Securities and Exchange Commission v. Kouyoumdjian
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: Emmanuel Kouyoumdjian and Manny K.
Case Number: 0:2019cv61773
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: William P Dimitrouleas
Referring Judge: Lurana S Snow
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:0078
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING re #12 Motion for Extension of Time. (Copy of this Order mailed to Defendant as per Order). Responses due by 10/10/2019 Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 9/13/2019. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS TO PRO SE LITIGANTS. (Copy of this Order mailed to Plaintiff as per Order). Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 9/12/2019. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
September 9, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to engage representation by Emmanuel Kouyoumdjian. (Address Updated.) Responses due by 9/23/2019 (ebz)
September 4, 2019 Filing 11 FIRST Clerk's Notice of Undeliverable Mail re #9 Order,, Terminate Motions,, Set Answer Due Deadline,. US Mail returned for: Emmanuel Kouyoumdjian. The Court has not located an updated address for this party. After two undeliverable notices from the Court, notices will no longer be sent to this party in this case until a correct address is provided. (mp)
August 14, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Compliance Copy of Order Mailed To Defendant (cds)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Granting: #8 MOTION for Extension of Time to obtain a lawyer filed by Emmanuel Kouyoumdjian., Emmanuel Kouyoumdjian response due 9/9/2019. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 8/13/2019. See attached document for full details. (cds)
August 8, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to obtain a lawyer by Emmanuel Kouyoumdjian. Responses due by 8/22/2019 (ebz)
July 24, 2019 Filing 7 Clerks Notice to Filer re #5 Certificate of Service. Wrong Event Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. The document was re-docketed by the Clerk, see DE# 6 . It is not necessary to refile this document. (jas)
July 23, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Securities and Exchange Commission. Emmanuel Kouyoumdjian served on 7/19/2019, answer due 8/9/2019. (See DE#5 for image). (jas)
July 23, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Securities and Exchange Commission re #1 Complaint (Enright, John)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Requiring Counsel To Meet, File Joint Scheduling Report and Joint Discovery Report Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 7/18/2019. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Emmanuel Kouyoumdjian. (ebz)
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge William P. Dimitrouleas and Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ebz)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Emmanuel Kouyoumdjian. Filing fees $ 400.00. USA Filer - No Filing Fee Required, filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s), #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Enright, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Securities and Exchange Commission v. Kouyoumdjian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emmanuel Kouyoumdjian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manny K.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: John O. Enright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?