BRADLEY v. GEOVERA SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Plaintiff: CARRIE BRADLEY
Defendant: GEOVERA SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, a foreign corporation and GeoVera Specialty Insurance Company
Case Number: 0:2019cv61473
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Rodolfo A Ruiz
Referring Judge: Barry S Seltzer
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #4 Defendant's Motion to Strike Paragraphs of Complaint. Paragraph 17 of [1-2] Plaintiff's State Court Complaint is STRICKEN . Plaintiff's State Court Complaint is AMENDED BY INTERLINEATION . Defendant may file an amended answer on or before August 19, 2019. See attached document for full details. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz on 8/8/2019. (mhn)
August 7, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by CARRIE BRADLEY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3)(Naparstek, Matthew)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. On or before August 9, 2019, Plaintiff shall show cause, in writing, why the #4 Defendant's Motion to Strike Paragraphs of the Complaint should not be granted by default, and why Plaintiff failed to file a timely response. See attached document for full details. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz on 8/5/2019. (mhn)
July 24, 2019 Mediation Hearing set for 11/18/2019 10:00 AM Per DE #15 (vmz)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER SCHEDULING MEDIATION before Frank J. Allocca, Esq., on November 18, 2019, at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz on 7/24/2019. See attached document for full details. (mhn)
July 24, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Mediator Selection and Hearing. Added Frank J. Allocca. Mediation Hearing set for 11/18/2019 at 10:00 a.m.. (Chaplin, James)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PAPERLESS ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. No discovery motions shall be filed with the Court unless specifically authorized by Order. In the event a discovery dispute does arise, counsel are instructed to meet and confer in a good faith attempt to resolve the dispute. If, after conferring, the parties cannot resolve their discovery dispute, the movant must seek relief within 14 days after the grounds for relief occur by contacting the undersigneds Chambers (954-769-5450) and scheduling a discovery hearing. The movant shall have first conferred with opposing counsel and obtained three alternative dates and times that both counsel are available for a hearing. The attorney or other person with knowledge who telephones the Court shall have the following information: (a) the nature of the discovery dispute; (b) the efforts made to confer with opposing counsel; and (c) three agreed upon dates for a hearing. The Court will then set the matter for hearing and order the parties to submit a joint status report on the issues. Where there has been a complete failure to respond to discovery, and where good faith efforts have been made (without success) to obtain that discovery, counsel need not obtain agreed upon dates, but shall so inform the Court telephonically of the issue, and the Court will set the matter for hearing. Finally, when the parties have stipulated to the entry of an order, such as stipulated confidentiality order, the parties shall not file a motion for entry of the stipulated order. Instead, counsel shall email to Chambers (seltzer@flsd.uscourts.gov) a copy of the proposed stipulated order in Word or WordPerfect format, with a statement that the parties have agreed to entry of the proposed order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer on 7/15/2019. (mws)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: ( Jury Trial set for 7/6/2020 in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz., Calendar Call set for 6/30/2020 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz., Proposed Order Scheduling Mediation due by 7/30/2019., Amended Pleadings due by 8/20/2019., Joinder of Parties due by 8/20/2019., Discovery due by 3/9/2020., Expert Discovery due by 3/9/2020., Mediation Deadline 3/16/2020., Pretrial Motions due by 3/24/2020., In Limine Motions due by 4/21/2020., Joint Pretrial Stipulation due by 4/21/2020.). ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer for all discovery related matters. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz on 7/12/2019. See attached document for full details. (mhn) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
July 12, 2019 Filing 11 Initial Disclosure(s) of Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 26(a)(1) by GeoVera Specialty Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(McNalis, Daniel)
July 12, 2019 Filing 10 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by GeoVera Specialty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Geovera Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Groelle & Salmon, P.A., Other Affiliate GeoVera Specialty Insurance Services, Other Affiliate Geovera Advantage Insurance Services, Inc., Other Affiliate GeoVera Insurance Company, Other Affiliate GeoVera Insurance Holdings, Ltd., Other Affiliate Matthew R. Naparstek, Other Affiliate Felice & Ehrlich, Other Affiliate Kevin Cooper for GeoVera Specialty Insurance Company (McNalis, Daniel)
July 11, 2019 Filing 9 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by CARRIE BRADLEY (Naparstek, Matthew)
July 9, 2019 Filing 8 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by CARRIE BRADLEY (Naparstek, Matthew)
July 8, 2019 Filing 7 STATUS REPORT of Removal by GeoVera Specialty Insurance Company (McNalis, Daniel)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REQUIRING REMOVAL STATUS REPORT. Counsel for the removing party shall file and serve a Removal Status Report on or before July 3, 2019. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz on 6/20/2019. See attached document for full details. (mhn)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REQUIRING JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT. Parties shall file a joint scheduling report and a certificate of interested parties on or before July 11, 2019. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz on 6/20/2019. See attached document for full details. (mhn)
June 19, 2019 Filing 4 Defendant's MOTION to Strike Paragraphs of the Complaint by GeoVera Specialty Insurance Company. Responses due by 7/3/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2)(McNalis, Daniel)
June 19, 2019 Filing 3 Defendant's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by GeoVera Specialty Insurance Company. (McNalis, Daniel)
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jao)
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT ) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11729245, filed by GEOVERA SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, a foreign corporation. No Answer and/or Motion to Dismiss Filed. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(McNalis, Daniel) Modified on 6/14/2019 (jao).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BRADLEY v. GEOVERA SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEOVERA SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, a foreign corporation
Represented By: Daniel Martin McNalis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GeoVera Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Daniel Martin McNalis
Represented By: Patrick James Carleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARRIE BRADLEY
Represented By: Matthew Ryan Naparstek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?