Whitehead v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Plaintiff: Silas Whitehead
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA and Broward County Sheriff's Office
Case Number: 0:2019cv61671
Filed: July 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Roy K Altman
Referring Judge: Lisette M Reid
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Filing 7 PAPERLESS Case No Longer Referred to Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid/Case Closed by the District Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 8/12/2019. (br)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Accepting and Adopting #5 Report and Recommendations. The Complaint [ECF No. 1] filed by the Plaintiff, Silas Whitehead, is DISMISSED. The Clerk of the Court is instructed to CLOSE this case, and any pending motions are DENIED as moot. Motions Terminated: #5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS on 28 USC 2241 case re #1 Application/Petition (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Silas Whitehead Recommending that this civil action be a dismissal WITH PREJUDICE and the case CLOSED.. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 8/7/2019. See attached document for full details. (amb)
July 22, 2019 Filing 5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS on 28 USC 2241 case re #1 Application/Petition (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Silas Whitehead; Recommending that this civil action be a dismissal WITH PREJUDICE and the case CLOSED. Objections to R&R due by 8/5/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 7/22/2019. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF DIRECTIONS of filing Broward County State Circuit Court docket to be made part of the instant record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 7/16/2019. See attached document for full details. (Attachments: #1 State Court Docket as of 7/12/19, #2 Probable Cause Finding, #3 Case# File State Information-Case# 18000203CF10A) (fbn)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PAPERLESS ORDER instructing the Clerk to correct the identity of the Respondent in this habeas action, as Petitioner's legal custodian is Gregory Tony, Sheriff of the Broward County Sheriff's Office. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid (bca)
July 8, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Roy K. Altman and Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid. Pursuant to Administrative Order 2019-2, this matter is referred to the Magistrate Judge for a ruling on all pre-trial, non-dispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive matters. (mee)
July 8, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION/PETITION (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241. Filing fee $ 5.00,NOT PAID/NO IFP., filed by Silas Whitehead.(mee)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Whitehead v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Silas Whitehead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Noticing 2241/Bivens US Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Broward County Sheriff's Office
Represented By: Noticing 2241/Bivens US Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?