Churba v. Denise Esquenazi
Plaintiff: Aaron Churba
Defendant: Internal Revenue Service and Denise Esquenazi
Case Number: 0:2019cv60794
Filed: March 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Kenneth A Marra
Nature of Suit: Tax Suits: IRS-Third Party
Cause of Action: 26:7609
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2019 Cases associated per #7 Order. (asl)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Consolidating Cases. Closing Case. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 4/8/2019. See attached document for full details. (drz) Modified on 4/9/2019 (drz). All further documents to be docketed in consolidated case# 19-CV-60793.
March 28, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Denise Esquenazi. (kpe)
March 28, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT signed by : Evan Berger. of Service of Certain Documents by Certified Mail by Aaron Churba (Berger, Evan)
March 28, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) to Denise Esquenazi, a Revenue Agent of the Internal Revenue Service c/o Ariana Fajardo Orshan, United States Attorney for the Southern District of Florida by Aaron Churba (Berger, Evan)
March 27, 2019 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Party(ies) Improperly Formatted. The Filer failed to enter the party name(s) in accordance with the CM/ECF Format for Adding Parties for Attorneys Guide. The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file the document. (drz)
March 26, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Kenneth A. Marra. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (drz)
March 26, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION (Complaint) to Quash IRS Summons to Regions Bank. Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11507350, filed by Aaron Churba. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A", #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Berger, Evan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Churba v. Denise Esquenazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Internal Revenue Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denise Esquenazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Churba
Represented By: Evan Benjamin Berger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?