Horowitz v. Advance Stores Company, Incorporated
Plaintiff: Marcus Horowitz
Defendant: Advance Stores Company, Incorporated and Discount Auto Parts, LLC
Case Number: 0:2019cv62267
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Cecilia M Altonaga
Referring Judge: Barry S Seltzer
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2019 Filing 21 Plaintiff's AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed in response to Order Granting Motion for Leave, filed by Marcus Horowitz.(Bolen, Rani)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 for Leave to Amend Complaint. Clerks Notice: Filer must separately re-file the amended pleading pursuant to Local Rule 15.1, unless otherwise ordered by the Judge. Plaintiff shall file his Amended Complaint for Damages - Jury Trial Demanded [ECF No. 19-1] as a separate docket entry by November 6, 2019 and shall perfect service on the newly added Defendant by November 15, 2019. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 11/5/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
November 4, 2019 Filing 19 Plaintiff's MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by Marcus Horowitz. Responses due by 11/18/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Amended Complaint, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Bolen, Rani)
October 16, 2019 Filing 18 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on 16 Clerks Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney, into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Marlene Quintana. (Bolen, Rani)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Scheduling Mediation before Marlene Quintana, Esq. Mediation Hearing set for 2/24/2020 10:00 AM. The parties are reminded that a report of their mediation must be filed within seven (7) days thereafter. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 10/16/2019. See attached document for full details. (wc)
October 16, 2019 Filing 16 Clerks Notice to Filer re #15 Notice (Other). Parties/Mediator Not Added; ERROR - The Filer failed to add all parties from the complaint/petition/removal, etc. or the mediator. Filer is instructed to file a Notice of Entry of Parties Listed into CM/ECF and add the additional parties/mediator. (cbr)
October 15, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE by Marcus Horowitz Joint Notice of Filing Proposed Order Scheduling Mediation (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Scheduling Mediation) (Bolen, Rani)
October 2, 2019 Filing 14 Plaintiff's REPLY to #8 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Marcus Horowitz. (Bolen, Rani)
September 25, 2019 Filing 13 Plaintiff's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Marcus Horowitz identifying Other Affiliate Karen Coolman Amlong, Other Affiliate Amlong & Amlong, P.A., Other Affiliate Rani Nair Bolen, Other Affiliate Rani Bolen, Attorney at Law, PLLC, Other Affiliate William R. Amlong for Marcus Horowitz (Bolen, Rani)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER that by 9/27/2019 Plaintiff, Marcus Horowitz, shall comply with the September 12, 2019 Order [ECF No. 4] by September 27, 2019. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 9/25/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PAPERLESS ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. No discovery motions shall be filed with the Court unless specifically authorized by Order. In the event a discovery dispute does arise, counsel are instructed to meet and confer in a good faith attempt to resolve the dispute. If, after conferring, the parties cannot resolve their discovery dispute, the movant must seek relief whin 14 days after the grounds for relief occur by contacting the undersigneds Chambers (954-769-5450) and scheduling a discovery hearing. The movant shall have first conferred with opposing counsel and obtained three alternative dates and times that both counsel are available for a hearing. The attorney or other person with knowledge who telephones the Court shall have the following information: (a) the nature of the discovery dispute; (b) the efforts made to confer with opposing counsel; and (c) three agreed upon dates for a hearing. The Court will then set the matter for hearing and order the parties to submit a joint status report on the issues. Where there has been a complete failure to respond to discovery, and where good faith efforts have been made (without success) to obtain that discovery, counsel need not obtain agreed upon dates, but shall so inform the Court telephonically of the issue, and the Court will set the matter for hearing. Finally, when the parties have stipulated to the entry of an order, such as stipulated confidentiality order, the parties shall not file a motion for entry of the stipulated order. Instead, counsel shall email to Chambers (seltzer@flsd.uscourts.gov) a copy of the proposed stipulated order in Word or WordPerfect format, with a statement that the parties have agreed to entry of the proposed order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer on 9/25/2019. (pb00)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Setting Trial and Pretrial Schedule, Requiring Mediation, and Referring Certain Matters to Magistrate Judge: Trial set for two week period beginning 7/6/2020 in Miami Division before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Calendar Call set for 6/30/2020 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Proposed order scheduling mediation, in Word format via email, due by 10/15/19; Mediation Deadline 3/16/2020. EFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 9/24/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
September 23, 2019 Filing 9 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Advance Stores Company, Incorporated (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baum, Leslie)
September 18, 2019 Filing 8 Defendant's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal by Advance Stores Company, Incorporated. (Baum, Leslie)
September 17, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Rani Nair Bolen on behalf of Marcus Horowitz. Attorney Rani Nair Bolen added to party Marcus Horowitz(pty:pla). (Bolen, Rani)
September 17, 2019 Filing 6 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Advance Stores Company, Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent Advance Auto Parts, Inc., a Delaware corporation, Other Affiliate Discount Auto Parts, LLC for Advance Stores Company, Incorporated (Baum, Leslie)
September 16, 2019 Filing 5 STATUS REPORT in Removal Case by Advance Stores Company, Incorporated (Baum, Leslie)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties to be filed by 9/24/2019. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 9/12/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
September 12, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Court Practice in Removal Cases; Removal Status Report due by 9/23/2019. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 9/12/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
September 11, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (mee)
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint for Damages - Jury Trial Demanded) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11975307, filed by Advance Stores Company, Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s) Exhibit 1 - Summons and Complaint, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5)(Baum, Leslie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Horowitz v. Advance Stores Company, Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcus Horowitz
Represented By: Rani Nair Bolen
Represented By: William Robert Amlong
Represented By: Karen Coolman Amlong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advance Stores Company, Incorporated
Represented By: Leslie Lagomasino Baum
Represented By: Neil David Kodsi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Discount Auto Parts, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?