WRIGHT v. WASTE PRO USA, INC. et al
Plaintiff: ANTHONY WRIGHT, Randolph Mobley, Shawn Murphy, William J Robinson, Maurice McDonald, Ronald Jr. Stout, James Dean, Eric E Gray, Gregory L Julius, Reynaldo Ruiz, Kenneth W Green, Vanessa Thomas, Carlos valdes, Daniel J Goodson, Nathaniel Ray, Eddie L Allen, Alejandro J. Rodriguez, Randolph Mitchell, William Frison, Angela Dondero, D'Angelo Coates, Joseph Jernigan, Devon Doulgas, Eula Allen, Donald Wright, Shawn Newkirk, Loubert Aristil, Richard Forness, Tony Weaver, Willie Mincey, Owen Reed, Antonio M. Blake, Damian Suers, Johnny Harris, Antonio Ford, Jesus Ordonez, Carlos Garrett, Eugene L Edwards, Charlie Boyd, Alton Hooks, Latroy Jackson, Andrew James, Steve Benjamin, Eddie Lopez, Offie J Essix, Bryan Empringham, Christopher R. Williams, Jr., Lambert Wright, Kenneth A Noren, Edner Philistin, Juan Ramos, Brandon Dean, Walter Rice, Dan Jermone Jackson, Kelvin Little, Shannon Kigoro, Charlene Alshire, Junior Andrew, Jeremy Kenner, Jesus Manzo, Teresa Taylor, Anthony Rodriguez, Thomas Griffin, Jewann Smith, Anthony Mitchell and Eric Semmler
Defendant: WASTE PRO OF FLORIDA, INC. and WASTE PRO USA, INC.
Case Number: 0:2019cv62051
Filed: August 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Patrick M Hunt
Referring Judge: K Michael Moore
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:0201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 PAPERLESS ORDER. THIS CAUSE came before the Court upon Plaintiff's filing of an Amended Complaint. #37 . The Amended Complaint moots Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. #31 . Accordingly, UPON CONSIDERATION of the Amended Complaint #37 , the pertinent portions of the record, and being otherwise fully advised in the premises, it is ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that Defendants' Motion to Dismiss #31 is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Chief Judge K. Michael Moore on 10/7/2019. (mgh)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 PAPERLESS ORDER RESCHEDULING Settlement Conference - reset for Tuesday, 1/7/2020, 09:30 a.m. in Fort Lauderdale Division before Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt. The parties are still bound by the requirements in ECF No. 8. Please review same carefully. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt on 10/3/2019. (sl00)
October 2, 2019 Filing 37 First AMENDED COMPLAINT COLLECTIVE ACTION against All Defendants, filed by ANTHONY WRIGHT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F-1, #7 Exhibit F-2, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R, #20 Exhibit S, #21 Exhibit T)(Botros, Paul)
September 24, 2019 Filing 36 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on #35 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): rew James and Juan Ramos. (Botros, Paul)
September 24, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by Paul M. Botros on behalf of ANTHONY WRIGHT (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Botros, Paul)
September 24, 2019 Filing 34 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on #33 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Willie Mincey. (Botros, Paul)
September 24, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by Paul M. Botros on behalf of ANTHONY WRIGHT (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Botros, Paul)
September 20, 2019 Filing 32 Defendant's RESPONSE to Plaintiff's Statement of Claim by WASTE PRO OF FLORIDA, INC., WASTE PRO USA, INC.. (Tingley, Amy)
September 18, 2019 Filing 31 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by WASTE PRO OF FLORIDA, INC., WASTE PRO USA, INC.. Responses due by 10/2/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Tingley, Amy)
September 17, 2019 Filing 30 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on #29 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Charlene Alshire and Shannon Kigoro. (Botros, Paul)
September 17, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by Paul M. Botros on behalf of ANTHONY WRIGHT (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- consents) (Botros, Paul)
September 16, 2019 Set/Reset Answer Due Deadline: WASTE PRO OF FLORIDA, INC. response due 9/18/2019; WASTE PRO USA, INC. response due 9/18/2019. SEE DE 28 ORDER (ail)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 PAPERLESS ORDER. THIS CAUSE came before the Court upon Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. #27 . UPON CONSIDERATION of the Motion, the pertinent portions of the record, and being otherwise fully advised in the premises, it is hereby ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Motion for Extension of Time #27 is GRANTED. Defendants shall file a response to the Complaint on or before September 18, 2019. Signed by Chief Judge K. Michael Moore on 9/16/2019. (eso)
September 13, 2019 Filing 27 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint, by WASTE PRO OF FLORIDA, INC., WASTE PRO USA, INC.. (Tingley, Amy)
September 13, 2019 Filing 26 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by ANTHONY WRIGHT. WASTE PRO USA, INC. served on 8/26/2019, answer due 9/16/2019. (Botros, Paul)
September 13, 2019 Filing 25 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by ANTHONY WRIGHT. WASTE PRO OF FLORIDA, INC. served on 8/26/2019, answer due 9/16/2019. (Botros, Paul)
September 12, 2019 Filing 24 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on #23 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): James Dean. (Botros, Paul)
September 12, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by Paul M. Botros on behalf of ANTHONY WRIGHT (Attachments: #1 Exhibit a) (Botros, Paul)
September 11, 2019 Filing 22 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on #21 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Joseph Jernigan, Edner Philistin, Walter Rice, Carlos Garrett and Eddie L Allen. (Botros, Paul)
September 11, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by Paul M. Botros on behalf of ANTHONY WRIGHT (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Botros, Paul)
September 10, 2019 Filing 20 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on #19 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Antonio M. Blake, Bryan Empringham, Lambert Wright, Vanessa Thomas, Nathaniel Ray and Angela Dondero. (Botros, Paul)
September 10, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by Paul M. Botros on behalf of ANTHONY WRIGHT (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Botros, Paul)
September 10, 2019 Filing 18 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on #12 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Anthony Rodriguez, Steve Benjamin, D'Angelo Coates, Brandon Dean, Eugene L Edwards, Antonio Ford, Thomas Griffin, Dan Jermone Jackson, Latroy Jackson, Gregory L Julius, Eddie Lopez, Kelvin Little, Anthony Mitchell, Randolph Mitchell, Alejandro J. Rodriguez and Christopher R. Williams, Jr.. (Botros, Paul)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 PAPERLESS ORDER. THIS CAUSE came before the Court upon a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filings. #15 . UPON CONSIDERATION of the Motion, the pertinent portions of the record, and being otherwise fully advised in the premises, it is ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Motion is GRANTED. Austin W. Anderson may appear Pro Hac Vice in this matter. The Clerk of the Court shall provide electronic notification of all electronic filings to team@a2xlaw.com. Signed by Chief Judge K. Michael Moore on 9/9/2019. (jm01)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PAPERLESS ORDER. THIS CAUSE came before the Court upon a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filings. #14 . UPON CONSIDERATION of the Motion, the pertinent portions of the record, and being otherwise fully advised in the premises, it is ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Motion is GRANTED. William C. Alexander may appear Pro Hac Vice in this matter. The Clerk of the Court shall provide electronic notification of all electronic filings to team@a2xlaw.com. Signed by Chief Judge K. Michael Moore on 9/9/2019. (jm01)
September 6, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Austin W. Anderson. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11961460 by ANTHONY WRIGHT. Responses due by 9/20/2019 (Morgan, C.)
September 6, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for William C. Alexander. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11961414 by ANTHONY WRIGHT. Responses due by 9/20/2019 (Morgan, C.)
September 5, 2019 Filing 13 Statement of: Claim by ANTHONY WRIGHT re 4 Pretrial Order,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, (Botros, Paul)
August 30, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by Paul M. Botros on behalf of ANTHONY WRIGHT (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Botros, Paul)
August 28, 2019 Filing 11 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on 10 Clerks Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Junior Andrew, Offie J Essix, Devon Doulgas, Charlie Boyd, Eric E Gray, Eula Allen, Johnny Harris, William Frison, Loubert Aristil, Kenneth W Green, Richard Forness, Jeremy Kenner, Jesus Manzo, Daniel J Goodson, Carlos valdes, William J Robinson, Owen Reed, Ronald Jr. Stout, Jewann Smith, Damian Suers, Kenneth A Noren, Jesus Ordonez, Randolph Mobley, Donald Wright, Reynaldo Ruiz, Teresa Taylor, Eric Semmler, Tony Weaver, Alton Hooks, Shawn Murphy, Shawn Newkirk and Maurice McDonald. (Botros, Paul)
August 27, 2019 Filing 10 Clerks Notice to Filer re #9 Notice of Consent to Join. Parties Not Added; ERROR - The Filer failed to add all consenting parties. Filer is instructed to file a Notice of Entry of Parties and add the additional parties to Case. (ail)
August 27, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by Paul M. Botros on behalf of ANTHONY WRIGHT (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Botros, Paul)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Scheduling Settlement Conference - set for Monday, 10/7/2019, at 9:30 a.m. in Fort Lauderdale Division before Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt. See attached document for full details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt on 8/26/2019. (sl00)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 GENERAL ORDER ON DISCOVERY OBJECTIONS AND PROCEDURES BEFORE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE PATRICK M. HUNT. The parties should carefully review the Order in that it requires expedited briefing, provides for modified page limitations and special conferral requirements before a motion is filed, limits the type of permissible discovery objections as well as modifying other discovery procedures. See attached document for full details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt on 8/21/2019. (sl00)
August 20, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Amy S. Tingley on behalf of WASTE PRO OF FLORIDA, INC., WASTE PRO USA, INC.. Attorney Amy S. Tingley added to party WASTE PRO OF FLORIDA, INC.(pty:dft), Attorney Amy S. Tingley added to party WASTE PRO USA, INC.(pty:dft). (Tingley, Amy)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PAPERLESS ORDER REFERRING PRETRIAL DISCOVERY MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE PATRICK M. HUNT. PURSUANT to 28 U.S.C. 636 and the Magistrate Rules of the Local Rules of the Southern District of Florida, the above-captioned Cause is referred to United States Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt to take all necessary and proper action as required by law with respect to any and all pretrial discovery matters. Any motion affecting deadlines set by the Court's Scheduling Order is excluded from this referral, unless specifically referred by separate Order. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall comply with Magistrate Judge Hunt's discovery procedures. Signed by Chief Judge K. Michael Moore on 8/16/2019. (eso)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PAPERLESS NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE IN FAIR LABOR STANDARDS ACT CASES AND REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. This is a Fair Labor Standards Act case in which Plaintiff seeks unpaid wages. In order to assist the Court in the management of the case, and in an effort to foster its early and cost effective resolution, the Parties are hereby ordered that: 1. Plaintiff shall file a Statement of Claim (the Statement) setting forth the amount of alleged unpaid wages, the calculation of such wages, and the nature of the wages (e.g., overtime or regular) within twenty (20) days from the date of this Notice. Plaintiff shall promptly serve a copy of this Notice, the Statement, and copies of all documents supporting Plaintiff's claims (e.g., time sheets, pay stubs, etc.), on Defendant's counsel when counsel for Defendant first appears in the case or at the time of filing if Defendant's counsel has already appeared. The Statement shall include all attorneys fees and costs incurred to date. With respect to attorney's fees, provide the hourly rate sought and the number of hours expended by each person billing time. 2. Defendant shall file a Response within fifteen (15) days of receiving service of Plaintiff's statement. This Response shall set forth in detail Defendants defenses to Plaintiff's claims. Defendant shall serve copies of all documents in support thereof on Plaintiff. 3. Referral to Magistrate for Settlement Conference. Pursuant to Rule 1 of the Magistrate Rules of the Southern District of Florida, the Parties shall conduct a Settlement Conference before Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt within twenty (20) days after the date that Defendant's Response is due. Plaintiff's counsel must confer with defense counsel and contact the Chambers of Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt on, or before, the date that Defendant's Response is due to schedule a date for the Settlement Conference. The Settlement Conference date may not be extended without prior approval from Magistrate Judge Hunt. Absent an extension from Magistrate Judge Hunt, the Parties shall complete their Settlement Conference within fifty-five (55) days of this Notice. If the Parties reach an agreement during the Settlement Conference the Parties shall file the agreement with the undersigned within five (5) days of the Settlement Conference. If the Parties wish to file the settlement agreement as a sealed document, they must file a Motion to Seal that provides compelling reasons for the Court to allow them to do so. See Brown v. Advantage Eng'g, Inc., 960 F.2d 1013, 1016 (11th Cir. 1992) ("If a settlement agreement is filed with the court for approval or interpretation, then the parties must demonstrate extraordinary circumstances in order to deny the public access to the agreement."); see also Hanson v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., No. 08-80182-CIV, 2009 WL 1490582, at *1 (S.D. Fla. May 26, 2009) ("'[A] business's general interest in keeping its legal proceedings private does not overcome the presumption of openness' in FLSA cases.") (citing Stalnaker v. Novar Corp., 293 F. Supp. 2d 1260, 1264 (M.D. Ala. 2003)). The undersigned will review the agreement and determine whether it is a fair and reasonable resolution of a bona fide dispute over FLSA issues. See Lynn's Food Stores, Inc. v. United States, 679 F.2d 1350 (11th Cir. 1982). If the Court approves the settlement, the Court will enter a final order of dismissal with prejudice. If no settlement is reached, the Parties shall file a Joint Scheduling Report within fourteen (14) days after the Settlement Conference. 4. Except as provided under Local Rule 16.2.E for public-sector entities, the appearance of counsel and each party, or representatives of each party with full authority to enter into a full and complete compromise and settlement, is mandatory. Appearance shall be in person; telephonic appearance is prohibited. If insurance is involved, an adjuster with authority up to the policy limits or the most recent demand, whichever is lower, shall attend. 5. All discussions, representations and statements made at the settlement conference shall be confidential and privileged. Nothing disclosed in the settlement conference can be used for any purpose except settlement. 6. Settlement. If this case is settled, counsel must inform the Court within three (3) days by calling Chambers. 7. Pursuant to Administrative Order 2016-70 of the Southern District of Florida and consistent with the Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit's Local Rules and Internal Operating Procedures, within three days of the conclusion of a trial or other proceeding, parties must file via CM/ECF electronic versions of documentary exhibits admitted into evidence, including photographs of non-documentary physical exhibits. The Parties are directed to comply with each of the requirements set forth in Administrative Order 2016-70 unless directed otherwise by the Court. 8. Non-compliance with Order. Non-compliance with any provision of this Order, the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and/or the Local Rules of Court, may subject the offending party to sanctions or dismissal. It is the duty of all counsel to take all actions necessary to comply with this Order to ensure an expeditious resolution of this matter. Signed by Chief Judge K. Michael Moore on 8/16/2019. (eso)
August 15, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to WASTE PRO OF FLORIDA, INC., WASTE PRO USA, INC.. (amb)
August 15, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Chief Judge K. Michael Moore. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (amb)
August 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Collective Action and Demand for Jury Trial against WASTE PRO OF FLORIDA, INC., WASTE PRO USA, INC.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11903963, filed by ANTHONY WRIGHT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consents to Join, #2 Exhibit B - Sunbiz Corporate Reports, #3 Exhibit C - Audit, #4 Exhibit D - Declaration, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Summon(s), #7 Summon(s))(Botros, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WRIGHT v. WASTE PRO USA, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WASTE PRO OF FLORIDA, INC.
Represented By: Amy S. Tingley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WASTE PRO USA, INC.
Represented By: Amy S. Tingley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTHONY WRIGHT
Represented By: Paul M. Botros
Represented By: C. Ryan Morgan
Represented By: Austin W. Anderson
Represented By: William C. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randolph Mobley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William J Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maurice McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Jr. Stout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Dean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric E Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory L Julius
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reynaldo Ruiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth W Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vanessa Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos valdes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel J Goodson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathaniel Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eddie L Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alejandro J. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randolph Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Frison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Dondero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D'Angelo Coates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Jernigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Devon Doulgas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eula Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn Newkirk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Loubert Aristil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Forness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tony Weaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Mincey
Represented By: Paul M. Botros
Represented By: C. Ryan Morgan
Represented By: Austin W. Anderson
Represented By: William C. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Owen Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio M. Blake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Damian Suers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnny Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesus Ordonez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugene L Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlie Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alton Hooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latroy Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Benjamin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eddie Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Offie J Essix
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan Empringham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher R. Williams, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lambert Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth A Noren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edner Philistin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Ramos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Dean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dan Jermone Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelvin Little
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon Kigoro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlene Alshire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Junior Andrew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Kenner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesus Manzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jewann Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Semmler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?