NorthStar Moving Holding Company, Inc. v. Northstar Movers, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: NorthStar Moving Holding Company, Inc.
Defendant: Ohad Guzi, David Sustiel, Northstar Movers, Inc., Gio Guzi, Giovanni Guzi, King David Van Lines, Chad Guzi and Itzhak Bokobza
Case Number: 0:2019cv62176
Filed: August 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2019 Filing 28 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint,, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Amended Motion to Dismiss by Itzhak Bokobza, Ohad Guzi, NorthStar Movers. Responses due by 11/8/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Sunbiz Records, #2 Exhibit Fictitious Name Registration)(Solnick, Peter)
October 23, 2019 Filing 27 ANSWER to Complaint by King David Van Lines. (Solnick, Peter)
October 23, 2019 Filing 26 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint,, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Itzhak Bokobza, Ohad Guzi, NorthStar Movers. Responses due by 11/6/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Sunbiz Records, #2 Exhibit Fictitious Name Registration)(Solnick, Peter)
October 22, 2019 Reset Answer Due Deadline: Itzhak Bokobza response due 11/1/2019; Ohad Guzi response due 11/1/2019; King David Van Lines response due 11/1/2019; NorthStar Movers response due 11/1/2019. (ls)(per DE #25)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #23 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Defendants NORTHSTAR MOVERS, KING DAVID VAN LINES, OHAD GUZI, and ITZHAK BOKOBZA shall respond to the Complaint on or before November 1, 2019. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 10/22/2019. (mkz)
October 22, 2019 Filing 24 Clerks Notice to Filer re #23 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to file a response to the Complaint re #1 Complaint,,. Wrong Motion Relief(s) Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong motion relief(s) when docketing the motion. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but future motions filed must include applicable reliefs. (ls)
October 22, 2019 Filing 23 Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint by Itzhak Bokobza, Ohad Guzi, King David Van Lines, NorthStar Movers. Responses due by 11/5/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Email exchange between counsel)(Solnick, Peter) Modified Relief on 10/22/2019 (ls).
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 Supplemental Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to a Complaint or Other Case Initiating Document Itzhak Bokobza. Answer due 10/22/2019; Ohad Guzi. Answer due 10/22/2019; King David Van Lines. Answer due 10/22/2019; NorthStar Movers. Answer due 10/22/2019. Re: #1 Complaint,, filed by NorthStar Moving Holding Company, Inc.. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 10/4/2019. See attached document for full details. (ls)
October 2, 2019 Filing 21 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to Set/Reset Deadlines, 20 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer, #1 Complaint,, by Itzhak Bokobza, Ohad Guzi, King David Van Lines, NorthStar Movers. (Solnick, Peter)
October 1, 2019 Reset Answer Due Deadline: Itzhak Bokobza response due 10/2/2019; King David Van Lines response due 10/2/2019; NorthStar Movers response due 10/2/2019. (ls)(per DE #20)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Defendants NORTHSTAR MOVERS, KING DAVID VAN LINES, and ITZHAK BOKOBZA and OHAD GUZI shall respond to the Complaint on or before October 2, 2019. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 10/1/2019. (mkz)
September 27, 2019 Filing 19 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint,, by Itzhak Bokobza, Ohad Guzi, King David Van Lines, NorthStar Movers. (Solnick, Peter)
September 27, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Peter J. Solnick on behalf of Itzhak Bokobza, Ohad Guzi, King David Van Lines, NorthStar Movers. Attorney Peter J. Solnick added to party Itzhak Bokobza(pty:dft), Attorney Peter J. Solnick added to party Ohad Guzi(pty:dft), Attorney Peter J. Solnick added to party King David Van Lines(pty:dft), Attorney Peter J. Solnick added to party NorthStar Movers(pty:dft). (Solnick, Peter)
September 26, 2019 Filing 17 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by NorthStar Moving Holding Company, Inc.. Ohad Guzi served on 9/11/2019, answer due 10/2/2019. (Bain, Joseph)
September 26, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by NorthStar Moving Holding Company, Inc.. NorthStar Movers served on 9/7/2019, answer due 9/30/2019. (Bain, Joseph)
September 26, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by NorthStar Moving Holding Company, Inc.. King David Van Lines served on 9/7/2019, answer due 9/30/2019. (Bain, Joseph)
September 26, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by NorthStar Moving Holding Company, Inc.. Itzhak Bokobza served on 9/7/2019, answer due 9/30/2019. (Bain, Joseph)
September 6, 2019 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to King David Van Lines. (jas)
September 5, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) King David Van Lines by NorthStar Moving Holding Company, Inc. (Bain, Joseph)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney(s) Deborah A. Gubernick. The Court reserves the power to withdraw permission for special appearance prior to and during the time of trial. Failure to abide by any Court order or failure to appear at any scheduled matter may result in immediate revocation of counsels pro hac vice status. Local counsel must be ready to adequately represent the party at any time, including conducting the actual trial. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 9/5/2019. (mkz)
September 5, 2019 Attorney Deborah A. Gubernick representing NorthStar Moving Holding Company, Inc. (Plaintiff) Activated. (cco)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 9/4/2019. See attached document for full details. (ls)
September 4, 2019 Filing 9 Second MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Deborah A. Gubernick. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Amended/Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filed - Filing Fees Previously Paid. See #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, by NorthStar Moving Holding Company, Inc.. Responses due by 9/18/2019 (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Bain, Joseph)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PAPERLESS ORDER denying #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney(s) Deborah A. Gubernick of Attorney Deborah A. Gubernick Notice of Termination delivered by US Mail to Deborah Gubernick.. The Clerk's Office has informed the undersigned that local counsel did not comply with all requirements, as follows: Local counsel did not consent to electronically serve all documents and things that may be served electronically or consent to serving documents in compliance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. (sample motion can be found on the Courts website). Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Motion [DE 6] is hereby DENIED without prejudice to refile in accordance with Local Rules and CM/ECF procedures. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 9/4/2019. (mkz)
September 4, 2019 Filing 7 SUPPLEMENT Corrected Summons re: King David Van Lines by NorthStar Moving Holding Company, Inc. (Bain, Joseph)
September 3, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Deborah A. Gubernick. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11951796 by NorthStar Moving Holding Company, Inc.. Responses due by 9/17/2019 (Attachments: #1 Certification of Deborah A. Gubernick, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Bain, Joseph)
August 30, 2019 Filing 5 FORM AO 120 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. PATENT AND TRADEMARK (pcs)
August 30, 2019 Filing 4 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Summons(es) cannot be issued as to King David Van Lines. The party(ies) on the summons(es) does not match the initiating documents (pcs)
August 30, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Itzhak Bokobza, Ohad Guzi, NorthStar Movers, David Sustiel. (pcs)
August 29, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge William P. Dimitrouleas and Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pcs)
August 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11946606, filed by NorthStar Moving Holding Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s) Northstar Movers, #3 Summon(s) King David Van Lines, #4 Summon(s) Ohad Guzi, #5 Summon(s) David Sustiel, #6 Summon(s) Itzhak Bokobza, #7 Exhibit 1, #8 Exhibit 2, #9 Exhibit 3, #10 Exhibit 4, #11 Exhibit 5, #12 Exhibit 6, #13 Exhibit 7, #14 Exhibit 8, #15 Exhibit 9, #16 Exhibit 10, #17 Exhibit 11)(Bain, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NorthStar Moving Holding Company, Inc. v. Northstar Movers, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ohad Guzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Sustiel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northstar Movers, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gio Guzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Giovanni Guzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: King David Van Lines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Guzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Itzhak Bokobza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NorthStar Moving Holding Company, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph William Bain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?