United States of America v. Argonaut Insurance Company
Plaintiff: United States of America and Advanced Roofing, Inc.
Defendant: Argonaut Insurance Company
Case Number: 0:2019cv61701
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Rodney Smith
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40:0270
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Filing 13 REPLY to Response to Motion re #11 MOTION to Stay MOTION to Compel Arbitration and/or Mediation filed by Argonaut Insurance Company. (Irel, Monica)
August 30, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Stay MOTION to Compel Arbitration and/or Mediation filed by Advanced Roofing, Inc., United States of America. Attorney Jon Michael Kendrick added to party Advanced Roofing, Inc.(pty:pla). Replies due by 9/6/2019. (Kendrick, Jon)
August 23, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Stay , MOTION to Compel Arbitration and/or Mediation by Argonaut Insurance Company. Responses due by 9/6/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Irel, Monica)
August 7, 2019 Filing 10 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on #8 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement, 9 Clerks Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney, into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Advanced Roofing, Inc. and Environmental Chemical Corporation. (Kendrick, Jon)
August 7, 2019 Filing 9 Clerks Notice to Filer re #8 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. All Parties Not Added; ERROR - The Filer failed to add all parties indicated in the Certificate. Filer is instructed to file a Notice of Entry of Parties and add the additional parties (Advanced Roofing,Inc. and Environmental Chemical Corporation. (ail)
August 7, 2019 Filing 8 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by United States of America (Kendrick, Jon)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PAPERLESS ORDER granting in part and denying in part #6 Agreed Motion for Extension of Time for Defendant to Respond to Complaint. Argonaut Insurance Company shall file its Answer or Response by 8/23/2019 . Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 8/5/2019. (cbn)
August 5, 2019 Filing 6 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint, by Argonaut Insurance Company. Attorney Monica Liliana Irel added to party Argonaut Insurance Company(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Irel, Monica)
July 22, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America re #1 Complaint, #3 Summons Issued on Argonaut Insurance Company (Kendrick, Jon)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REQUIRING JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT, CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES AND CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Joint Scheduling Report due by 8/30/2019. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 7/18/2019. See attached document for full details. (amb)
July 11, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Argonaut Insurance Company. (amb)
July 10, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodney Smith. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (amb)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Miller Act Claim) against United States of America. Filing fees $ 400.00. Pay.gov Agency Tracking ID 113C-11800895, payment transferred from : 19CV61701 United States v.Argonaut Ins Co, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Exhibit Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Kendrick, Jon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Argonaut Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Argonaut Insurance Company
Represented By: Monica Liliana Irel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Jon Michael Kendrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Advanced Roofing, Inc.
Represented By: Jon Michael Kendrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?