Joseph v. Department of Corrections

Plaintiff: John Joseph
Defendant: Department of Corrections
Case Number: 0:2019cv61296
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: William P Dimitrouleas
Referring Judge: Lisette M Reid
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Filing 8 PAPERLESS Case No Longer Referred to Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid/Case Closed by the District Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 7/15/2019. (br)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 FINAL JUDGMENT AND ORDER DENYING PETITION AND DENYING CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILITY in favor of Department of Corrections against John Joseph Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 7/9/2019. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 FINAL JUDGMENT AND ORDER ADOPTING REPORT DISMISSING HABEAS PETITION, Approving #5 Report and Recommendations on #5 Report and Recommendations. Closing Case. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 7/9/2019. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
June 11, 2019 Filing 5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS RE DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN AUTHORIZATION PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 2244(b)(3) on 28 USC 2254 case re #1 Application/Petition (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by John Joseph, #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by John Joseph; Recommending that this petition for habeas corpus relief be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction for failure of the petitioner to obtain from the Eleventh Circuit Court of Appeals the authorization required by 28 U.S.C. 2244(b)(3). It is further recommended that no certificate of appealability issue, petitioner's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis ECF #3 be dismissed as moot, and this case closed. Objections to R&R due by 6/25/2019 Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 6/11/2019. See attached document for full details. (Attachments: #1 2254 Successive Form) (fbn)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS TO PRO SE LITIGANT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 5/28/2019. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
May 23, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by John Joseph. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(ebz)
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge William P. Dimitrouleas and Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid. Pursuant to Administrative Order 2019-2, this matter is referred to the Magistrate Judge for a ruling on all pre-trial, non-dispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive matters. (ebz)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION/PETITION (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2254. Filing fee $ 5.00. IFP Filed, filed by John Joseph.(ebz) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/23/2019: #1 Exhibit) (ebz).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joseph v. Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Corrections
Represented By: Noticing 2254 SAG Broward and North
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?