Kennedy v. Truman Hotel, Inc.
Plaintiff: Patricia Kennedy
Defendant: Truman Hotel, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2019cv62018
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Rodolfo A Ruiz
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12182
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE by Patricia Kennedy re #18 Order to File Inspection Reports (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit) (Edwards, Theresa)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SCHEDULING ORDER. Jury Trial set for 5/26/2020 before Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz. Calendar Call set for 5/19/2020. Amended Pleadings due by 11/17/2019. Mediation Deadline 2/3/2020. Motions due by 2/11/2020. Pretrial Stipulation due by 3/10/2020. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz on 10/7/2019. See attached document for full details. (fc)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER In Actions Brought Under The Americans With Disabilities Act. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz on 10/7/2019. See attached document for full details. (fc)
September 26, 2019 Filing 17 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Patricia Kennedy (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Edwards, Theresa)
September 26, 2019 Filing 16 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Truman Hotel, Inc. (Blair, Brian)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER STRIKING #13 and #14 Initial Disclosure(s) filed by Patricia Kennedy. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz on 9/24/2019. See attached document for full details. (fc)
September 21, 2019 Filing 14 STRICKEN PER DE #15 .. Initial Disclosure(s) of Expert Witnesses by Patricia Kennedy (Edwards, Theresa) Modified on 9/25/2019 (lbc).
September 21, 2019 Filing 13 STRICKEN PER DE #15 .. Initial Disclosure(s) of Rule 26 by Patricia Kennedy (Edwards, Theresa) Modified on 9/25/2019 (lbc).
September 21, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Compliance with Order of 8-28-2019 by Patricia Kennedy re #8 Order (Edwards, Theresa)
September 16, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Truman Hotel, Inc.. (Blair, Brian)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING IN PART #9 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Defendant shall respond to the Complaint by no later than September 16, 2019. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz on 9/4/2019. (fc)
August 30, 2019 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint by Truman Hotel, Inc.. Attorney Brian Clayborne Blair added to party Truman Hotel, Inc.(pty:dft). (Blair, Brian)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Requiring Joint Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties by September 26, 2019. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz on 8/28/2019. See attached document for full details. (fc)
August 14, 2019 Filing 7 Statement of: Prior ADA Filings by Patricia Kennedy (Edwards, Theresa)
August 14, 2019 Filing 6 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Patricia Kennedy (Edwards, Theresa)
August 14, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of NO Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by Patricia Kennedy (Edwards, Theresa)
August 13, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Truman Hotel, Inc. (vmz)
August 13, 2019 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Alias Not Added. The Filer failed to add the alias information for the party(ies). The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (vmz)
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (vmz)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Truman Hotel, Inc.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11895693, filed by Patricia Kennedy. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Edwards, Theresa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kennedy v. Truman Hotel, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Truman Hotel, Inc.
Represented By: Brian Clayborne Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Kennedy
Represented By: Theresa Bland Edwards
Represented By: Thomas B. Bacon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?