Geiger et al v. 3300 Corp.
Plaintiff: Paola Canas, Maysa Quy, Claudia Sampedro, Cielo Jean Gibson and Brenda Lynn Geiger
Defendant: 3300 Corp.
Case Number: 0:2019cv62024
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Rodolfo A Ruiz
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Stay re #5 Summons Returned Executed, #4 Order to Show Cause, #7 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS, TO STRIKE, FOR A MOTION DEFINITE STATEMENT, AND TO SEVER, #6 Not filed by Paola Canas, Brenda Lynn Geiger, Cielo Jean Gibson, Maysa Quy, Claudia Sampedro. Replies due by 10/18/2019. (Khomiak, Ludmila)
October 11, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS, TO STRIKE, FOR A MOTION DEFINITE STATEMENT, AND TO SEVER filed by Paola Canas, Brenda Lynn Geiger, Cielo Jean Gibson, Maysa Quy, Claudia Sampedro. Replies due by 10/18/2019. (Khomiak, Ludmila)
October 6, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Stay re #5 Summons Returned Executed, #4 Order to Show Cause, #7 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS, TO STRIKE, FOR A MOTION DEFINITE STATEMENT, AND TO SEVER, #6 Notice of Attorney Appearance, #3 Summons Issued, 2 Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment, #1 Complaint, DEFENDANTS MOTION TO STAY THIS LITIGATION PENDING THE OUTCOME OF THE ELEVENTH CIRCUIT COURT OF APPEALS DECISION IN EDMONSON ET AL. V. 2001LIVE, INC., NO. 19-10619 (11TH CIR.) by 3300 Corp.. Responses due by 10/21/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Appellants' Initial Brief in Edmonson et al. v. 2001LIVE, Inc., NO. 19-10619 (11th Cir.), #2 Exhibit Appellees' Answer Brief in Edmonson et al. v. 2001LIVE, Inc., NO. 19-10619 (11th Cir.))(O'Brien, Cullin)
October 2, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS, TO STRIKE, FOR A MOTION DEFINITE STATEMENT, AND TO SEVER by 3300 Corp.. Responses due by 10/16/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Geiger et al. v. Goldfingers South, Inc., 1:18-cv-23745-UU [Dkt. No. 34, at pg. 2] (S.D. Fla. Apr. 1, 2019), #2 Exhibit Geiger et al. v. Goldfingers South, Inc., 1:18-cv-23745-UU [Dkt. No. 4 (text entry) (S.D. Fla. Sept. 14, 2018), #3 Exhibit Cerny et al. v. The Boulevard Del, Inc., No: 6:18-cv-1808-Orl-22TBS [Dkt. No. 18, at pg. 18] (M.D. Fla. July 11, 2019))(O'Brien, Cullin)
October 2, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Cullin Avram O'Brien on behalf of 3300 Corp.. Attorney Cullin Avram O'Brien added to party 3300 Corp. (pty:dft). (O'Brien, Cullin)
September 18, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Maysa Quy, Brenda Lynn Geiger, Claudia Sampedro, Cielo Jean Gibson, Paola Canas. 3300 Corp. served on 9/11/2019, answer due 10/2/2019. (Khomiak, Ludmila)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO PERFECT SERVICE. On or before November 12, 2019, Plaintiff shall perfect service upon the Defendant or show cause why this action should not be dismissed for failure to perfect service of process. See attached document for full details. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz on 9/12/2019. (mhn)
August 14, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to 3300 Corp. (drz)
August 13, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (drz)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 3300 Corp.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11899643, filed by Maysa Quy, Brenda Lynn Geiger, Claudia Sampedro, Cielo Jean Gibson, Paola Canas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Summon(s))(Khomiak, Ludmila)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Geiger et al v. 3300 Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3300 Corp.
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paola Canas
Represented By: Ludmila Khomiak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maysa Quy
Represented By: Ludmila Khomiak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claudia Sampedro
Represented By: Ludmila Khomiak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cielo Jean Gibson
Represented By: Ludmila Khomiak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Lynn Geiger
Represented By: Ludmila Khomiak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?