Meyer et al v. Suitable Movers, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Emma Meyer, Melissa H Meyer and The Eyeglass Lady LLC
Defendant: Suitable Movers, LLC, Raymond Charles Wells, Carlyle Van Lines, Inc., Vanliner Insurance Company and Jaimie Perez
Case Number: 0:2019cv60816
Filed: March 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Roy K Altman
Referring Judge: Patrick M Hunt
2 Judge: Ursula Ungaro
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 49:11707
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Filing 122 RESPONSE in Opposition re #116 Amended MOTION for Protective Order filed by Raymond Charles Wells filed by Emma Meyer, Melissa H Meyer, The Eyeglass Lady LLC. Replies due by 7/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Emails reflecting deposition of Raymond Charles Wells has not been set, #2 Exhibit February 4, 2019 certified statutory disclosure letter to Raymond Charles Wells with receipt, #3 Exhibit February 11, 2019 civil theft letter to Raymond Charles Wells, #4 Exhibit February 20, 2019 letter to Raymond Charles Wells with letter from Joseph Barnosky and Appendix A)(Deutsch, Roberta)
July 12, 2019 Filing 121 Plaintiff's MOTION to Bring Electronic Equipment into the courtroom at the evidentiary hearing on Friday, July 19, 2019 by Emma Meyer, Melissa H Meyer, The Eyeglass Lady LLC. Responses due by 7/26/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Electronic Device Manifest for Patrick Levy, Category 3 Legal Media, #2 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave Seeking Court Permission to Bring Electronic Devices into Courtroom for Evidentiary Hearing on Friday, July 19, 2019)(Deutsch, Roberta)
July 11, 2019 Filing 120 NOTICE by Raymond Charles Wells re #116 Amended MOTION for Protective Order of Filing Proposed Order (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Cohen, Stuart) Modified Text on 7/12/2019 (ls).
July 11, 2019 Filing 119 Clerks Notice to Filer re #117 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #96 Plaintiff's MOTION for Sanctions under Rule 11, Fed. R. Civ. P. Attaching Defendants Response #112 and referencing Plaintiffs Motion to Strike #114 and m. Motion with Multiple Reliefs Filed as One Relief; ERROR - The Filer selected only one relief event and failed to select the additional corresponding events for each relief requested in the motion. The docket entry was corrected by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but future filings must comply with the instructions in the CM/ECF Attorney User's Manual. (ls)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 118 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #115 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt on 7/9/2019. (hhr)
July 10, 2019 Filing 117 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #96 Plaintiff's MOTION for Sanctions under Rule 11, Fed. R. Civ. P. by Carlyle Van Lines, Inc., Jaimie Perez, Suitable Movers, LLC, Vanliner Insurance Company, Raymond Charles Wells. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Affidavit, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Dwyer, Jeffrey). Added MOTION for Leave to File/Permit Late Filing due to Excusable Neglect on 7/11/2019 (ls).
July 9, 2019 Filing 116 Amended MOTION for Protective Order by Raymond Charles Wells. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Cohen, Stuart) Modified Text on 7/12/2019 (ls).
July 9, 2019 Filing 115 Amended MOTION for Extension of Time To Answer Discovery Without Objection re #101 MOTION for Extension of Time To Respond to Discovery by Carlyle Van Lines, Inc., Vanliner Insurance Company. Responses due by 7/23/2019 (McMahon, James)
July 9, 2019 Filing 114 Plaintiff's MOTION to Strike Defendants' Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Rule 11 Sanctions as Untimely under Local Rule 7.1 (c) and Granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Rule 11 Sanctions by Emma Meyer, Melissa H Meyer, The Eyeglass Lady LLC. Responses due by 7/23/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Defendants' Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Moion for Rule 11 Sanctions as Untimely Under Local Rule 7.1(c) and Granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Rule 11 Sanctions)(Deutsch, Roberta)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 113 PAPERLESS ORDER striking #99 Motion for Protective Order, #101 Motion for Extension of Time without prejudice for failure to comply with ECF No. #49 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt on 7/9/2019. (hhr)
July 8, 2019 Filing 112 RESPONSE in Opposition re #96 Plaintiff's MOTION for Sanctions under Rule 11, Fed. R. Civ. P. filed by Carlyle Van Lines, Inc., Jaimie Perez, Suitable Movers, LLC, Vanliner Insurance Company, Raymond Charles Wells. Replies due by 7/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit)(Dwyer, Jeffrey) Modified Text on 7/9/2019 (ls).
July 8, 2019 Filing 111 REPLY to Response to Motion re #99 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Raymond Charles Wells. (Cohen, Stuart)
July 3, 2019 Filing 110 NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY by Jaimie Perez, Suitable Movers, LLC for dates of July 15-17, 2019 and July 23-29, 2019 and August 5-7, 2019 (Dwyer, Jeffrey)
July 2, 2019 Filing 109 NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY by Raymond Charles Wells for dates of August 11-14, 2019 and August 29-30, 2019 (Cohen, Stuart)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 108 PAPERLESS ORDER denying #104 Motion to Appear Telephonically at Evidentiary Hearing; and denying #106 Motion to Appear Telephonically at Evidentiary Hearing. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 7/1/2019. (vve)
July 1, 2019 Filing 107 REPLY to Response to Motion re #101 MOTION for Extension of Time To Respond to Discovery filed by Carlyle Van Lines, Inc., Vanliner Insurance Company. (McMahon, James)
July 1, 2019 Filing 106 Amended MOTION to allow Mulberry, AR Police Officer Thell Riddle to Appear Telephonically at Evidentiary Hearing on July 19, 2019 by Emma Meyer, Melissa H Meyer, The Eyeglass Lady LLC. (Deutsch, Roberta)
July 1, 2019 Filing 105 NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY by Carlyle Van Lines, Inc., Vanliner Insurance Company for dates of July 25-30, 2019 (McMahon, James)
June 30, 2019 Filing 104 Plaintiff's MOTION to allow Mulberry, AR Police Officer to Appear Telephonically at Evidentiary Hearing on July 19, 2019 by Emma Meyer, Melissa H Meyer, The Eyeglass Lady LLC. (Deutsch, Roberta)
June 30, 2019 Filing 103 RESPONSE in Opposition re #101 MOTION for Extension of Time To Respond to Discovery filed by Emma Meyer, Melissa H Meyer, The Eyeglass Lady LLC. Replies due by 7/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit February 4, 2019 statutory disclosure letter to Carlyle Van Lines, Inc., #2 Exhibit February 11, 2019 civil thef letter to Carlyle Van Lines, Inc., #3 Exhibit February 20, 2019 letter to Carlyle Van Lines, Inc., with Appendix A, #4 Exhibit First Set of Interrogatories to Carlyle Van Lines, Inc., and Vanliner Insurance Company, #5 Exhibit First Request for Production to Carlyle Van Lines, Inc., and Vanliner Insurance Company, #6 Exhibit Second Request for Production to Carlyle Van Lines, Inc,. and Vanliner Insurance Company, #7 Exhibit June 20, 2019 Request for Extension of Time from Carlyle Van Lines, Inc., and Vanliner Insurance Company, #8 Exhibit Email to Plaintiffs resulting in unnecessary Amended First Set of Interrogatories to Vanliner Insurance Company for incorrect name in title and definitions and in the body of one interrogatory)(Deutsch, Roberta) Modified Text on 7/1/2019 (ls).
June 29, 2019 Filing 102 RESPONSE in Opposition re #99 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Emma Meyer, Melissa H Meyer, The Eyeglass Lady LLC. Replies due by 7/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Unsuccessful attempts to schedule deposition of Raymond Charles Wells, #2 Exhibit February 4, 2019 statutory discosure letter to Raymond Charles Wells with certified receipt, #3 Exhibit February 11, 2019 letter to Raymond Charles Wells (receipt filing separately), #4 Exhibit February 20, 2019 letter to Raymond Charles Wells containing Appendix A)(Deutsch, Roberta) Modified Text on 7/1/2019 (ls).
June 28, 2019 Filing 101 MOTION for Extension of Time To Respond to Discovery by Carlyle Van Lines, Inc., Vanliner Insurance Company. Responses due by 7/12/2019 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McMahon, James)
June 28, 2019 Filing 100 PAPERLESS NOTICE RESETTING EVIDENTIARY HEARING. The parties should be prepared to present any and all evidence related to the authenticity of the Bill of Lading [66-1] attached to the Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, as well as to present arguments related to the Plaintiff's Motion to Strike the Bill of Lading 73,the Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions 96, and the Defendant's Motion to Dismiss 66. Motion Hearing reset to 7/19/2019 at 9:30 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division, Courtroom 207A before Judge Roy K. Altman. (tas)
June 27, 2019 Filing 99 MOTION for Protective Order by Raymond Charles Wells. (Cohen, Stuart)
June 26, 2019 Filing 98 PAPERLESS NOTICE SETTING EVIDENTIARY HEARING. The parties should be prepared to present any and all evidence related to the authenticity of the Bill of Lading [66-1] attached to the Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, as well as to present arguments related to the Plaintiff's Motion to Strike the Bill of Lading #73 ,the Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions #96 , and the Defendant's Motion to Dismiss #66 . Motion Hearing set for 7/11/2019 at 9:30 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division, Courtroom 207A before Judge Roy K. Altman. (tas)
June 24, 2019 Filing 97 NOTICE by Emma Meyer, Melissa H Meyer, The Eyeglass Lady LLC re #95 Reply to Response to Motion,, Notice of Filing Cover Letter Returning 16 Exemplars of the Plaintiff's Signature Examined by Marvin H. Dawson, Jr., Board Certified Forensic Document Examiner (Exhibit "E" to Plaintiffs' Reply) (Deutsch, Roberta)
June 17, 2019 Filing 96 Plaintiff's MOTION for Sanctions under Rule 11, Fed. R. Civ. P. by Emma Meyer, Melissa H Meyer, The Eyeglass Lady LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Rule 11 Monetary and Non Monetary Sanctions)(Deutsch, Roberta)
June 17, 2019 Filing 95 REPLY to Response to Motion re #66 First MOTION TO DISMISS #33 Amended Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Joint Motion filed by Emma Meyer, Melissa H Meyer, The Eyeglass Lady LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Report and Supplemental Report of Board Certified Forensic Document Examiner with Curriculum Vitae, #2 Exhibit 2019 Annual Report and Corporate Filing Information for Defendant, Suitable Movers, LLC, #3 Exhibit Affidavit of Jeffrey G. White, #4 Exhibit Affidavit of the Plaintiff with exhibits, #5 Exhibit 16 Examined Exemplars of the Plaintiff's Signature)(Deutsch, Roberta)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 94 PAPERLESS ORDER granting in part and denying in part #91 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. The Plaintiffs may file a Reply of not more than twelve (12) pages. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 6/14/2019. (vve)
June 13, 2019 Filing 93 PAPERLESS NOTICE RESETTING Hearing on Motion #66 First MOTION TO DISMISS #33 Amended Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Joint Motion, #73 Plaintiff's MOTION to Strike #66 First MOTION TO DISMISS #33 Amended Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Joint Motion Document Attached to Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss as a Fraudulent Document : Motion Hearing reset for 7/11/2019 at 4:00 PM in Fort Lauderdale Division, Courtroom 207A before Judge Roy K. Altman. (tas)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 92 PAPERLESS ORDER denying as moot Plaintiff's Supplemental Motion to Take Depositions in Excess of Limitations, ECF No. #59 , denying without prejudice Plaintiff's Corrected, Supplemental Motion to Take Depositions in Excess of Limitations, ECF No. #61 ; and denying without prejudice Plaintiff's Motion to Strike, ECF No. #79 . The undersigned finds the Supplemental Motion, ECF No. #59 , was mooted by the Corrected Supplemental Motion, ECF No. #61 , and finds the Corrected Supplemental Motion premature at this time. The undersigned also finds Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Exhibit Attached to Defendants' Response, ECF No. #79 , largely concerns the same issues as Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Exhibit Attached to Defendants' Joint Rule 12(B)(6) Motion to Dismiss, ECF No. #73 , which is currently pending before the District Court, and should be addressed under the earlier motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt on 6/12/2019. (hhr)
June 12, 2019 Filing 91 Plaintiff's MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages of Reply by Emma Meyer, Melissa H Meyer, The Eyeglass Lady LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Deutsch, Roberta) Modified Text on 6/12/2019 (ls).
June 10, 2019 Filing 90 Defendant's RESPONSE to #79 Plaintiff's MOTION to Strike #68 Response in Opposition to Motion, Corrected, Supplemental Motion for Leave to Take Depositions in Excess of Limitations under Rule 30, Fed. R. Civ. P., #73 Plaintiff's MOTION to Strike #66 First MOTION TO DISMISS #33 Amended Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Joint Motion Document Attached to Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss as a Fraudulent Document : This Response is filed on behalf of all Defendants as a Joint Memorandum in Response to Both of Plaintiff's Motion to Stike Exhibit, entered as DE #73 and DE #79 by Carlyle Van Lines, Inc., Jaimie Perez, Suitable Movers, LLC, Vanliner Insurance Company, Raymond Charles Wells. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Jaime Perez, #2 Affidavit of Lisa Steele, #3 Affidavit of Esteban Gonzalez, #4 Affidavit of Andrew Wisdom)(Dwyer, Jeffrey)
June 6, 2019 Filing 89 NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY by Emma Meyer, Melissa H Meyer, The Eyeglass Lady LLC for dates of June 18, 2019 through June 22, 2019 and June 28, 2019 through July 8, 2019 (Deutsch, Roberta)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 88 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #86 Motion for Leave to File Reply Brief in Excess of 10 Pages. The Defendants shall file a Reply brief of not more than 12 pages by June 7, 2019. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 6/6/2019. (vve)
June 6, 2019 Filing 87 REPLY to Response to Motion re #66 First MOTION TO DISMISS #33 Amended Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Joint Motion filed by Carlyle Van Lines, Inc., Jaimie Perez, Suitable Movers, LLC, Vanliner Insurance Company, Raymond Charles Wells. (McMahon, James)
June 5, 2019 Filing 86 First MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief in Excess of 10 Pages by Carlyle Van Lines, Inc., Jaimie Perez, Suitable Movers, LLC, Vanliner Insurance Company, Raymond Charles Wells. (McMahon, James)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 85 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #82 Motion for Extension of Time. The Defendants shall file their Reply no later than June 7, 2019. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 6/4/2019. (vve)
June 3, 2019 Filing 84 Clerks Notice to Filer re #82 First MOTION for Extension of Time Unopposed Motion for 4 Day Extension to File Reply Brief . Wrong Motion Relief(s) Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong motion relief(s) when docketing the motion. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but future motions filed must include applicable reliefs. (ls)
June 3, 2019 Filing 83 NOTICE of Mediator Selection and Hearing. Added Emma Meyer, Melissa H Meyer, Jeffrey E Streitfeld, The Eyeglass Lady LLC. Mediation Hearing set for 12/18/2019 at 10:00 a.m.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Scheduling Mediation)(Deutsch, Roberta)
June 3, 2019 Filing 82 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #66 First MOTION TO DISMISS #33 Amended Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Joint Motion by Carlyle Van Lines, Inc., Vanliner Insurance Company. Responses due by 6/17/2019 (McMahon, James) Modified Relief/Link on 6/3/2019 (ls).
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER re #78 Notice of Mediator Selection and/or Hearing filed by Jeffrey E Streitfeld (Proposed Order Scheduling Mediation due 6/7/2019). Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 5/31/2019. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
May 28, 2019 Filing 80 PAPERLESS NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #66 First MOTION TO DISMISS #33 Amended Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Joint Motion, #73 Plaintiff's MOTION to Strike #66 First MOTION TO DISMISS #33 Amended Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Joint Motion Document Attached to Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss as a Fraudulent Document : Motion Hearing set for 6/27/2019 at 10:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division, Courtroom 207A before Judge Roy K. Altman. The parties should be prepared to present oral argument. (tas)
May 28, 2019 Filing 79 Plaintiff's MOTION to Strike #68 Response in Opposition to Motion, Corrected, Supplemental Motion for Leave to Take Depositions in Excess of Limitations under Rule 30, Fed. R. Civ. P. by Emma Meyer, Melissa H Meyer, The Eyeglass Lady LLC. Responses due by 6/11/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Plaintiff, #2 Exhibit Report of Forensic Document Examiner with Curriculum Vitae, #3 Exhibit Affidavit of Officer Thell Riddle, Mulberry, AR Police Department, #4 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Fraudulent Document)(Deutsch, Roberta)
May 28, 2019 Filing 78 NOTICE of Mediator Selection. Added Jeffrey E Streitfeld. (Deutsch, Roberta)
May 28, 2019 Filing 77 NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY by Emma Meyer, Melissa H Meyer, The Eyeglass Lady LLC for dates of June 18-21 and June 27-July 8, 2019 (Deutsch, Roberta)
May 28, 2019 Filing 76 Clerks Notice to Filer re #72 Notice of Striking. Document Not Linked; ERROR - The filed document was not linked to the related docket entry. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document. (ls)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 75 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #69 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. The Plaintiff shall submit a response of not more than 25 pages within the time remaining to respond to the #66 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 5/28/2019. (vve)
May 26, 2019 Filing 74 RESPONSE in Opposition re #66 First MOTION TO DISMISS #33 Amended Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Joint Motion filed by Emma Meyer, Melissa H Meyer, The Eyeglass Lady LLC. Replies due by 6/3/2019. (Deutsch, Roberta)
May 26, 2019 Filing 73 Plaintiff's MOTION to Strike #66 First MOTION TO DISMISS #33 Amended Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Joint Motion Document Attached to Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss as a Fraudulent Document by Emma Meyer, Melissa H Meyer, The Eyeglass Lady LLC. Responses due by 6/10/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Report of Forensic Document Examiner with Curriculum Vitae, #3 Exhibit Affidavit of Officer Thell Riddle, Mulberry AR Police Department)(Deutsch, Roberta)
May 26, 2019 Filing 72 NOTICE of Striking #70 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion, #71 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion by Emma Meyer, Melissa H Meyer, The Eyeglass Lady LLC (Deutsch, Roberta) Modified Links on 5/28/2019 (ls).
May 25, 2019 Filing 71 RESPONSE in Opposition re #66 First MOTION TO DISMISS #33 Amended Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Joint Motion and Motion to Strike Document Attached to Defendants' Joint Motion as a Fraudulent Document filed by Emma Meyer, Melissa H Meyer, The Eyeglass Lady LLC. Replies due by 6/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Report of Forensic Document Examiner with Curriculum Vitae, #3 Exhibit Affidavit of Officer Thell Riddle, Mulberry AR Police Department)(Deutsch, Roberta)
May 24, 2019 Filing 70 RESPONSE in Opposition re #66 First MOTION TO DISMISS #33 Amended Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Joint Motion and Motion to Strike Document Attached to Defendants' Joint Motion as a Fraudulent Document filed by Emma Meyer, Melissa H Meyer, The Eyeglass Lady LLC. Replies due by 5/31/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of the Plaintiff, #2 Exhibit Report of Board Certified Forensic Document Examiner with Curriculum Vitae, #3 Exhibit Affidavit of Officer Thell Riddle, Mulberry AR Police Department)(Deutsch, Roberta)
May 22, 2019 Filing 69 Plaintiff's MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Opposition Memorandum by Emma Meyer, Melissa H Meyer, The Eyeglass Lady LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Leave to Exceed 20 Pages)(Deutsch, Roberta)
May 21, 2019 Filing 68 RESPONSE in Opposition re #61 Corrected, Supplemental Motion to Take Depositions in excess of Limitations under Rule 30, Fed.R.Civ.P. filed by Carlyle Van Lines, Inc., Jaimie Perez, Suitable Movers, LLC, Vanliner Insurance Company, Raymond Charles Wells. Replies due by 5/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Bill of Lading)(Cohen, Stuart)
May 21, 2019 Filing 67 NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY by Carlyle Van Lines, Inc., Vanliner Insurance Company for dates of May 22 to May 24 and June 20 to June 24 (McMahon, James)
May 20, 2019 Filing 66 First MOTION TO DISMISS #33 Amended Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Joint Motion by Carlyle Van Lines, Inc., Jaimie Perez, Suitable Movers, LLC, Vanliner Insurance Company, Raymond Charles Wells. Attorney James Scott McMahon added to party Jaimie Perez(pty:dft), Attorney James Scott McMahon added to party Suitable Movers, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney James Scott McMahon added to party Raymond Charles Wells(pty:dft). Responses due by 6/3/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Bill of Lading)(McMahon, James)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 65 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #55 Motion to Set Aside Clerk's Default. The Clerk of Court is directed to VACATE the entry of default against the Defendant, Raymond Charles Wells. Per this Court's 52 May 14, 2019 Order, all Defendants are directed to submit one combined response of not more than 25 pages or separate answers on or before May 22, 2019. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 5/17/2019. (vve)
May 17, 2019 Filing 64 Clerks Notice to Filer re #61 Corrected MOTION for Discovery Supplemental Motion to Take Depositions in Excess of Limitations Under Rule 30, Fed. R. Civ. P.. Wrong Motion Relief(s) Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong motion relief(s) when docketing the motion. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but future motions filed must include applicable reliefs. (ls)
May 16, 2019 Filing 63 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION by Emma Meyer, Melissa H Meyer, The Eyeglass Lady LLC re #62 Supplemental MOTION to Expedite Discovery Depositions filed by Emma Meyer, The Eyeglass Lady LLC, Melissa H Meyer (Deutsch, Roberta)
May 16, 2019 Filing 62 Supplemental MOTION to Expedite Discovery Depositions by Emma Meyer, Melissa H Meyer, The Eyeglass Lady LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Supplemental Motion to Expedite Discovery Depositions)(Deutsch, Roberta)
May 16, 2019 Filing 61 Corrected, Supplemental Motion to Take Depositions in excess of Limitations under Rule 30, Fed.R.Civ.P. by Emma Meyer, Melissa H Meyer, The Eyeglass Lady LLC. Responses due by 5/30/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Deutsch, Roberta) Modified Text on 5/17/2019 (ls).
May 16, 2019 Filing 60 Clerks Notice to Filer re #59 Supplemental MOTION for Discovery to Exceed Limitations on Depositions under Rule 30, Fed. R. Civ. P.. Wrong Motion Relief(s) Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong motion relief(s) when docketing the motion. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but future motions filed must include applicable reliefs. (ls)
May 16, 2019 Filing 59 Supplemental Motion to Take Depositions in excess of Limitations under Rule 30, Fed.R.Civ.P. by Emma Meyer, Melissa H Meyer, The Eyeglass Lady LLC. Responses due by 5/30/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Deutsch, Roberta) Modified Relief on 5/16/2019 (ls).
May 16, 2019 Filing 58 RESPONSE in Opposition re #55 MOTION to Set Aside Default filed by Raymond Charles Wells filed by Emma Meyer, Melissa H Meyer, The Eyeglass Lady LLC. Replies due by 5/23/2019. (Deutsch, Roberta)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 57 PAPERLESS ORDER striking #50 Motion to Take Deposition without prejudice for failure to comply with ECF No. #49 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt on 5/16/2019. (hhr)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 56 GENERAL ORDER ON DISCOVERY PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt on 5/16/2019. See attached document for full details. (hhr)
May 15, 2019 Filing 55 MOTION to Set Aside Default by Raymond Charles Wells. (Cohen, Stuart)
May 15, 2019 Filing 54 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stuart L. Cohen on behalf of Raymond Charles Wells. Attorney Stuart L. Cohen added to party Raymond Charles Wells(pty:dft). (Cohen, Stuart)
May 15, 2019 Filing 53 Clerks Notice to Filer re #50 Plaintiff's MOTION For Leave to Take Depositions in Excess of Limitations under Rule 30, Fed. R. Civ. P. . Wrong Motion Relief(s) Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong motion relief(s) when docketing the motion. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but future motions filed must include applicable reliefs. (ls)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 PAPERLESS ORDER denying without prejudice #46 Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint; and denying without prejudice #47 Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint. All Defendants are directed to refile one combined motion to dismiss of not more than 25 pages on or before May 22, 2019. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 5/14/2019. (vve)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 PAPERLESS ORDER denying #38 Motion for Expedited Discovery. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 5/14/2019. (vve)
May 14, 2019 Filing 50 Plaintiff's Motion to Take Depositions in excess of Limitations under Rule 30, Fed.R.Civ.P. by Emma Meyer, Melissa H Meyer, The Eyeglass Lady LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Deutsch, Roberta) Modified Relief on 5/15/2019 (ls).
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: (Amended Pleadings due by 6/4/2019., Discovery due by 1/13/2020., Expert Discovery due by 1/13/2020., Joinder of Parties due by 6/4/2019., Mediation Deadline 1/20/2020., In Limine Motions due by 2/25/2020., Dispositive Motions due by 1/28/2020., Motions due by 1/28/2020., Pretrial Stipulation due by 2/25/2020., Jury Trial set for 5/11/2020 in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Roy K. Altman., Calendar Call set for 5/5/2020 01:45 PM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Roy K. Altman.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt for all pretrial non-dispositive and discovery matters. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 5/13/2019. See attached document for full details. (pcs) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
May 14, 2019 Filing 48 NOTICE of Filing by Carlyle Van Lines, Inc., Vanliner Insurance Company re #47 First MOTION TO DISMISS #33 Amended Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM of Defendants Vanliner and Carlyle (McMahon, James) Modified Text on 5/15/2019 (ls).
May 14, 2019 Filing 47 First MOTION TO DISMISS #33 Amended Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM of Defendants Vanliner and Carlyle by Carlyle Van Lines, Inc., Vanliner Insurance Company. Responses due by 5/28/2019 (Attachments: #1 Bill of Lading Agreement)(McMahon, James)
May 13, 2019 Filing 46 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss #33 Amended Complaint, Strike Complaint under Rule 12(f) and adopt, join and incorporate [43-1] by Jaimie Perez, Suitable Movers, LLC. Responses due by 5/28/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Bill of Lading)(Dwyer, Jeffrey)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #43 Motion for Leave to File Motion and Memorandum in Excess of 20 Pages. The Defendants may file a response of not more than 25 pages. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 5/13/2019. (vve)
May 13, 2019 Filing 44 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION by Carlyle Van Lines, Inc., Vanliner Insurance Company re #42 First MOTION for Leave to File Motion and Memorandum in Excess of 20 pages filed by Vanliner Insurance Company, Carlyle Van Lines, Inc. (McMahon, James)
May 13, 2019 Filing 43 First MOTION for Leave to File Motion and Memorandum in Excess of 20 pages by Carlyle Van Lines, Inc., Vanliner Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and Strike Amended Complaint, #2 Text of Proposed Order Court Order on Amended Motion for Leave to File Motion in Excess of 20 Pages)(McMahon, James)
May 13, 2019 Filing 42 First MOTION for Leave to File Motion and Memorandum in Excess of 20 pages re #33 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT by Carlyle Van Lines, Inc., Vanliner Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and Strike Second Amended Complaint, #2 Proposed Order on Motion for Leave to File Motion in Excess of 20 pages)(McMahon, James) Modified to add link on 5/13/2019 (jua).
May 10, 2019 Filing 41 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Emma Meyer, Melissa H Meyer, The Eyeglass Lady LLC (Deutsch, Roberta)
May 9, 2019 Filing 40 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Jaimie Perez, Suitable Movers, LLC (Dwyer, Jeffrey)
May 9, 2019 Filing 39 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Carlyle Van Lines, Inc., Vanliner Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent American Financial Group Inc. for Vanliner Insurance Company (McMahon, James)
May 8, 2019 Filing 38 Plaintiff's MOTION for Discovery Expedited Discovery Depositions by Emma Meyer, Melissa H Meyer, The Eyeglass Lady LLC. Responses due by 5/22/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Expedited Discovery)(Deutsch, Roberta)
May 8, 2019 Filing 37 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by Emma Meyer, Melissa H Meyer, The Eyeglass Lady LLC (Deutsch, Roberta)
May 7, 2019 Filing 36 "VACATED" Clerks Entry of Default as to Raymond Charles Wells - Motions Terminated: #35 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default. Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 5/7/2019. (ls) Modified on 5/20/2019 (ls). (Vacated per DE #65)
May 6, 2019 Filing 35 Plaintiff's MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to Raymond Charles Wells by The Eyeglass Lady LLC, Emma Meyer, Melissa H Meyer. (Deutsch, Roberta)
May 3, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings as per DE 32 : Amended Complaint due by 5/8/2019. (lk)
May 3, 2019 Filing 34 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Emma Meyer, Melissa H Meyer, The Eyeglass Lady LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Joint Proposed Scheduling Order)(Deutsch, Roberta)
May 3, 2019 Filing 33 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against Carlyle Van Lines, Inc., Jaimie Perez, Suitable Movers, LLC, Vanliner Insurance Company, Raymond Charles Wells filed in response to Order Granting Motion for Leave, filed by The Eyeglass Lady LLC, Emma Meyer, Melissa H Meyer.(Deutsch, Roberta)
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #29 Corrected, Unopposed Motion for Leave to Amend; and denying as moot #28 Motion for Leave to Amend. The Plaintiffs shall file their Second Amended Complaint no later than May 8, 2019. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 5/3/2019. (vve)
May 3, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE by Emma Meyer, Melissa H Meyer, The Eyeglass Lady LLC of Withdrawal of Docket Entry 25 (Deutsch, Roberta)
May 1, 2019 Filing 30 Clerks Notice to Filer re #29 Supplemental MOTION to Amend/Correct and file Second Amended Complaint. Docket Text Does Not Match Document; ERROR - The Filer failed to enter a title in the docket text that matches the title of the document. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile the document. (ls)
April 30, 2019 Filing 29 Corrected, Unopposed Motion for Leave to Amend to File Second Amended Complaint by Emma Meyer, Melissa H Meyer, The Eyeglass Lady LLC. Responses due by 5/14/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Second Amended Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial)(Deutsch, Roberta) Modified Text on 5/1/2019 (ls).
April 29, 2019 Filing 28 Motion for Leave to Amend to File Second Amended Complaint Nunc Pro Tunc by Emma Meyer, Melissa H Meyer, The Eyeglass Lady LLC. Responses due by 5/13/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Deutsch, Roberta) Modified Text on 4/30/2019 (ls).
April 29, 2019 Filing 27 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #5 Amended Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by The Eyeglass Lady LLC, Emma Meyer, Melissa H Meyer. Raymond Charles Wells served on 4/15/2019, answer due 5/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s) Raymond Charles Wells)(Deutsch, Roberta)
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #24 Motion for Extension of Time. The Parties may file their Joint Planning and Scheduling Report at any time before May 10, 2019. In addition, the Parties must file certificates of interested parties and corporate disclosure statements that contain a complete list of persons, associated persons, firms, partnerships, or corporations that have a financial interest in the outcome of this case, including subsidiaries, conglomerates, affiliates, parent corporations, and other identifiable legal entities related to a party. Throughout the pendency of the action, the parties are under a continuing obligation to amend, correct, and update the certificates. Both the Joint Scheduling Report and the Certificate of Interested Parties must be filed no later than May 10, 2019. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 4/26/2019. (vve)
April 26, 2019 Filing 25 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against Carlyle Van Lines, Inc., Jaimie Perez, Suitable Movers, LLC, Vanliner Insurance Company, Raymond Charles Wells, filed by The Eyeglass Lady LLC, Emma Meyer, Melissa H Meyer.(Deutsch, Roberta)
April 25, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION for Extension of Time to file Joint Planning and Scheduling Report re #16 Order Setting/Cancelling Hearing,, Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report, #9 Order,, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings, by Emma Meyer, Melissa H Meyer, The Eyeglass Lady LLC. Responses due by 5/9/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order proposed Order)(Deutsch, Roberta)
April 25, 2019 ***Hearing(s) terminated re: Prior Presider. (cqs)
April 19, 2019 Filing 23 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #5 Amended Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by The Eyeglass Lady LLC, Emma Meyer, Melissa H Meyer. Suitable Movers, LLC served on 4/9/2019, answer due 4/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s) Suitable Movers, LLC)(Deutsch, Roberta)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 PAPERLESS ORDER granting ECF No. #21 the Defendants', SUITABLE MOVERS, LLC, and JAIMIE PEREZ, Motion for 20 Day Extension to Respond to Plantiff's Amended Complaint. The responses will now be due on May 14, 2019. Please note that no further extensions to this deadline will be granted.. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 4/18/19. (tas)
April 17, 2019 Filing 21 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #5 Amended Complaint, by Jaimie Perez, Suitable Movers, LLC. (Dwyer, Jeffrey)
April 17, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey C. Dwyer on behalf of Jaimie Perez, Suitable Movers, LLC. Attorney Jeffrey C. Dwyer added to party Jaimie Perez(pty:dft), Attorney Jeffrey C. Dwyer added to party Suitable Movers, LLC(pty:dft). (Dwyer, Jeffrey)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT to Judge Roy K. Altman for all further proceedings, Judge Ursula Ungaro no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 4/16/2019. See attached document for full details. (vjk)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time. Carlyle Van Lines, Inc. response due 5/14/2019; Vanliner Insurance Company response due 5/14/2019. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 4/11/2019. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
April 11, 2019 Filing 17 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #5 Amended Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by The Eyeglass Lady LLC, Emma Meyer, Melissa H Meyer. Carlyle Van Lines, Inc. served on 4/3/2019, answer due 4/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s) Carlyle Van Lines, Inc.)(Deutsch, Roberta)
April 10, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings: per order DE16 Scheduling Conference set for 5/24/2019 10:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Ursula Ungaro. (pcs)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER SETTING INITIAL PLANNING AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE (Scheduling Conference set for 5/24/2019 10:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Ursula Ungaro, Joint Scheduling Report due by 5/10/2019) Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 4/8/2019. See attached document for full details. (pcs) Modified on 4/10/2019 (pcs).
April 10, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James Scott McMahon on behalf of Carlyle Van Lines, Inc., Vanliner Insurance Company (McMahon, James)
April 10, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time To Respond to Amended Complaint re #5 Amended Complaint, by Carlyle Van Lines, Inc., Vanliner Insurance Company. Attorney James Scott McMahon added to party Carlyle Van Lines, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney James Scott McMahon added to party Vanliner Insurance Company(pty:dft). Responses due by 4/24/2019 (McMahon, James)
April 10, 2019 Filing 13 Clerks Notice to Filer re #11 Summons Returned Executed,. Incorrect Service Date Entered; ERROR - The incorrect service date was entered. The correction was made by the Clerk and filing was re-docketed, see [de#12]. It is not necessary to refile this document. (ls)
April 9, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #5 Amended Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by The Eyeglass Lady LLC, Emma Meyer, Melissa H Meyer. Jaimie Perez served on 4/3/2019, answer due 4/24/2019. (ls)(See Image at DE #11)
April 9, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #5 Amended Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by The Eyeglass Lady LLC, Emma Meyer, Melissa H Meyer. Jaimie Perez served on 4/2/2019, answer due 4/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s) Jaimie Perez)(Deutsch, Roberta)
April 9, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #5 Amended Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by The Eyeglass Lady LLC, Emma Meyer, Melissa H Meyer. Vanliner Insurance Company served on 4/3/2019, answer due 4/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s) Vanliner Insurance Company)(Deutsch, Roberta)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING INITIAL PLANNING AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, ( Joint Scheduling Report due by 5/10/2019, Scheduling Conference set for 5/24/2019 10:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Ursula Ungaro.) Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 4/5/2019. See attached document for full details. (ra)
April 2, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Vanliner Insurance Company. (ls)
April 2, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Raymond Charles Wells. (ls)
April 2, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Jaimie Perez. (ls)
April 1, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by The Eyeglass Lady LLC, Emma Meyer, Melissa H Meyer. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s) Jaimie Perez, #2 Summon(s) Raymond Charles Wells, #3 Summon(s) Vanliner Insurance Company)(Deutsch, Roberta)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER re #1 Complaint, Dismissing Party Raymond Charles Wells (individually, jointly and severally), Jaimie Perez (individually, jointly and severally) and Vanliner Insurance Company (a foreign corporation, individually, jointly and severally) Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 3/29/2019. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
March 28, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Carlyle Van Lines, Inc., Jaimie Perez, Suitable Movers, LLC, Vanliner Insurance Company, Raymond Charles Wells. (pcs)
March 28, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Ursula Ungaro. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pcs)
March 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Carlyle Van Lines, Inc., Jaimie Perez, Suitable Movers, LLC, Vanliner Insurance Company, Raymond Charles Wells. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11513023, filed by The Eyeglass Lady LLC, Emma Meyer, Melissa H Meyer. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit "A", #3 Exhibit Exhibit "B", #4 Summon(s) Suitable Movers, LLC, #5 Summon(s) Jaimie Perez, #6 Summon(s) Raymond Charles Wells, #7 Summon(s) Carlyle Van Lines, Inc., #8 Summon(s) Vanliner Insurance Company)(Deutsch, Roberta)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Meyer et al v. Suitable Movers, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suitable Movers, LLC
Represented By: James Scott McMahon
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Dwyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond Charles Wells
Represented By: James Scott McMahon
Represented By: Stuart L. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlyle Van Lines, Inc.
Represented By: James Scott McMahon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vanliner Insurance Company
Represented By: James Scott McMahon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jaimie Perez
Represented By: James Scott McMahon
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Dwyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emma Meyer
Represented By: Roberta Marcia Deutsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa H Meyer
Represented By: Roberta Marcia Deutsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Eyeglass Lady LLC
Represented By: Roberta Marcia Deutsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?