Gentile v. Diversified Consultants Inc.

Plaintiff: Martha Gentile
Defendant: Diversified Consultants Inc.
Case Number: 0:2019cv60838
Filed: March 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Beth Bloom
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Martha Gentile (Sanders, Craig)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Order Administratively Closing Case. Motions terminated: #12 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Diversified Consultants Inc.. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 6/13/2019. See attached document for full details. (vmz)
June 13, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Settlement pending by Diversified Consultants Inc. (Schuette, Michael)
June 4, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Diversified Consultants Inc.. Responses due by 6/18/2019 (Schuette, Michael)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to Complaint by Diversified Consultants Inc. by 6/7/2019. Re: #1 Complaint filed by Martha Gentile. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
May 24, 2019 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #8 Summons Returned Executed, #1 Complaint by Diversified Consultants Inc.. Attorney Michael Paul Schuette, Jr added to party Diversified Consultants Inc.(pty:dft). (Schuette, Michael)
May 24, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Dayle Marie Van Hoose on behalf of Diversified Consultants Inc.. Attorney Dayle Marie Van Hoose added to party Diversified Consultants Inc.(pty:dft). (Van Hoose, Dayle)
May 22, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Martha Gentile. Diversified Consultants Inc. served on 5/3/2019, answer due 5/24/2019. (Sanders, Craig)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 4/30/2019. See attached document for full details. (cds)
April 11, 2019 Filing 6 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Martha Gentile (Sanders, Craig)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Requiring Scheduling Report And Certificates of Interested Parties. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 4/1/2019. See attached document for full details. (vmz)
April 1, 2019 Filing 4 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Venue on the Civil Cover Sheet does not match the initiating document. The Clerks Office confirmed Broward (Office - Ft Lauderdale) as the county with the filer. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (vmz)
April 1, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Diversified Consultants Inc. (vmz)
March 29, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Beth Bloom. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (vmz)
March 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Diversified Consultants Inc.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11518457, filed by Martha Gentile. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Summon(s), #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sanders, Craig)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gentile v. Diversified Consultants Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diversified Consultants Inc.
Represented By: Dayle Marie Van Hoose
Represented By: Michael Paul Schuette, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha Gentile
Represented By: Craig B Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?