UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. HIRSCH
Petitioner: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Respondent: HEIDI M. HIRSCH
Case Number: 0:2019cv62203
Filed: September 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Federico A Moreno
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7402
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Filing 7 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Federico A. Moreno: Miscellaneous Hearing held on 10/8/2019. Court Reporter: Gilda Pastor-Hernandez, 305-523-5118 / Gilda_Pastor-Hernandez@flsd.uscourts.gov. (sc)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Closing Case. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 10/8/2019. See attached document for full details. (mmc)
October 7, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Diaz, Natalie)
October 2, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA of Filing Proof of Service of Order to Show Cause. Attorney Natalie Diaz added to party UNITED STATES OF AMERICA(pty:pet). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Diaz, Natalie)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order for Show Cause Hearing Set for 10/8/2019 02:00 PM in Miami Division before Judge Federico A. Moreno. Further, it is ORDERED that a copy of this Order, and Petition and Exhibits thereto, be personally served upon respondent, and that within five days of service, Respondent file a written response to the Petition. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 9/11/2019. See attached document for full details. (mmc)
September 4, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Federico A. Moreno. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ebz)
September 4, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION (Complaint) to Enforce IRS Summons . Filing fee $ 400.00. USA Filer - No Filing Fee Required, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet JS-44, #2 Exhibit A -A3, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Lindsey, Marilynn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. HIRSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Marilynn Koonce Lindsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: HEIDI M. HIRSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?