Jean-Jacques et al v. The Bank of New York Mellon
Plaintiff: Stephen Jean-Jacques and Rose Gerta Jean-Jacques
Defendant: The Bank of New York Mellon and The Bank of New York as Trustee on Behalf of Holders of the Alternative Loan Trust
Case Number: 0:2019cv60820
Filed: March 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Federico A Moreno
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #4 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint. Closing Case. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 5/31/2019. See attached document for full details. (km02)
April 25, 2019 Filing 7 REPLY to #5 Response in Opposition to Motion, to Dismiss by The Bank of New York Mellon. (Etlinger, Tabitha)
April 18, 2019 Filing 6 STATUS REPORT (Removal) by The Bank of New York Mellon (Etlinger, Tabitha)
April 17, 2019 Filing 5 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal with Prejudice #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),, filed by Rose Gerta Jean-Jacques, Stephen Jean-Jacques. Replies due by 4/24/2019. (lk)
April 4, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings as per DE #3 : Status Report due by 4/23/2019. (lk)
April 4, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal with Prejudice #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),, by The Bank of New York Mellon. Responses due by 4/18/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Etlinger, Tabitha)
April 4, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Court Practice in Removal Cases. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 4/4/2019. See attached document for full details. (mmd)
March 28, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Federico A. Moreno. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ar2)
March 28, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Plaintiff's Complaint Against Defendant Bank of New York Mellon for the Truth in Lending Act Violation and Fraud and Also the Florida Unfair Trade Practices Act) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11513781, filed by The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee on Behalf of Holders of the Alternative Loan Trust 2006-41CB, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates Series 2006-41CB. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Etlinger, Tabitha) Modified text on 3/28/2019 (ar2). (No answer/motion to dismiss filed).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jean-Jacques et al v. The Bank of New York Mellon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of New York Mellon
Represented By: Tabitha S. Etlinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of New York as Trustee on Behalf of Holders of the Alternative Loan Trust
Represented By: Tabitha S. Etlinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Jean-Jacques
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rose Gerta Jean-Jacques
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?