Muselaire v. Hilton Management LLC
Plaintiff: Yves Mary Muselaire
Defendant: Hilton Management LLC d/b/a The Diplomat Resort Hotel and Hilton Management LLC
Case Number: 0:2019cv61432
Filed: June 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Kathleen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. All pending motions are DENIED AS MOOT. The Clerk is directed to CLOSE this case for administrative purposes. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 6/18/2019. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
June 14, 2019 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by Hilton Management LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wagner, Lin)
June 13, 2019 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Arbitration and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Hilton Management LLC. Responses due by 6/27/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wagner, Lin)
June 10, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by Hilton Management LLC re 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case of Filing State Court Records (Attachments: #1 State Court Records) (Wagner, Lin)
June 10, 2019 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. State Court Complaint not included. Filer is instructed to file a Notice (Other) with the State Court Records attached within 24 hours. (kpe)
June 7, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Kathleen M. Williams. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (kpe)
June 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11713328, filed by Hilton Management LLC d/b/a The Diplomat Resort Hotel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit All State Court, #3 Exhibit Affidavit)(Wagner, Lin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Muselaire v. Hilton Management LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yves Mary Muselaire
Represented By: Anthony Maximillien Georges-Pierre
Represented By: Max Lloyd Horowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hilton Management LLC d/b/a The Diplomat Resort Hotel
Represented By: Lin J Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hilton Management LLC
Represented By: Lin J Wagner
Represented By: Tasos C. Paindiris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?