Johnson v. Celebrity Cruises, Inc.
Plaintiff: Robert Johnson
Defendant: Celebrity Cruises, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2019cv62003
Filed: August 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Darrin P Gayles
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #1 Complaint with prejudice by Robert Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Patti, Thomas)
September 25, 2019 Filing 9 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Celebrity Cruises, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Royal Caribbean Cruises LTD for Celebrity Cruises, Inc. (Ross, Ian)
September 25, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #1 Complaint with prejudice by Celebrity Cruises, Inc.. Responses due by 10/9/2019 (Perdomo, Erica)
September 25, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Erica Perdomo on behalf of Celebrity Cruises, Inc.. Attorney Erica Perdomo added to party Celebrity Cruises, Inc.(pty:dft). (Perdomo, Erica)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant shall respond to the Complaint on or before September 25, 2019. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (hs01)
September 4, 2019 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint by Celebrity Cruises, Inc.. Attorney Ian M. Ross added to party Celebrity Cruises, Inc.(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ross, Ian)
August 19, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE. Unless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion shall be double-spaced in Times New Roman 12-point typeface. Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions. Failure to comply with ANY of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions, including but not limited to, the striking of the motion or dismissal of this action. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (hs01)
August 12, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Celebrity Cruises, Inc. (mc)
August 9, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Darrin P. Gayles. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (mc)
August 9, 2019 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against Celebrity Cruises, Inc.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11891241, filed by Robert Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Hindi, Jibrael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Celebrity Cruises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Johnson
Represented By: Jibrael Jarallah Said Hindi
Represented By: Thomas John Patti, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Celebrity Cruises, Inc.
Represented By: Ian M. Ross
Represented By: Erica Perdomo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?