Dalembert v. United States of America, Department of Homeland Security
Defendant: Samuel Dalembert and United States of America, Department of Homeland Security
Case Number: 0:2019cv62250
Filed: September 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 18:0983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on U.S. Attorney General on 10/22/19; Answer due 12/23/19 by Samuel Dalembert. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Heitner, Darren) Modified text on 10/30/2019 (lk).
October 28, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by Samuel Dalembert. United States of America, Department of Homeland Security served on 10/22/2019, answer due 12/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Heitner, Darren)
October 17, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to U.S. CUSTOMS & BORDER PROTECTION, United States of America, Department of Homeland Security, by serving the U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Summon(s), #2 Summon(s))(lk)
October 11, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Samuel Dalembert (Attachments: #1 Summon(s), #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s)) (Heitner, Darren)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 10/11/2019. See attached document for full details. (ar2)
September 12, 2019 Filing 7 Clerks Notice of Filing Fee refunded to Darren Heitner in the amount of $47.00 on 09/12/2019 re 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case, (mua)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 9/10/2019. See attached document for full details. (ar2)
September 10, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Compliance of Filing Fees $400.00, receipt number 113C-11968152 re 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case, (Heitner, Darren)
September 10, 2019 Filing 4 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Summons(es) cannot be issued. The filing fee has not been paid (ar2)
September 10, 2019 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Insufficient filing fee paid. Filer must file a Notice of Compliance of Filing Fee and electronically pay the correct fees of $400.00 within 24 hours. A second attempt to open a case without incurring a new charge should be made by the next business day, if not - our Financial Department will refund the filing fees within 10 business days. Amount $47.00, receipt #113C-11967453, case filed date: 9/9/2019. (ar2)
September 9, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Beth Bloom. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ar2)
September 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee $ 47.00 receipt number 113C-11967453, filed by Samuel Dalembert. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Summon(s) 1, #6 Summon(s) 2, #7 Summon(s) 3, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Heitner, Darren) Modified text on 9/10/2019 (ar2).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dalembert v. United States of America, Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel Dalembert
Represented By: Darren Adam Heitner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America, Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?