Joe Hand Promotions, Inc v. Mitchell et al
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc
Defendant: Glenn Mitchell, Mitchell Family Grub Pub LLC and Jermaine Mitchell
Case Number: 0:2019cv61105
Filed: May 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Roy K Altman
Referring Judge: Patrick M Hunt
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 17:0101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Glenn Mitchell, Jermaine Mitchell, Mitchell Family Grub Pub LLC. (pes)
June 8, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc (Kaniuk, Ronald)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re: #6 Notice of filing Proposed Summons(es); Plaintiff shall perfect service on the Defendants and file proof of service with the Court no later than July 31, 2019. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 6/1/2019. See attached document for full details. (jao)
May 6, 2019 Filing 7 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Summons(es) cannot be issued. Attorney or Pro Se party's return address is not listed. (pes)
May 3, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc re #1 Complaint filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc (Kaniuk, Ronald)
May 2, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc re 4 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case Notice of Filing: Civil Cover Sheet (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Kaniuk, Ronald)
May 1, 2019 Filing 4 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. No Civil Cover Sheet. Filer is instructed to file a Notice (Other) with the Civil Cover Sheet attached within 24 hours of the notice. (jao)
May 1, 2019 Filing 3 FORM AO 121 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. COPYRIGHT OFFICE (Attachments: #1 Supplement Complaint and Exhibits) (jao)
May 1, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Roy K. Altman and Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jao)
May 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11606398, filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.(Kaniuk, Ronald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc v. Mitchell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc
Represented By: Ronald Scott Kaniuk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenn Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitchell Family Grub Pub LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jermaine Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?