon, Jose Garcia. (Perera, Jorge)
May 31, 2019 Filing 28 REPLY to Response to Motion re #21 Plaintiff's MOTION to Certify Class Motion for Conditional Certification filed by Ledvin Alarcon, Jose Garcia. (Perera, Jorge)
May 24, 2019 Filing 27 RESPONSE in Opposition re #21 Plaintiff's MOTION to Certify Class Motion for Conditional Certification filed by Janet S Field, John H Field, J & J, Inc.. Replies due by 5/31/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Levine, Daniel)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #25 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to #21 Plaintiff's Motion for Conditional Certification. Defendants shall file their response on or before May 24, 2019. Response due by 5/24/2019. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (ak03)
May 21, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #21 Plaintiff's MOTION to Certify Class Motion for Conditional Certification by Janet S Field, John H Field, J & J, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Levine, Daniel)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER SETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE IN FLSA CASE. Settlement Conference set for 7/11/2019 at 1:00 PM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle on 5/14/2019. See attached document for full details. (sd01)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Scheduling Mediation before Marlene Quintana Mediation Hearing set for 9/18/2019 10:00 AM Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 5/10/2019. See attached document for full details. (vmz)
May 10, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Mediator Selection and Hearing. Added Ledvin Alarcon, Jose Garcia, Marlene Quintana. Mediation Hearing set for 9/18/2019 at 10:00 a.m.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Barnhart, Valerie)
May 7, 2019 Filing 21 Plaintiff's MOTION to Certify Class Motion for Conditional Certification by Ledvin Alarcon, Jose Garcia. Responses due by 5/21/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Perera, Jorge)
May 3, 2019 Filing 20 Defendant's RESPONSE to #5 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report,, Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge, 19 Order on Motion for Extension of Time, #9 Statement by Janet S Field, John H Field, J & J, Inc.. (Levine, Daniel)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time to file response to Plaintiffs' statement of claim by May 3, 2019. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
April 29, 2019 Filing 18 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to file response to plaintiffs' statement of claim re #5 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report,, Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge, #9 Statement by Janet S Field, John H Field, J & J, Inc.. Responses due by 5/13/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Levine, Daniel)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Order Setting Trial And Pretrial Schedule, Requiring Mediation, And Referring Certain Matters To Magistrate Judge : ( Amended Pleadings due by 6/24/2019., Discovery due by 10/8/2019., Expert Discovery due by 10/8/2019., Joinder of Parties due by 6/24/2019., Mediation Deadline 10/22/2019., In Limine Motions due by 10/30/2019., Dispositive Motions due by 10/30/2019., Motions due by 10/30/2019., Pretrial Stipulation due by 1/20/2020., Jury Trial set for 2/3/2020 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Beth Bloom., Calendar Call set for 1/28/2020 01:45 PM before Judge Beth Bloom.) Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 4/23/2019. See attached document for full details. (vmz) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
April 24, 2019 Filing 16 Clerks Notice of Docket Correction re #15 ORDER Scheduling Mediation. Document Filed in Wrong Case; Document restricted and docket text modified. Document refiled in correct case # 19cv60118. (vmz)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Scheduling Mediation before David H. Lichter Mediation Hearing set for 8/28/2019 10:00 AM Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 4/23/2019. See attached document for full details. (vmz)
April 23, 2019 Filing 14 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Janet S Field, John H Field, J & J, Inc. (Levine, Daniel)
April 17, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Janet S Field, John H Field, J & J, Inc.. (Levine, Daniel)
April 17, 2019 Filing 12 Certificate of Other Affiliates by Ledvin Alarcon, Jose Garcia (Shulman, Brody)
April 17, 2019 Filing 11 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by Ledvin Alarcon, Jose Garcia (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shulman, Brody)
April 8, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Compliance with Court Order [D.E. 5] by Ledvin Alarcon, Jose Garcia (Barnhart, Valerie)
April 8, 2019 Filing 9 Statement of: Statement Of Claim by Ledvin Alarcon (Perera, Jorge)
April 5, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by Valerie Barton Barnhart on behalf of Ledvin Alarcon, Jose Garcia (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Barnhart, Valerie)
April 4, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brody Max Shulman on behalf of Ledvin Alarcon, Jose Garcia. Attorney Brody Max Shulman added to party Ledvin Alarcon(pty:pla), Attorney Brody Max Shulman added to party Jose Garcia(pty:pla). (Shulman, Brody)
April 1, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daniel R. Levine on behalf of Janet S Field, John H Field, J & J, Inc.. Attorney Daniel R. Levine added to party Janet S Field(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel R. Levine added to party John H Field(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel R. Levine added to party J & J, Inc.(pty:dft). (Levine, Daniel)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT, CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES, AND STATEMENT OF CLAIM AND RESPONSE IN FLSA CASE, referring case to Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle for Settlement. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 3/21/2019. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
March 21, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Valerie Barton Barnhart on behalf of Ledvin Alarcon, Jose Garcia (Barnhart, Valerie)
March 21, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (jao)
March 20, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Beth Bloom. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jao)
March 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11491776, filed by Jose Garcia, Ledvin Alarcon. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s), #4 Summon(s))(Perera, Jorge)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garcia et al v. J & J, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Garcia
Represented By: Jorge Freddy Perera
Represented By: Brody Max Shulman
Represented By: Valerie Barton Barnhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ledvin Alarcon
Represented By: Jorge Freddy Perera
Represented By: Brody Max Shulman
Represented By: Valerie Barton Barnhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John H Field
Represented By: Daniel R. Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janet S Field
Represented By: Daniel R. Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J & J, INC. d/b/a EAGLE PAINTING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J & J, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel R. Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J & J, Inc. a Florida corporation doing business as Eagle Painting
Represented By: Daniel R. Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?