Carver v. Mogerman et al
Plaintiff: Timothy J Carver
Defendant: Richard Mark Mogerman and Richard M. Mogerman, P.A.
Case Number: 0:2019cv62097
Filed: August 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Rodney Smith
Referring Judge: Alicia O Valle
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MEDIATION. Mediator Selection Deadline 12/20/2019. Mediation Deadline 7/10/2020. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 10/10/2019. See attached document for full details. (dco)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: ( Jury Trial set for 9/14/2020 in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Rodney Smith., Calendar Call set for 9/8/2020 09:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Rodney Smith., Amended Pleadings due by 1/6/2020., Expert Discovery due by 7/31/2020., Fact Discovery due by 6/12/2020., Joinder of Parties due by 1/6/2020., Mediation Deadline 7/10/2020., In Limine Motions due by 8/17/2020., Dispositive Motions due by 6/19/2020., Motions due by 8/17/2020., Pretrial Stipulation due by 8/17/2020.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle for Pretrial Non-Dispositive Matters. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 10/10/2019. See attached document for full details. (dco) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
October 4, 2019 Filing 9 Joint Notice and Consent to Jurisdiction US Magistrate Judge signed by all parties . Filed by Richard Mark Mogerman, Richard M. Mogerman, P.A. (Sando, Blake)
September 26, 2019 Filing 8 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by Timothy J Carver (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Kellogg, Jason)
September 18, 2019 Filing 7 Defendants' ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Richard Mark Mogerman, Richard M. Mogerman, P.A.. Attorney Blake S. Sando added to party Richard Mark Mogerman(pty:dft), Attorney Blake S. Sando added to party Richard M. Mogerman, P.A.(pty:dft). (Sando, Blake)
September 4, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Timothy J Carver. Richard M. Mogerman, P.A. served on 8/28/2019, answer due 9/18/2019. (Kellogg, Jason)
September 4, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Timothy J Carver. Richard Mark Mogerman served on 8/28/2019, answer due 9/18/2019. (Kellogg, Jason)
August 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REQUIRING JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT, CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES AND CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Joint Scheduling Report due by 10/1/2019. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 8/31/2019. See attached document for full details. (dco)
August 20, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Richard Mark Mogerman, Richard M. Mogerman, P.A.. (mee)
August 20, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodney Smith. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (mee)
August 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11918324, filed by Timothy J Carver. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s))(Kellogg, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carver v. Mogerman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy J Carver
Represented By: Jason Kenneth Kellogg
Represented By: Tal Aburos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Mark Mogerman
Represented By: Blake S. Sando
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard M. Mogerman, P.A.
Represented By: Blake S. Sando
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?