Jackson et al v. Le Centre on Fourth, LLC et al
Appellant: Willie Jackson and Nina Jackson
Appellee: United States Trustee, Le Centre on Fourth, LLC, Al J. Schneider Co. and Le Centre on Fourth Master Tenant, LLC
Case Number: 0:2019cv62199
Filed: September 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Darrin P Gayles
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2019 Filing 14 Bankruptcy Notice of Entry pursuant to Rule 8018 and NOTICE TO ATTORNEY - Pursuant to the Southern District of Florida Local Rules, and the Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure, the Appellant has 30 days after the docketing of the Bankruptcy Transmittal of Designated Record to District Court to serve and file a brief. The Appellee shall serve and file a response brief within 30 days after service of Appellant's brief. The Appellant shall serve and file a reply brief within 14 days after service of the Appelle's brief. Appellant Brief due by 11/18/2019. (jc)
October 18, 2019 Filing 13 BANKRUPTCY TRANSCRIPT of Hearing held on 7/9/2019 before Judge Raymond B. Ray, Volume Number 1 of 1, 1-31 pages, Court Reporter: Cheryl L. Jenkins. Telephone number: (305) 358-8875. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/7/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/18/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/15/2020. (smd)
October 18, 2019 Filing 12 Bankruptcy Transmittal of Designated Record to District Court re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal filed by Willie Jackson, Nina Jackson (Attachments: #1 Designation)(smd) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/18/2019: #2 Copy of Bankruptcy Docket Sheet) (jc).
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Rachel A. Washburn is permitted to appear before this Court on behalf of Appellees Le Centre on Fourth, LLC, Le Centre on Fourth Master Tenant, LLC, and the Al J. Schneider Company for all purposes relating to this action. The clerk is directed to provide Notice of Electronic Filings to Rachel A. Washburn at RWashburn@bgdlegal.com. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (bfk)
September 26, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Rachel A. Washburn. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-12015407 by Al J. Schneider Co., Le Centre on Fourth Master Tenant, LLC, Le Centre on Fourth, LLC. Responses due by 10/10/2019 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Robson, Grace)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. J. Mark Grundy is permitted to appear before this Court on behalf of Le Centre on Fourth, LLC, Le Centre on Fourth Master Tenant, LLC, and the Al J. Schneider Company for all purposes relating to this action. The clerk is directed to provide Notice of Electronic Filings to Mr. Grundy at MGrundy@bgdlegal.com. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (bfk)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. James R. Irving is permitted to appear before this Court on behalf of Le Centre on Fourth, LLC, Le Centre on Fourth Master Tenant, LLC, and the Al J. Schneider Company for all purposes relating to this action. The clerk is directed to provide Notice of Electronic Filings to Mr. Irving at JIrving@bgdlegal.com. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (bfk)
September 23, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for J. Mark Grundy. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-12005985 by Al J. Schneider Co., Le Centre on Fourth Master Tenant, LLC, Le Centre on Fourth, LLC. Responses due by 10/7/2019 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Robson, Grace)
September 23, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for James R. Irving. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-12005947 by Al J. Schneider Co., Le Centre on Fourth Master Tenant, LLC, Le Centre on Fourth, LLC. Responses due by 10/7/2019 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Robson, Grace)
September 4, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE. Unless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion shall be double-spaced in Times New Roman 12-point typeface. Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions. Failure to comply with ANY of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions, including but not limited to, the striking of the motion or dismissal of this action. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 9/4/2019. (jdo)
September 4, 2019 Filing 4 Clerk's Notice to Parties Re Administrative Order 2015-9 and Amendments to Federal Bankruptcy Rules and Local Rule 87.4 Re Processing of Bankruptcy Appeals (jc)
September 4, 2019 Filing 3 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Darrin P. Gayles. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jc)
September 4, 2019 Filing 2 Bankruptcy Transmittal of Notice of Appeal re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal filed by Willie Jackson, Nina Jackson (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet)(smd)
September 4, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT (received), Bankruptcy Court case number 17-23632-RBR, filed by Willie Jackson, Nina Jackson.(smd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson et al v. Le Centre on Fourth, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Willie Jackson
Represented By: Patrick S. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Nina Jackson
Represented By: Patrick S. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: United States Trustee
Represented By: Damaris Rosich-Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Le Centre on Fourth, LLC
Represented By: Grace E. Robson
Represented By: Damaris Rosich-Schwartz
Represented By: James R. Irving
Represented By: J. Mark Grundy
Represented By: Rachel A. Washburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Al J. Schneider Co.
Represented By: Grace E. Robson
Represented By: Damaris Rosich-Schwartz
Represented By: James R. Irving
Represented By: J. Mark Grundy
Represented By: Rachel A. Washburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Le Centre on Fourth Master Tenant, LLC
Represented By: Grace E. Robson
Represented By: Damaris Rosich-Schwartz
Represented By: James R. Irving
Represented By: J. Mark Grundy
Represented By: Rachel A. Washburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?