Sergueevitchev v. Dania Beach Quarterdeck, LLC
Plaintiff: Serge Sergueevitchev
Defendant: Dania Beach Quarterdeck, LLC
Case Number: 0:2019cv62019
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: William P Dimitrouleas
Referring Judge: Lurana S Snow
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:12182
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Motion. Re: #12 First MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #1 Complaint, filed by Dania Beach Quarterdeck, LLC. Responses due by 10/11/2019 Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 10/2/2019. See attached document for full details. (cds)
October 1, 2019 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #12 First MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #1 Complaint, by Serge Sergueevitchev. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gleizer, Ronnette)
September 17, 2019 Filing 12 First MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #1 Complaint, by Dania Beach Quarterdeck, LLC. Responses due by 10/1/2019 (Lancos, Joseph)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING: #9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to complaint filed by Dania Beach Quarterdeck, LLC., Dania Beach Quarterdeck, LLC response due 9/18/2019. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 9/5/2019. See attached document for full details. (cds)
August 30, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joseph Brian Lancos on behalf of Dania Beach Quarterdeck, LLC. Attorney Joseph Brian Lancos added to party Dania Beach Quarterdeck, LLC(pty:dft). (Lancos, Joseph)
August 30, 2019 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to complaint by Dania Beach Quarterdeck, LLC. Responses due by 9/13/2019 (Lehrer, Ryan)
August 30, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ryan H. Lehrer on behalf of Dania Beach Quarterdeck, LLC. Attorney Ryan H. Lehrer added to party Dania Beach Quarterdeck, LLC(pty:dft). (Lehrer, Ryan)
August 23, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Serge Sergueevitchev. Dania Beach Quarterdeck, LLC served on 8/14/2019, answer due 9/4/2019. (Gleizer, Ronnette)
August 14, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Counsel re #5 Order of Requirements, Regarding Any Prior Filings Under the Americans With Disabilities Act by Ronnette Gleizer on behalf of Serge Sergueevitchev (Gleizer, Ronnette)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REQUIRING CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL REGARDING ANY PRIOR FILINGS UNDER THE AMERICANS WITH DISABILITIES ACT. Plaintiffs counsel shall file withthe Clerk of the Court the verified statement responding to the questions promulgated above on or before August 21, 2019. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 8/14/2019. See attached document for full details. (cds)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REQUIRING COUNSEL TO MEET, FILE JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT AND JOINT DISCOVERY REPORT. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 8/14/2019. See attached document for full details. (cds)
August 12, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Dania Beach Quarterdeck, LLC. (cds)
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge William P. Dimitrouleas and Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (cds)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against Dania Beach Quarterdeck, LLC. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11895704, filed by Serge Sergueevitchev. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Gleizer, Ronnette)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sergueevitchev v. Dania Beach Quarterdeck, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Serge Sergueevitchev
Represented By: Ronnette Gleizer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dania Beach Quarterdeck, LLC
Represented By: Ryan H. Lehrer
Represented By: Joseph Brian Lancos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?