USA v. One 260-Foot, 1,973-Ton, Steel-Cargo Freighter, Registered in Tanzania and Built in 1977, Known as M/V Doris T, Identified BYIMO Number 7626748, Official Number 400335, Call Sign 5IM-730, and its equipment
Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: One 260-Foot, 1,973-Ton, Steel-Cargo Freighter, Registered in Tanzania and Built in 1977, Known as M/V Doris T, Identified BYIMO Number 7626748, Official Number 400335, Call Sign 5IM-730, and its equi
Claimant: Eva De Shipping LLC
Case Number: 0:2019cv61942
Filed: August 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Beth Bloom
Referring Judge: Alicia O Valle
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 19 U.S.C. ยง 1305
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Scheduling Mediation before Ellen Leesfield. Mediation Deadline 10/18/2019. Mediation Hearing set for 10/15/2019 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 9/19/2019. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
September 19, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Mediator Selection and Hearing. Added Ellen L. Leesfield. Mediation Hearing set for 10/15/2019 at 10:00 a.m.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Scheduling Mediation)(Becerra, Robert)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Order Setting Trial And Pre-Trial Schedule, Requiring Mediation, And Referring Certain Matters To Magistrate Judge: ( Amended Pleadings due by 10/28/2019., Discovery due by 12/31/2019., Expert Discovery due by 12/31/2019., Joinder of Parties due by 10/28/2019., Mediation Deadline 1/14/2020., In Limine Motions due by 1/22/2020., Dispositive Motions due by 1/22/2020., Motions due by 1/22/2020., Pretrial Stipulation due by 4/13/2020., Jury Trial set for 4/27/2020 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Beth Bloom., Calendar Call set for 4/21/2020 01:45 PM in Miami Division before Judge Beth Bloom.) ( Mediation Deadline 1/14/2020.) Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 8/29/2019. See attached document for full details. (kpe) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
August 28, 2019 Filing 14 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by USA (Brown, Richard)
August 28, 2019 Filing 13 Agreed Election to Jurisdiction for Final Disposition of Motions . Filed by USA (Brown, Richard)
August 28, 2019 Filing 12 Agreed SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by USA (Attachments: #1 Scheduling Order)(Brown, Richard)
August 27, 2019 Filing 11 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Eva De Shipping LLC (Becerra, Robert)
August 22, 2019 Filing 10 Warrant of Arrest In Rem Issued as to One 260-Foot, 1,973-Ton, Steel-Cargo Freighter, Registered in Tanzania and Built in 1977, Known as M/V Doris T, Identified BYIMO Number 7626748, Official Number 400335, Call Sign 5IM-730, and its equipment. Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 8/22/2019. See attached document for full details. (ar2)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DIRECTING THE ISSUANCE OF THE WARRANT OF ARREST AND/OR SUMMONS. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 8/22/2019. See attached document for full details. (ar2)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 8/22/2019. See attached document for full details. (ar2)
August 16, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing Warrant of Arrest In Rem by USA (Attachments: #1 Warrant) (Brown, Richard) Modified text on 8/16/2019 (kpe).
August 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PAPERLESS ORDER denying #5 Motion to Expedite for failure to comply with Local Rule 7.1(a)(3). Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 8/11/2019. (mpn)
August 9, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Expedite Discovery by Eva De Shipping LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint for Return of Property, #2 Exhibit Renewed Motion for Prelim Injunction, #3 Exhibit Claim and Cost Bond, #4 Exhibit Motion to Dismiss, #5 Exhibit Response to MTD, #6 Exhibit Order)(Becerra, Robert)
August 9, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Eva De Shipping LLC. (Becerra, Robert)
August 7, 2019 Filing 3 CLAIM Verified by Eva De Shipping LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Verified Claim)(Becerra, Robert)
August 2, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Beth Bloom. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (kpe)
August 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Forfeiture against One 260-Foot, 1,973-Ton, Steel-Cargo Freighter, Registered in Tanzaia and Built in 1977, Known as M/V Doris T, Identified BYIMO Number 7626748, Official Number 400335, Call Sign 5IM-730, and its equip. Filing fees $ 400.00. USA Filer - No Filing Fee Required, filed by USA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 JS 44, #3 Warrant)(Brown, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. One 260-Foot, 1,973-Ton, Steel-Cargo Freighter, Registered in Tanzania and Built in 1977, Known as M/V Doris T, Identified BYIMO Number 7626748, Official Number 400335, Call Sign 5IM-730, and its equipment
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Richard O.I. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One 260-Foot, 1,973-Ton, Steel-Cargo Freighter, Registered in Tanzania and Built in 1977, Known as M/V Doris T, Identified BYIMO Number 7626748, Official Number 400335, Call Sign 5IM-730, and its equi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Eva De Shipping LLC
Represented By: Robert John Becerra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?