Bulla v. Broward County Sheriff's Office et al
Plaintiff: Sandy Junita Bulla
Defendant: Broward County Sheriff's Office, Detective Luis Rivera and Detective Joe Ventura
Case Number: 0:2019cv61679
Filed: July 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Darrin P Gayles
Referring Judge: Lisette M Reid
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff to Proceed without Prepayment of Filing Fee but Establishing Debt to Clerk of $350.00. Granting to the extent that the plaintiff need not prepay even a partial filing fee in this case, or to prepay costs such as for service of process. USM Service NOT Ordered. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 8/19/2019. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
August 19, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis with Inmate Account Statement by Sandy Junita Bulla. (cds)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Petitioner filed his/her motion to proceed in forma pauperis but failed to submit the supporting statement certified by the appropriate institutional officer showing all receipts, expenditures, and balances during the last six months for any institutional account in her name. Accordingly, on or before August 23, 2019, Petitioner shall file the required supporting, certified inmate account statement, or pay the Clerks filing fee of $400.00. Responses due by 8/23/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 7/23/2019. See attached document for full details. (Attachments: #1 IFP Form) (fbn)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS TO PRO SE CIVIL RIGHTS LITIGANTS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 7/23/2019. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
July 9, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Sandy Junita Bulla. (Attachments: #1 Supplement IFP)(ar2)
July 9, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Darrin P. Gayles and Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid. Pursuant to Administrative Order 2019-2, this matter is referred to the Magistrate Judge for a ruling on all pre-trial, non-dispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive matters. (ar2)
July 9, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint pursuant to 42 USC 1983 against Broward County Sheriff's Office, Luis Rivera, Joe Ventura. Filing fee $ 400.00. IFP Filed, filed by Sandy Junita Bulla.(ar2)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bulla v. Broward County Sheriff's Office et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandy Junita Bulla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Broward County Sheriff's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Detective Luis Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Detective Joe Ventura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?