McFadden v. Inch

Plaintiff: Ronald McFadden
Defendant: Mark S. Inch
Case Number: 0:2019cv61281
Filed: May 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: William P Dimitrouleas
Referring Judge: Lisette M Reid
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE by Mark S. Inch re #6 Order to Show Cause, (Attachments: #1 Transcripts) (Ocksrider, Matthew)
July 3, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #6 Order to Show Cause, by Mark S. Inch. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Appendix to Response to Order to Show Cause)(Ocksrider, Matthew)
July 3, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #6 Order to Show Cause, by Mark S. Inch. (Ocksrider, Matthew)
July 2, 2019 Filing 8 Clerks Notice of Receipt of Filing Fee received on 7/2/2019 in the amount of $5.00, receipt number FLS100190149. (asz)
May 24, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew Ocksrider on behalf of Mark S. Inch. Attorney Matthew Ocksrider added to party Mark S. Inch(pty:dft). (Ocksrider, Matthew)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE 28 U.S.C. 2254 on or before forty-five days from the date of this order the respondent shall file a memorandum of fact and law to show cause why this petition should not be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 5/22/2019. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REQUIRING PAYMENT OF FILING FEE OR FILING OF MOTION TO PROCEED IFP WITH DETAILED AFFIDAVIT. Filing Fee due by 6/20/2019. Motions due by 6/20/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 5/22/2019. See attached document for full details. (Attachments: #1 IFP Form) (fbn)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS TO PRO SE LITIGANT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 5/22/2019. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
May 21, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION TO VACATE, SET ASIDE OR CORRECT SENTENCE PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 2254 AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT by Ronald McFadden. (pcs)
May 21, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge William P. Dimitrouleas and Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid. Pursuant to Administrative Order 2019-2, this matter is referred to the Magistrate Judge for a ruling on all pre-trial, non-dispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive matters. (pcs)
May 21, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION/PETITION (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2254. Filing fee $ 5.00. Not paid/No IFP., filed by Ronald McFadden.(pcs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McFadden v. Inch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald McFadden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark S. Inch
Represented By: Noticing 2254 SAG Broward and North
Represented By: Matthew Steven Ocksrider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?