Barberi v. Tax Connek USA Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Renzo Barberi
Defendant: HOWARD DORFMAN, LINDA KING DORFMAN and TAX CONNEK USA INC.
Case Number: 0:2019cv61696
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Darrin P Gayles
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:12182
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 PAPERLESS ORDER denying #19 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff's Motion is premature. A motion for summary judgment pursuant to Rule 56 is premature where discovery has not yet commenced. See Ventrassist Pty. Ltd. v. Heartware, Inc., 377 F. Supp. 2d 1278, 1287 (S.D. Fla. 2005). In this case, a Joint Scheduling Report has not been entered that would trigger the start of discovery and a trial date has yet to be issued. Accordingly, the Court finds that a ruling on summary judgment is not appropriate at this time. Plaintiff's Motion is denied without prejudice. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (lfn)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 PAPERLESS ORDER denying #8 Defendant Tax Connek USA Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss. Defendant's Motion was filed by a corporate representative. But Defendant is a corporation and therefore cannot proceed pro se. See Palazzo v. Gulf Oil Corp., 764 F.2d 1381, 1385-86 (11th Cir. 1985). Defendant's Motion is denied without prejudice. Accordingly, Plaintiff's #14 Motion to Strike Defendant's Motion to Dismiss is denied as moot. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (lfn)
August 23, 2019 Filing 24 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Renzo Barberi (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stern, Ronald)
August 23, 2019 Filing 23 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Renzo Barberi (Stern, Ronald)
August 23, 2019 Filing 22 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Howard Dorfman, Linda King Dorfman, Tax Connek USA Inc. identifying Other Affiliate MAX H. SAINTIL, Other Affiliate Howard Dorfman, Other Affiliate Linda King Dorfman, Other Affiliate Wislet H. Metayer, Other Affiliate Max H. Saintil, Jr. for Howard Dorfman, Linda King Dorfman, Tax Connek USA Inc. (Minerley, Kenneth)
August 22, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jennifer Marie Murillo-Hurtado on behalf of Howard Dorfman, Linda King Dorfman, Tax Connek USA Inc.. Attorney Jennifer Marie Murillo-Hurtado added to party Howard Dorfman(pty:dft), Attorney Jennifer Marie Murillo-Hurtado added to party Linda King Dorfman(pty:dft), Attorney Jennifer Marie Murillo-Hurtado added to party Tax Connek USA Inc.(pty:dft). (Murillo-Hurtado, Jennifer)
August 22, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kenneth Louis Minerley on behalf of Howard Dorfman, Linda King Dorfman, Tax Connek USA Inc.. Attorney Kenneth Louis Minerley added to party Howard Dorfman(pty:dft), Attorney Kenneth Louis Minerley added to party Linda King Dorfman(pty:dft), Attorney Kenneth Louis Minerley added to party Tax Connek USA Inc.(pty:dft). (Minerley, Kenneth)
August 21, 2019 Filing 19 Plaintiff's MOTION for Summary Judgment by Renzo Barberi. Responses due by 9/4/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stern, Ronald)
August 21, 2019 Filing 18 Statement of: Material Facts in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment by Renzo Barberi (Stern, Ronald)
August 21, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE by Renzo Barberi of Filing Plaintiff's Affidavit (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Plaintiff's Affidavit) (Stern, Ronald)
August 20, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE by Renzo Barberi of Filing Affidavit of Jon Kronillis (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Expert Affidavit) (Stern, Ronald)
August 19, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #1 Complaint, filed by Renzo Barberi. Replies due by 8/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Letter from 43 Senators)(Stern, Ronald)
August 15, 2019 Filing 14 Plaintiff's MOTION to Strike #8 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, by Renzo Barberi. Responses due by 8/29/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stern, Ronald)
August 12, 2019 Filing 13 DEFENDANT'S REPORT AS ORDERED BY THE COURT by Howard Dorfman, Linda King Dorfman (pcs)
August 12, 2019 Filing 12 Consent by Pro Se Litigant (Non-Prisoner) Linda King Dorfman to receive Notices of Electronic Filing at email address: LKing67@aol.com (pcs)
August 5, 2019 Filing 11 Added Address for Defendants Howard Dorfman and Linda King Dorfman. (pcs)
August 2, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #1 Complaint, by Howard Dorfman, Linda King Dorfman. Responses due by 8/16/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(pcs)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ENDORSED ORDER REQUIRING JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT AND PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER. Pursuant to S.D. Fla. Local Rule 16.1, on or before August 23, 2019, the parties shall prepare and file a Joint Scheduling Report, as well as Certificates of Interested Parties and Corporate Disclosure Statements.The parties shall also file a Proposed Scheduling Order, adhering to the format and guidance of the attached form. If the parties deviate in any way from that format and guidance, they shall contemporaneously submit a written explanation, which provides their purported justification for each and every deviation. If the parties fail to submit such written explanation, the Court may enter a Scheduling Order that does not take into account the parties' proposed dates.Failure to comply with this Order shall be grounds for dismissal without prejudice and without further notice. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles See attached document for full details. (lfn)
August 1, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, by Tax Connek USA Inc.. Responses due by 8/15/2019 (pcs)
July 26, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Renzo Barberi. LINDA KING DORFMAN served on 7/13/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. (Stern, Ronald)
July 26, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Renzo Barberi. HOWARD DORFMAN served on 7/13/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. (Stern, Ronald)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE. The Complaint in this action is filed under the Americans with Disabilities Act (ADA), 42 U.S.C. 12181 et seq. In order to assist the Court in the management of this case, and in an effort to foster an early and cost-effective resolution, the parties are ORDERED as follows: Within fourteen (14) days of service of the Complaint, Defendant shall file a report with the Court indicating whether it agrees to (1) remediate the deficiencies identified in the Complaint, (2) entry of an injunction to ensure future compliance, and (3) pay Plaintiff's reasonable attorneys fees and costs, as determined by the Court or agreement by the parties. If so, Defendant shall include a reasonable timeline for remediation. If, upon review of the report, the Court finds that Defendant intends to remediate the property within a reasonable time, the action shall be stayed. If requested, the Court may grant proportional discovery to verify Defendant's remediation of the ADA deficiencies outlined in the Complaint. After receiving notice from the parties that the ADA deficiencies outlined in the Complaint have been remediated, the parties shall submit to the Court a proposed order of dismissal, including an injunction for future compliance and an award of reasonable attorney's fees and costs. Disputes will be resolved by the Court. If the Defendant does not agree to this remediation procedure, it shall notify the Court within 14 days of this Order. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (lfn)
July 11, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE. Unless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion shall be double-spaced in Times New Roman 12-point typeface. Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions. Failure to comply with ANY of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions, including but not limited to, the striking of the motion or dismissal of this action. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (lfn)
July 10, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to HOWARD DORFMAN, LINDA KING DORFMAN, TAX CONNEK USA INC.. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s), #2 Summon(s))(ebz)
July 10, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Darrin P. Gayles. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ebz)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11799826, filed by Renzo Barberi. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s), #4 Summon(s))(Stern, Ronald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barberi v. Tax Connek USA Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOWARD DORFMAN
Represented By: Kenneth Louis Minerley
Represented By: Jennifer Marie Murillo-Hurtado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LINDA KING DORFMAN
Represented By: Kenneth Louis Minerley
Represented By: Jennifer Marie Murillo-Hurtado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TAX CONNEK USA INC.
Represented By: Kenneth Louis Minerley
Represented By: Jennifer Marie Murillo-Hurtado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renzo Barberi
Represented By: Ronald E. Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?