Popp v. Air Line Pilots Association, International
Plaintiff: Christian Popp
Defendant: Air Line Pilots Association, International
Case Number: 0:2019cv61298
Filed: May 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Rodolfo A Ruiz
Nature of Suit: Labor: Railway Labor Act
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of Counsel re #4 Notice (Other) Unconstitutionality by Mark J. Beutler on behalf of Christian Popp (Beutler, Mark)
July 11, 2019 Filing 9 Clerks Notice to Filer re #7 Certificate of Service. Wrong Event Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. The document was re-docketed by the Clerk, see 8 . It is not necessary to refile this document. (vmz)
July 11, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Air Line Pilots Association, International. Air Line Pilots Association, International served on 7/3/2019, answer due 7/24/2019. (vmz)
July 11, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Christian Popp Affidavit of Service (Beutler, Mark)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO PERFECT SERVICE. Show Cause Response/Perfect Service of process due by 8/21/2019. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz on 6/26/2019. See attached document for full details. (gp)
May 23, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by Christian Popp (Beutler, Mark)
May 23, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by Christian Popp of unconstitutionality of federal statute (Beutler, Mark)
May 23, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Air Line Pilots Association, International. (cds)
May 23, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (cds)
May 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Christian Popp against Air Line Pilots Association, International. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11670768, filed by Christian Popp. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Beutler, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Popp v. Air Line Pilots Association, International
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air Line Pilots Association, International
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christian Popp
Represented By: Mark J. Beutler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?