Galin v. Sanitas Dental of South Florida, PA
Plaintiff: Wendy Galin
Defendant: Sanitas Dental of South Florida, PA
Case Number: 0:2019cv61492
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Patrick M Hunt
Referring Judge: Robert N Scola
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29:0621
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice (Joint) by Sanitas Dental of South Florida, PA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Text of Proposed Order) (Martin, Patrick)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING CASE UPON NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT. The parties have settled this action (ECF No. #7 ). By August 12, 2019, the Plaintiff must file a stipulation of dismissal or a motion to dismiss. The Court directs the Clerk to close this case. Any pending motions are denied as moot. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 7/25/2019. See attached document for full details. (mc)
July 25, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Settlement by Wendy Galin (Levine, Daniel)
July 16, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Elisa Hevia Baca on behalf of Sanitas Dental of South Florida, PA. Attorney Elisa Hevia Baca added to party Sanitas Dental of South Florida, PA(pty:dft). (Baca, Elisa)
July 11, 2019 Filing 5 Defendant's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Sanitas Dental of South Florida, PA. Attorney Patrick F. Martin added to party Sanitas Dental of South Florida, PA(pty:dft). (Martin, Patrick)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Requiring Discovery And Scheduling Conference And Order Referring Discovery Matters To The Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 6/17/2019. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Sanitas Dental of South Florida, PA. (kpe)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (kpe)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against Sanitas Dental of South Florida, PA. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11733614, filed by Wendy Galin. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Levine, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Galin v. Sanitas Dental of South Florida, PA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanitas Dental of South Florida, PA
Represented By: Patrick F. Martin
Represented By: Elisa Hevia Baca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendy Galin
Represented By: Daniel R. Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?