Pharmcore Inc. v. Cre8 Pharmacy Group LLC et al
Plaintiff: Pharmcore
Defendant: David Bonfa, Cre8 Pharmacy Group LLC and Nancy Dube
Case Number: 0:2019cv61688
Filed: July 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Rodney Smith
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Filing 12 Nancy Dube, Cre8 Pharmacy Group LLC'A ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Pharmcore by Nancy Dube, Cre8 Pharmacy Group LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-F)(Koziol, Peter)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants CRE8 Pharmacy Group, LLC and Nancy Dube shall respond to the #1 Complaint by no later than August 21, 2019. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 8/1/2019. (dco)
August 1, 2019 Filing 10 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer by Cre8 Pharmacy Group LLC, Nancy Dube. Attorney Peter Andrew Koziol added to party Cre8 Pharmacy Group LLC (pty:dft), Attorney Peter Andrew Koziol added to party Nancy Dube(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Koziol, Peter)
July 16, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Pharmcore. Cre8 Pharmacy Group LLC served on 7/11/2019, answer due 8/1/2019. (Ferguson, David)
July 16, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Pharmcore. Nancy Dube served on 7/11/2019, answer due 8/1/2019. (Ferguson, David)
July 9, 2019 Filing 7 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Alias Not Added. The Filer failed to add the alias information for the party(ies). The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (jao)
July 9, 2019 Filing 6 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Party(ies) Improperly Formatted. The Filer failed to enter the party name(s) in accordance with the CM/ECF Format for Adding Parties for Attorneys Guide. The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file the document. (jao)
July 9, 2019 Filing 5 FORM AO 120 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. PATENT AND TRADEMARK (Attachments: #1 Supplement Complaint and Exhibits) (jao)
July 9, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to David Bonfa, Cre8 Pharmacy Group LLC, Nancy Dube. (jao)
July 9, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Seth David Haimovitch on behalf of Pharmcore. Attorney Seth David Haimovitch added to party Pharmcore(pty:pla). (Haimovitch, Seth)
July 9, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodney Smith. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jao)
July 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against David Bonfa, Cre8 Pharmacy Group LLC, Nancy Dube. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11796731, filed by Pharmcore Inc, d//b/a Hallandale Pharmact. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Summon(s) Summons - Cre8, #9 Summon(s) Summons, #10 Summon(s) Summons)(Ferguson, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pharmcore Inc. v. Cre8 Pharmacy Group LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Bonfa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cre8 Pharmacy Group LLC
Represented By: Peter Andrew Koziol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Dube
Represented By: Peter Andrew Koziol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pharmcore
Represented By: David Lawrence Ferguson
Represented By: Seth David Haimovitch
Represented By: James Gilbert Keys, III
Represented By: Alexis Fields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?