GARZON PENA v. SPRINKLERMATIC FIRE PROTECTION SYSTEMS, INC.

Plaintiff: JUAN MIGUEL GARZON PENA
Defendant: SPRINKLERMATIC FIRE PROTECTION SYSTEMS, INC.
Case Number: 0:2019cv60923
Filed: April 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: William P Dimitrouleas
Referring Judge: Lurana S Snow
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 26:7401
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Maritza I Gomez on behalf of SPRINKLERMATIC FIRE PROTECTION SYSTEMS, INC.. Attorney Maritza I Gomez added to party SPRINKLERMATIC FIRE PROTECTION SYSTEMS, INC.(pty:dft). (Gomez, Maritza)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 GENERAL ORDER ON DISCOVERY OBJECTIONS AND PROCEDURES signed by Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow on 7/2/2019. (jz)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE & DISCOVERY DEADLINES, REFERRING CASE TO MEDIATION & REFERRING DISCOVERY MOTIONS TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: ( Jury Trial set for 7/6/2020 before Judge William P. Dimitrouleas., Calendar Call set for 7/3/2020 10:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge William P. Dimitrouleas.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation., ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Judge Snow For Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 6/28/2019. See attached document for full details. (cqs) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
June 26, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Bruce Scott Liebman on behalf of SPRINKLERMATIC FIRE PROTECTION SYSTEMS, INC.. Attorney Bruce Scott Liebman added to party SPRINKLERMATIC FIRE PROTECTION SYSTEMS, INC.(pty:dft). (Liebman, Bruce)
June 26, 2019 Filing 11 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by JUAN MIGUEL GARZON PENA (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(Pollock, Brian)
June 17, 2019 Filing 10 Defendant ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by SPRINKLERMATIC FIRE PROTECTION SYSTEMS, INC.. (McNamara, Edward)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to a Complaint or Other Case Initiating Document SPRINKLERMATIC FIRE PROTECTION SYSTEMS, INC.. Answer due 6/17/2019. Re: #1 Complaint filed by JUAN MIGUEL GARZON PENA. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 5/10/2019. (vty)
May 9, 2019 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint by SPRINKLERMATIC FIRE PROTECTION SYSTEMS, INC.. Attorney Edward James McNamara, IV added to party SPRINKLERMATIC FIRE PROTECTION SYSTEMS, INC.(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McNamara, Edward)
April 29, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by JUAN MIGUEL GARZON PENA. SPRINKLERMATIC FIRE PROTECTION SYSTEMS, INC. served on 4/26/2019, answer due 5/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service on Sprinklermatic Fire Protection Systems, Inc.)(Pollock, Brian)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Requiring Counsel to Meet, File Joint Scheduling Report, And Joint Discovery Report Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 4/10/2019. See attached document for full details. (vmz)
April 10, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to SPRINKLERMATIC FIRE PROTECTION SYSTEMS, INC.. (jas)
April 10, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by JUAN MIGUEL GARZON PENA re #1 Complaint filed by JUAN MIGUEL GARZON PENA (Attachments: #1 Summon(s)) (Pollock, Brian)
April 9, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to SPRINKLERMATIC FIRE PROTECTION SYSTEMS, INC.. (ebz)
April 9, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge William P. Dimitrouleas and Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ebz)
April 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11542523, filed by JUAN MIGUEL GARZON PENA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Pollock, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GARZON PENA v. SPRINKLERMATIC FIRE PROTECTION SYSTEMS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUAN MIGUEL GARZON PENA
Represented By: Brian Howard Pollock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPRINKLERMATIC FIRE PROTECTION SYSTEMS, INC.
Represented By: Edward James McNamara, IV
Represented By: Maritza I Gomez
Represented By: Bruce Scott Liebman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?