Kopson v. Department of Corrections

Plaintiff: Steven J. Kopson
Defendant: Department of Corrections
Case Number: 0:2019cv61642
Filed: July 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Beth Bloom
Referring Judge: Lisette M Reid
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE by Department of Corrections of Filing Transcripts (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Appendix Change of Plea Hearing, #3 Appendix Sentencing Hearing, #4 Appendix Resentencing Hearing) (Valuntas, Richard)
August 29, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #5 Order to Show Cause, by Department of Corrections. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Appendix Exhibits1-34, #3 Appendix Exhibits 35-42)(Valuntas, Richard)
July 23, 2019 Filing 7 Clerks Notice of Receipt of Filing Fee received on 7/23/2019 in the amount of $ 5.00, receipt number FLS100191485. (vt)
July 10, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Richard Chambers Valuntas on behalf of Department of Corrections. Attorney Richard Chambers Valuntas added to party Department of Corrections(pty:dft). (Valuntas, Richard)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE 28 U.S.C. 2254 on or before September 4, 2019, the respondent shall file a memorandum of fact and law to show cause why this petition should not be granted. Show Cause Response due by 9/4/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 7/3/2019. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REQUIRING PAYMENT OF FILING FEE OR FILING OF MOTION TO PROCEED IFP WITH DETAILED AFFIDAVIT. Filing Fee due by 8/5/2019. Motions due by 8/5/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 7/3/2019. See attached document for full details. (Attachments: #1 IFP Form) (fbn)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS TO PRO SE LITIGANT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 7/3/2019. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
July 1, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Beth Bloom and Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid. Pursuant to Administrative Order 2019-2, this matter is referred to the Magistrate Judge for a ruling on all pre-trial, non-dispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive matters. (ebz)
July 1, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION/PETITION (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2254. Filing fee $ 5.00, NOT PAID, filed by Steven J. Kopson.(ebz)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kopson v. Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven J. Kopson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Corrections
Represented By: Noticing 2254 SAG Broward and North
Represented By: Richard Chambers Valuntas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?