Churba v. Esquenazi
Plaintiff: Aaron Churba
Defendant: Internal Revenue Service and Denise Esquenazi
Case Number: 0:2019cv60793
Filed: March 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Kenneth A Marra
Nature of Suit: Tax Suits: IRS-Third Party
Cause of Action: 26:7609
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #11 Motion for Substitution of Counsel. Attorney Kari Powell terminated. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 7/12/2019. (ir)
July 12, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATED MOTION for Substitution of Counsel. Substituting Amanda J. Swietlik for Kari A.R. Powell by Denise Esquenazi. Attorney Amanda J. Swietlik added to party Denise Esquenazi(pty:dft). Responses due by 7/26/2019 (Swietlik, Amanda)
July 8, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Petition (Complaint) to Quash/Enforce IRS Summons FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Aaron Churba. Replies due by 7/15/2019. (Berger, Evan)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to #7 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Petition (Complaint) to Quash/Enforce IRS Summons FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Denise Esquenazi. Responses due by 7/8/2019. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 6/25/2019. (ir)
June 24, 2019 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #7 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Petition (Complaint) to Quash/Enforce IRS Summons FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Aaron Churba. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Berger, Evan)
June 10, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Petition (Complaint) to Quash/Enforce IRS Summons FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Denise Esquenazi. Attorney Kari Powell added to party Denise Esquenazi(pty:dft). Responses due by 6/24/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Declaration of Revenue Agent)(Powell, Kari)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to Judge Kenneth A. Marra for all further proceedings, accepted and signed on 4/5/2019. Judge Jose E. Martinez no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 4/5/2019. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 4/5/2019. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
March 29, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Denise Esquenazi. (jas)
March 28, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT signed by : Evan Berger. of Service of Certain Documents by Certified Mail by Aaron Churba (Berger, Evan)
March 28, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) Denise Esquenazi, a Revenue Agent of the Internal Revenue Service c/o Ariana Fajardo Orshan, United States Attorney for the Southern District of Florida by Aaron Churba (Berger, Evan)
March 26, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Jose E. Martinez. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ebz)
March 26, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION (Complaint) to Quash IRS Summons to Bank United. Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11507234, filed by Aaron Churba. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A", #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Berger, Evan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Churba v. Esquenazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Internal Revenue Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denise Esquenazi
Represented By: Amanda J. Swietlik
Represented By: Kari Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Churba
Represented By: Evan Benjamin Berger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?