Santos et al v. ZF FRIEDRICHSHAFEN AG et al
Plaintiff: CARL PAUL MAURILUS, Adalgisa Santos and COURTNEY MAINE
Defendant: TOYOTA MOTOR CORP., ZF FRIEDRICHSHAFEN AG, HONDA OF AMERICA MFG. INC., Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc., ZF TRW AUTOMOTIVE HOLDINGS CORP., Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc., TRW AUTOMOTIVE U.S. LLC, HYUNDAI MOTOR GROUP, Hyundai Motor America, AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO., INC., HONDA MOTOR CO., LTD., HYUNDAI MOTOR CO., HONDA R&D CO. LTD., TRW AUTOMOTIVE INC. and TRW VEHICLE SAFETY SYSTEMS INC.
Case Number: 0:2019cv61174
Filed: May 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Marcia G Cooke
Referring Judge: Patrick M Hunt
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF REFERRAL AND ORDER REGARDING COURT PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES. Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt for Pretrial Non-Dispositive Matters; Notice re Joint Motions; Expedited Service Deadline 8/12/2019. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 6/12/2019. See attached document for full details. (kou)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to Judge Marcia G. Cooke for all further proceedings, accepted and signed on 6/12/2019. Judge William P. Dimitrouleas and Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 6/12/2019. See attached document for full details. (kou)
June 12, 2019 Filing 5 Courtesy Copy of Motion of Plaintiffs Mark D. Altier, William Baerresen, Eric Fishon, Dragan Jagnjic, Cynthia Sacchett, Jacqueline Santos-Silva, Amanda Swanson, Gary E. Samouris and Nida Edith Samson for Centralization of Related Actions in the Central District of California, or in the Alternative, the Eastern District of Michigan, Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407 re MDL-2905. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Schedule of Actions, #3 Corrected Proof of Service)(mc)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Requiring Counsel to Meet, File Joint Scheduling Report and Joint Discovery Report. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 5/10/2019. See attached document for full details. (drz)
May 9, 2019 Filing 3 Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney David Boies, mailing date May 9, 2019, (pt)
May 8, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge William P. Dimitrouleas and Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (drz)
May 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11627997, filed by CARL PAUL MAURILUS, Adalgisa Santos, COURTNEY MAINE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(Heise, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Santos et al v. ZF FRIEDRICHSHAFEN AG et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOYOTA MOTOR CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZF FRIEDRICHSHAFEN AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HONDA OF AMERICA MFG. INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZF TRW AUTOMOTIVE HOLDINGS CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRW AUTOMOTIVE U.S. LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HYUNDAI MOTOR GROUP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hyundai Motor America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO., INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HONDA MOTOR CO., LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HYUNDAI MOTOR CO.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HONDA R&D CO. LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRW AUTOMOTIVE INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRW VEHICLE SAFETY SYSTEMS INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARL PAUL MAURILUS
Represented By: Mark Jurgen Heise
Represented By: David Boies
Represented By: Stephen N. Zack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adalgisa Santos
Represented By: Mark Jurgen Heise
Represented By: David Boies
Represented By: Stephen N. Zack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COURTNEY MAINE
Represented By: Mark Jurgen Heise
Represented By: David Boies
Represented By: Stephen N. Zack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?