The Top Quality Aunto Inc. et al v. Orrico et al
Plaintiff: The Guaranteed Best Choice Inc. and The Top Quality Aunto Inc.
Defendant: Lyla Lee Orrico and David John Orrico
Case Number: 0:2019cv61437
Filed: June 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Rodolfo A Ruiz
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER. Calendar Call set for 6/2/2020. Bench Trial set for 6/8/2020. Amended Pleadings due by 8/21/2019. Discovery due by 2/10/2020. Mediation Deadline 2/17/2020. Motions due by 3/23/2020. Pretrial Stipulation due by 4/20/2020. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz on 7/9/2019. See attached document for full details. (fc)
July 1, 2019 Filing 9 Agreed SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by The Guaranteed Best Choice Inc., The Top Quality Aunto Inc. (Ittleman, Geoffrey)
June 18, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Geoffrey David Ittleman on behalf of The Guaranteed Best Choice Inc., The Top Quality Aunto Inc.. Attorney Geoffrey David Ittleman added to party The Guaranteed Best Choice Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Geoffrey David Ittleman added to party The Top Quality Aunto Inc. (pty:pla). (Ittleman, Geoffrey)
June 18, 2019 Filing 7 REMOVAL STATUS REPORT by David John Orrico, Lyla Lee Orrico (mee)
June 17, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint/ Response to Summons re the Notice of Removal by David John Orrico, Lyla Lee Orrico. (mee)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Requiring Removal Status Report. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz on 6/12/2019. See attached document for full details. (gp)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Requiring Plaintiffs to Retain Counsel and Requiring the Parties to Prepare and File a Joint Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties. Joint Scheduling Report due by 7/1/2019. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz on 6/12/2019. See attached document for full details. (gp)
June 10, 2019 Filing 3 Clerks Notice of Receipt of Filing Fee received on 6/10/2019 in the amount of $ 400.00, receipt number FLS000011850 (mee)
June 10, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (amb)
June 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint) Filing fee: (Receipt #FLS000011850), filed by Lyla Lee Orrico, David John Orrico. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(amb) Modified text to include Receipt number on 6/10/2019 (lk).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Top Quality Aunto Inc. et al v. Orrico et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lyla Lee Orrico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David John Orrico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Guaranteed Best Choice Inc.
Represented By: Geoffrey David Ittleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Top Quality Aunto Inc.
Represented By: Geoffrey David Ittleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?