Jones v. Secretary, Florida Department of Corrections et al
Plaintiff: Larry Donahill Jones
Defendant: Department of Corrections, Secretary, Florida Department of Corrections and Florida Attorney General
Case Number: 0:2019cv61291
Filed: May 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Lisette M Reid
Referring Judge: Rodolfo A Ruiz
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Heidi L. Bettendorf on behalf of Secretary, Florida Department of Corrections. Attorney Heidi L. Bettendorf added to party Secretary, Florida Department of Corrections(pty:dft). (Bettendorf, Heidi)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE 28 U.S.C. 2254 on or before forty-five days from the date of this order the respondent shall file a memorandum of fact and law to show cause why this petition should not be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 7/12/2019. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
July 9, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Florida Attorney General, Secretary, Florida Department of Corrections, filed by Larry Donahill Jones.(jas)
June 25, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Compliance by Larry Donahill Jones Re: #5 Order Requiring Payment of Filing Fee or Filing IFP Motion. (ar2)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REGARDING NON-COMPLIANCE ANDFOR AMENDED PETITION on or before July 8, 2019, Petitioner shall file an amended 2254 motion that complies with the applicable rules of procedure set forth in this order, and that cures the pleading deficiencies identified in this order. ( Amended Complaint due by 7/8/2019 ) Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 6/4/2019. See attached document for full details. (Attachments: #1 2254 Complaint Form) (fbn)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REQUIRING PAYMENT OF FILING FEE OR FILING OF MOTION TO PROCEED IFP WITH DETAILED AFFIDAVIT. Filing Fee due by 6/20/2019. Motions due by 6/20/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 5/23/2019. See attached document for full details. (Attachments: #1 IFP Form) (fbn)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS TO PRO SE LITIGANT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 5/23/2019. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
May 21, 2019 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM in Support re #1 Application/Petition (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Larry Donahill Jones. (ebz)
May 21, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz and Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid. Pursuant to Administrative Order 2019-2, this matter is referred to the Magistrate Judge for a ruling on all pre-trial, non-dispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive matters. (ebz)
May 21, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION/PETITION (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2254. Filing fee $ 5.00 NOT PAID, filed by Larry Donahill Jones.(ebz)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Secretary, Florida Department of Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Donahill Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Corrections
Represented By: Noticing 2254 SAG Broward and North
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary, Florida Department of Corrections
Represented By: Noticing 2254 SAG Broward and North
Represented By: Heidi L. Bettendorf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Florida Attorney General
Represented By: Noticing 2254 SAG Broward and North
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?