Tran v. Ross University School of Medicine
Plaintiff: David T. Tran
Defendant: Ross University School of Medicine
Case Number: 0:2019cv61384
Filed: June 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Roy K Altman
Referring Judge: Patrick M Hunt
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Octavia Monique Green on behalf of Ross University School of Medicine. Attorney Octavia Monique Green added to party Ross University School of Medicine(pty:dft). (Green, Octavia)
July 22, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ryan Roman on behalf of Ross University School of Medicine. Attorney Ryan Roman added to party Ross University School of Medicine(pty:dft). (Roman, Ryan)
July 22, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Ross University School of Medicine. Attorney Michael Constantine Marsh added to party Ross University School of Medicine(pty:dft). Responses due by 8/5/2019 (Marsh, Michael)
July 1, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 Ross University School of Medicine served on 7/1/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. (drz)
June 28, 2019 Filing 7 Clerk's NOTICE of Compliance re #6 Summons Issued, 5 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Copy of Docket Sheet and Summons prepared for US Marshals . (drz) Modified on 6/28/2019 (drz).
June 27, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Ross University School of Medicine. (drz)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. USM Service Ordered and Summonses NOT provided for USM Service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt on 6/13/2019. (hhr)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF REFERRAL #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by David T. Tran. Motions referred to Judge Patrick M. Hunt. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 6/12/2019. See attached document for full details. (drz)
June 3, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by David T. Tran. (cds)
June 3, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Roy K. Altman and Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (cds)
June 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES against Ross University School of Medicine. Filing fees $ 400.00. IFP Filed, filed by David T. Tran. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(cds)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tran v. Ross University School of Medicine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David T. Tran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ross University School of Medicine
Represented By: Michael Constantine Marsh
Represented By: Ryan Roman
Represented By: Octavia Monique Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?