Horning v. Resolve Marine Group, Inc.
Plaintiff: Danny Horning
Defendant: Resolve Marine Group, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2019cv60899
Filed: April 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Patrick M Hunt
Referring Judge: Robert N Scola
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Resolve Marine Group, Inc.. (Stockel, Eric)
April 22, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Resolve Marine Group, Inc.. Resolve Marine Group, Inc. waiver sent on 4/9/2019, answer due 6/10/2019. (Stockel, Eric)
April 22, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric Jay Stockel on behalf of Resolve Marine Group, Inc.. Attorney Eric Jay Stockel added to party Resolve Marine Group, Inc.(pty:dft). (Stockel, Eric)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 GENERAL ORDER ON DISCOVERY OBJECTIONS AND PROCEDURES BEFORE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE PATRICK M. HUNT. The parties should carefully review the Order in that it requires expedited briefing, provides for modified page limitations and special conferral requirements before a motion is filed, limits the type of permissible discovery objections as well as modifying other discovery procedures. See attached document for full details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt on 4/9/2019. (sl00)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney(s) Dennis M. OBryan. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 4/8/2019. See attached document for full details. (cds)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Requiring Discovery And Scheduling Conference And Order Referring Discovery Matters To Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 4/8/2019. See attached document for full details. (lbc)
April 5, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Dennis M. O'Bryan. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11534504 by Danny Horning. Responses due by 4/19/2019 (Attachments: #1 Certification of Good Standing, #2 Certification of Study of Local Rules, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Rodriguez, Domingo)
April 5, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Resolve Marine Group, Inc. (mc)
April 5, 2019 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Venue on the Civil Cover Sheet does not match the initiating document. The Clerks Office confirmed Broward (Office - Ft Lauderdale) as the county with the filer. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (mc)
April 4, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (mc)
April 4, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint RE: Seaman against Resolve Marine Group, Inc.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11533636, filed by Danny Horning. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Rodriguez, Domingo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Horning v. Resolve Marine Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danny Horning
Represented By: Dennis M. O'Bryan
Represented By: Domingo Carlos Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Resolve Marine Group, Inc.
Represented By: Eric Jay Stockel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?