Abercrombie & Fitch Trading Co. v. hollisteraustraliaonline.biz et al
Plaintiff: Abercrombie & Fitch Trading Co.
Defendant: guiglakatsarava.com, bpwhamm.de, hollistershopschweiz.com, kree8zoriginals.com, fajartotabuan.com, kbtrout.co.nz, pvcdemirdograma.com, stitchaholic.de, mfkapollo.se, natashacphotography.co.nz, anasewatenda.com, limeta.pl, hollisterhenley.se, vetklap.fr, akhbarmoufida.com, hollisterrebajas.es, sakasuantalya.com, fvo-boehlen.de, hcopolosaleau.com, repacom.es, demetrahotelrome.fr, abraj-news.com, tusvideoclips.com, vtvindonesia.com, giyimalisverissiteleri.com, hollisterturkiye.com, magasinhollister.fr, evdenevesikayet.com, jonathanthomas.se, studiomspinfit.com, vbulletin-mods.co.uk, ditchthealarmclock.com, stpaulsrcchurch.org.uk, zobal.se, andysdeliny.com, cfmt.fr, karpathosfm.com, carolinarailing.com, senihozay.com, hollistervintage.fr, snapschotts.co.uk, mintydj.com, hollistersverigehoodie.se, imagineatomic.com, enlineaes.com, hollisteronline.in, redhat20-cdg.com, moncoachetmoi.fr, armazenarbr.com, klussenier-renehaufe.de, horrorinthehammer.ca, vctconsultores.com, hollisterwebshop.com, karsserboyder.com, alexandrojack.com, alattastravel.com, zonapaytrenuym.com, hollisterpromo.fr, samsonind.com, hollistersale.fr, lighthouseinnovations.ca, thecraftofliving.com, hollistersverigebutiker.se, eshopoblecenie.com, hollisterzlavy.com, elitesse.pl, manskincare.co.uk, casanovoestilo.com, mendocinobirth.com, jordanbonser.com, wigwambakery.co.uk, portraiture.co.nz, achtungbeauty.com, ajerseysoccer.com, refere-backlink.fr, toshi-kabu.com, hollisterwebshopsverige.se, soyredactordigital.com, edesebedrijven.nl, handywaren.de, ibailuxuryworld.com, newarsaasingers.com, gujaratbirdclub.com, zenetbienetre.fr, hollisterberlin.de, bmjohnsonphoto.com, easysolutions.cz, cvzigoiy.xyz, simaghafaseh.com, melhoridadeaia.com, haberelestiri.com, ahangdoni.com, s-thielen.de, hollisteroutlettiendas.es, hollister-canadas.com, yeniyolpaslanmaz.com, ogorodniku.com, hollisterwebsite.co.uk, happyhoovesllc.com, mbsaechw.xyz, oaqservices.com, fullmoviec.com, sunairdeveloper.com, chenchen21.com, terresactives.com, cuddlecutscharlotte.com, tidlust.se, pizzeria-nancy.com, faulkeproperty.co.nz, nord-est-services.fr, nba-catclub.co.uk, narvacangov.com, thautango.fr, anakapallenews.com, ringathailand.se, mk1photography.co.uk, hollisterhenley.pl, yukselsentetik.com, rfabulousfoods.com, organicapremier.com, runeverywhere.fr, ulisesacosta.com, universunmondeencouleur.com, hollistersk.com, proffsteam.se, sabadeo.com, monolithdesigners.com, prediksilajubet.com, meteoryt.fr, moneyparati.com, mommieslife.nl, shalina.fr, enkelipuoti.fi, tk-ansagen.com, hollisteraustraliaonline.biz, city-repair.de, hollistersale.ch, banburyselfpick.co.uk, alquilernavesenvigo.com, tweultrawineracks.com, pestcontrolinnorthlondon.co.uk, vaninabanana.com, roupasportugal.com, rajatsynergygroup.com, hollisterstockholm.se, series-decoration.fr, silentarena.de, stopconduite91.com, drfish-spa.co.uk, therendleshamincident.co.uk, bevscraftworks.co.uk, hollistersale.it, best-essentialoils.com, modeblogueuse.fr, buyallwear.com, segodeporte.com, thermalkurhotel-quellenhof.de and decobol.fr
Case Number: 0:2019cv62280
Filed: September 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Roy K Altman
Referring Judge: Patrick M Hunt
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2019 Filing 36 FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENT AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION in favor of Abercrombie & Fitch Trading Co. against abraj-news.com, achtungbeauty.com, ahangdoni.com, ajerseysoccer.com, akhbarmoufida.com, alattastravel.com, alexandrojack.com, alquilernavesenvigo.com, anakapallenews.com, anasewatenda.com, andysdeliny.com, armazenarbr.com, banburyselfpick.co.uk, best-essentialoils.com, bevscraftworks.co.uk, bmjohnsonphoto.com, bpwhamm.de, buyallwear.com, carolinarailing.com, casanovoestilo.com, cfmt.fr, chenchen21.com, city-repair.de, cuddlecutscharlotte.com, decobol.fr, demetrahotelrome.fr, ditchthealarmclock.com, drfish-spa.co.uk, easysolutions.cz, edesebedrijven.nl, elitesse.pl, enkelipuoti.fi, enlineaes.com, eshopoblecenie.com, evdenevesikayet.com, fajartotabuan.com, faulkeproperty.co.nz, fullmoviec.com, fvo-boehlen.de, giyimalisverissiteleri.com, guiglakatsarava.com, gujaratbirdclub.com, haberelestiri.com, handywaren.de, happyhoovesllc.com, hcopolosaleau.com, hollister-canadas.com, hollisteraustraliaonline.biz, hollisterberlin.de, hollisterhenley.pl, hollisterhenley.se, hollisteronline.in, hollisteroutlettiendas.es, hollisterpromo.fr, hollisterrebajas.es, hollistersale.ch, hollistersale.fr, hollistersale.it, hollistershopschweiz.com, hollistersk.com, hollisterstockholm.se, hollistersverigebutiker.se, hollistersverigehoodie.se, hollisterturkiye.com, hollistervintage.fr, hollisterwebshop.com, hollisterwebshopsverige.se, hollisterwebsite.co.uk, hollisterzlavy.com, horrorinthehammer.ca, ibailuxuryworld.com, imagineatomic.com, jonathanthomas.se, jordanbonser.com, karpathosfm.com, karsserboyder.com, kbtrout.co.nz, klussenier-renehaufe.de, kree8zoriginals.com, lighthouseinnovations.ca, limeta.pl, magasinhollister.fr, manskincare.co.uk, melhoridadeaia.com, mendocinobirth.com, meteoryt.fr, mfkapollo.se, mintydj.com, mk1photography.co.uk, modeblogueuse.fr, mommieslife.nl, moncoachetmoi.fr, moneyparati.com, monolithdesigners.com, narvacangov.com, natashacphotography.co.nz, nba-catclub.co.uk, newarsaasingers.com, nord-est-services.fr, oaqservices.com, ogorodniku.com, organicapremier.com, pestcontrolinnorthlondon.co.uk, pizzeria-nancy.com, portraiture.co.nz, prediksilajubet.com, proffsteam.se, pvcdemirdograma.com, rajatsynergygroup.com, redhat20-cdg.com, refere-backlink.fr, repacom.es, rfabulousfoods.com, ringathailand.se, roupasportugal.com, runeverywhere.fr, s-thielen.de, sabadeo.com, sakasuantalya.com, samsonind.com, segodeporte.com, senihozay.com, series-decoration.fr, shalina.fr, silentarena.de, simaghafaseh.com, snapschotts.co.uk, soyredactordigital.com, stitchaholic.de, stopconduite91.com, stpaulsrcchurch.org.uk, studiomspinfit.com, sunairdeveloper.com, terresactives.com, thautango.fr, thecraftofliving.com, therendleshamincident.co.uk, thermalkurhotel-quellenhof.de, tidlust.se, tk-ansagen.com, toshi-kabu.com, tusvideoclips.com, tweultrawineracks.com, ulisesacosta.com, universunmondeencouleur.com, vaninabanana.com, vbulletin-mods.co.uk, vctconsultores.com, vetklap.fr, vtvindonesia.com, wigwambakery.co.uk, yeniyolpaslanmaz.com, yukselsentetik.com, zenetbienetre.fr, zobal.se, zonapaytrenuym.com. Closing Case. All deadlines and hearings areTERMINATED, and any pending motions are DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 10/28/2019. See attached document for full details. (jas)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting #34 Motion for Default Judgment. In accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 58, final judgment will be entered separately. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 10/28/2019. See attached document for full details. (jas)
October 28, 2019 Filing 34 Plaintiff's MOTION for Default Judgment Against Defendants by Abercrombie & Fitch Trading Co.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Virgilio Gigante in Support Thereof, #2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion for Entry Of Final Default Judgment, #3 Text of Proposed Order Final Default Judgment And Permanent Injunction)(Gigante, Virgilio)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER ON DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT PROCEDURE: ( Motion for default judgment due by 11/1/2019.) Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 10/25/2019. See attached document for full details. (lk)
October 24, 2019 Filing 32 Clerks Entry of Default as to abraj-news.com, achtungbeauty.com, ahangdoni.com, ajerseysoccer.com, akhbarmoufida.com, alattastravel.com, alexandrojack.com, alquilernavesenvigo.com, anakapallenews.com, anasewatenda.com, andysdeliny.com, armazenarbr.com, banburyselfpick.co.uk, best-essentialoils.com, bevscraftworks.co.uk, bmjohnsonphoto.com, bpwhamm.de, buyallwear.com, carolinarailing.com, casanovoestilo.com, cfmt.fr, chenchen21.com, city-repair.de, cuddlecutscharlotte.com, decobol.fr, demetrahotelrome.fr, ditchthealarmclock.com, drfish-spa.co.uk, easysolutions.cz, edesebedrijven.nl, elitesse.pl, enkelipuoti.fi, enlineaes.com, eshopoblecenie.com, evdenevesikayet.com, fajartotabuan.com, faulkeproperty.co.nz, fullmoviec.com, fvo-boehlen.de, giyimalisverissiteleri.com, guiglakatsarava.com, gujaratbirdclub.com, haberelestiri.com, handywaren.de, happyhoovesllc.com, hcopolosaleau.com, hollister-canadas.com, hollisteraustraliaonline.biz, hollisterberlin.de, hollisterhenley.pl, hollisterhenley.se, hollisteronline.in, hollisteroutlettiendas.es, hollisterpromo.fr, hollisterrebajas.es, hollistersale.ch, hollistersale.fr, hollistersale.it, hollistershopschweiz.com, hollistersk.com, hollisterstockholm.se, hollistersverigebutiker.se, hollistersverigehoodie.se, hollisterturkiye.com, hollistervintage.fr, hollisterwebshop.com, hollisterwebshopsverige.se, hollisterwebsite.co.uk, hollisterzlavy.com, horrorinthehammer.ca, ibailuxuryworld.com, imagineatomic.com, jonathanthomas.se, jordanbonser.com, karpathosfm.com, karsserboyder.com, kbtrout.co.nz, klussenier-renehaufe.de, kree8zoriginals.com, lighthouseinnovations.ca, limeta.pl, magasinhollister.fr, manskincare.co.uk, melhoridadeaia.com, mendocinobirth.com, meteoryt.fr, mfkapollo.se, mintydj.com, mk1photography.co.uk, modeblogueuse.fr, mommieslife.nl, moncoachetmoi.fr, moneyparati.com, monolithdesigners.com, narvacangov.com, natashacphotography.co.nz, nba-catclub.co.uk, newarsaasingers.com, nord-est-services.fr, oaqservices.com, ogorodniku.com, organicapremier.com, pestcontrolinnorthlondon.co.uk, pizzeria-nancy.com, portraiture.co.nz, prediksilajubet.com, proffsteam.se, pvcdemirdograma.com, rajatsynergygroup.com, redhat20-cdg.com, refere-backlink.fr, repacom.es, rfabulousfoods.com, ringathailand.se, roupasportugal.com, runeverywhere.fr, s-thielen.de, sabadeo.com, sakasuantalya.com, samsonind.com, segodeporte.com, senihozay.com, series-decoration.fr, shalina.fr, silentarena.de, simaghafaseh.com, snapschotts.co.uk, soyredactordigital.com, stitchaholic.de, stopconduite91.com, stpaulsrcchurch.org.uk, studiomspinfit.com, sunairdeveloper.com, terresactives.com, thautango.fr, thecraftofliving.com, therendleshamincident.co.uk, thermalkurhotel-quellenhof.de, tidlust.se, tk-ansagen.com, toshi-kabu.com, tusvideoclips.com, tweultrawineracks.com, ulisesacosta.com, universunmondeencouleur.com, vaninabanana.com, vbulletin-mods.co.uk, vctconsultores.com, vetklap.fr, vtvindonesia.com, wigwambakery.co.uk, yeniyolpaslanmaz.com, yukselsentetik.com, zenetbienetre.fr, zobal.se, zonapaytrenuym.com by Abercrombie & Fitch Trading Co. - Motions Terminated: #31 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default, Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 10/24/2019. (lk) Modified on 10/25/2019 - added names parties that did not appear in original docket entry (wc).
October 23, 2019 Filing 31 Plaintiff's MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to abraj-news.com, achtungbeauty.com, ahangdoni.com, ajerseysoccer.com, akhbarmoufida.com, alattastravel.com, alexandrojack.com, alquilernavesenvigo.com, anakapallenews.com, anasewatenda.com, andysdeliny.com, armazenarbr.com, banburyselfpick.co.uk, best-essentialoils.com, bevscraftworks.co.uk, bmjohnsonphoto.com, bpwhamm.de, buyallwear.com, carolinarailing.com, casanovoestilo.com, cfmt.fr, chenchen21.com, city-repair.de, cuddlecutscharlotte.com, decobol.fr, demetrahotelrome.fr, ditchthealarmclock.com, drfish-spa.co.uk, easysolutions.cz, edesebedrijven.nl, elitesse.pl, enkelipuoti.fi, enlineaes.com, eshopoblecenie.com, evdenevesikayet.com, fajartotabuan.com, faulkeproperty.co.nz, fullmoviec.com, fvo-boehlen.de, giyimalisverissiteleri.com, guiglakatsarava.com, gujaratbirdclub.com, haberelestiri.com, handywaren.de, happyhoovesllc.com, hcopolosaleau.com, hollister-canadas.com, hollisteraustraliaonline.biz, hollisterberlin.de, hollisterhenley.pl, hollisterhenley.se, hollisteronline.in, hollisteroutlettiendas.es, hollisterpromo.fr, hollisterrebajas.es, hollistersale.ch, hollistersale.fr, hollistersale.it, hollistershopschweiz.com, hollistersk.com, hollisterstockholm.se, hollistersverigebutiker.se, hollistersverigehoodie.se, hollisterturkiye.com, hollistervintage.fr, hollisterwebshop.com, hollisterwebshopsverige.se, hollisterwebsite.co.uk, hollisterzlavy.com, horrorinthehammer.ca, ibailuxuryworld.com, imagineatomic.com, jonathanthomas.se, jordanbonser.com, karpathosfm.com, karsserboyder.com, kbtrout.co.nz, klussenier-renehaufe.de, kree8zoriginals.com, lighthouseinnovations.ca, limeta.pl, magasinhollister.fr, manskincare.co.uk, melhoridadeaia.com, mendocinobirth.com, meteoryt.fr, mfkapollo.se, mintydj.com, mk1photography.co.uk, modeblogueuse.fr, mommieslife.nl, moncoachetmoi.fr, moneyparati.com, monolithdesigners.com, narvacangov.com, natashacphotography.co.nz, nba-catclub.co.uk, newarsaasingers.com, nord-est-services.fr, oaqservices.com, ogorodniku.com, organicapremier.com, pestcontrolinnorthlondon.co.uk, pizzeria-nancy.com, portraiture.co.nz, prediksilajubet.com, proffsteam.se, pvcdemirdograma.com, rajatsynergygroup.com, redhat20-cdg.com, refere-backlink.fr, repacom.es, rfabulousfoods.com, ringathailand.se, roupasportugal.com, runeverywhere.fr, s-thielen.de, sabadeo.com, sakasuantalya.com, samsonind.com, segodeporte.com, senihozay.com, series-decoration.fr, shalina.fr, silentarena.de, simaghafaseh.com, snapschotts.co.uk, soyredactordigital.com, stitchaholic.de, stopconduite91.com, stpaulsrcchurch.org.uk, studiomspinfit.com, sunairdeveloper.com, terresactives.com, thautango.fr, thecraftofliving.com, therendleshamincident.co.uk, thermalkurhotel-quellenhof.de, tidlust.se, tk-ansagen.com, toshi-kabu.com, tusvideoclips.com, tweultrawineracks.com, ulisesacosta.com, universunmondeencouleur.com, vaninabanana.com, vbulletin-mods.co.uk, vctconsultores.com, vetklap.fr, vtvindonesia.com, wigwambakery.co.uk, yeniyolpaslanmaz.com, yukselsentetik.com, zenetbienetre.fr, zobal.se, zonapaytrenuym.com by Abercrombie & Fitch Trading Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Stephen M. Gaffigan in Support of Request for Clerk's Entry of Default, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Gaffigan, Stephen)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER to Move for Entry of Default. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 10/22/2019. See attached document for full details. (ar2)
October 9, 2019 Filing 29 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Abercrombie & Fitch Trading Co. re #25 Order via Publication (Gaffigan, Stephen)
October 9, 2019 Filing 28 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Abercrombie & Fitch Trading Co. re #25 Order upon Defendants via Registrar (Gaffigan, Stephen)
October 9, 2019 Filing 27 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Abercrombie & Fitch Trading Co. re #25 Order upon Defendants via Electronic Mail (Gaffigan, Stephen)
October 9, 2019 Filing 26 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Abercrombie & Fitch Trading Co.. abraj-news.com served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; achtungbeauty.com served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; ahangdoni.com served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; ajerseysoccer.com served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; akhbarmoufida.com served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; alattastravel.com served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; alexandrojack.com served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; alquilernavesenvigo.com served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; anakapallenews.com served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; anasewatenda.com served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; andysdeliny.com served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; armazenarbr.com served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; banburyselfpick.co.uk served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; best-essentialoils.com served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; bevscraftworks.co.uk served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; bmjohnsonphoto.com served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; bpwhamm.de served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; buyallwear.com served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; carolinarailing.com served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; casanovoestilo.com served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; cfmt.fr served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; chenchen21.com served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; city-repair.de served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; cuddlecutscharlotte.com served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; decobol.fr served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; demetrahotelrome.fr served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; ditchthealarmclock.com served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; drfish-spa.co.uk served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; easysolutions.cz served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; edesebedrijven.nl served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; elitesse.pl served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; enkelipuoti.fi served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; enlineaes.com served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; eshopoblecenie.com served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; evdenevesikayet.com served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; fajartotabuan.com served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; faulkeproperty.co.nz served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; fullmoviec.com served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; fvo-boehlen.de served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; giyimalisverissiteleri.com served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; guiglakatsarava.com served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; gujaratbirdclub.com served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; haberelestiri.com served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; handywaren.de served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; happyhoovesllc.com served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; hcopolosaleau.com served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; hollister-canadas.com served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; hollisteraustraliaonline.biz served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; hollisterberlin.de served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; hollisterhenley.pl served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; hollisterhenley.se served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; hollisteronline.in served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; hollisteroutlettiendas.es served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; hollisterpromo.fr served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; hollisterrebajas.es served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; hollistersale.ch served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; hollistersale.fr served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; hollistersale.it served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; hollistershopschweiz.com served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; hollistersk.com served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; hollisterstockholm.se served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; hollistersverigebutiker.se served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; hollistersverigehoodie.se served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; hollisterturkiye.com served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; hollistervintage.fr served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; hollisterwebshop.com served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; hollisterwebshopsverige.se served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; hollisterwebsite.co.uk served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; hollisterzlavy.com served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; horrorinthehammer.ca served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; ibailuxuryworld.com served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; imagineatomic.com served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; jonathanthomas.se served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; jordanbonser.com served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; karpathosfm.com served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; karsserboyder.com served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; kbtrout.co.nz served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; klussenier-renehaufe.de served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; kree8zoriginals.com served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; lighthouseinnovations.ca served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; limeta.pl served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; magasinhollister.fr served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; manskincare.co.uk served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; melhoridadeaia.com served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; mendocinobirth.com served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; meteoryt.fr served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; mfkapollo.se served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; mintydj.com served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; mk1photography.co.uk served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; modeblogueuse.fr served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; mommieslife.nl served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; moncoachetmoi.fr served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; moneyparati.com served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; monolithdesigners.com served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; narvacangov.com served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; natashacphotography.co.nz served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; nba-catclub.co.uk served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; newarsaasingers.com served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; nord-est-services.fr served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; oaqservices.com served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; ogorodniku.com served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; organicapremier.com served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; pestcontrolinnorthlondon.co.uk served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; pizzeria-nancy.com served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; portraiture.co.nz served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; prediksilajubet.com served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; proffsteam.se served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; pvcdemirdograma.com served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; rajatsynergygroup.com served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; redhat20-cdg.com served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; refere-backlink.fr served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; repacom.es served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; rfabulousfoods.com served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; ringathailand.se served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; roupasportugal.com served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; runeverywhere.fr served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; s-thielen.de served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; sabadeo.com served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; sakasuantalya.com served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; samsonind.com served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; segodeporte.com served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; senihozay.com served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; series-decoration.fr served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; shalina.fr served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; silentarena.de served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; simaghafaseh.com served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; snapschotts.co.uk served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; soyredactordigital.com served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; stitchaholic.de served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; stopconduite91.com served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; stpaulsrcchurch.org.uk served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; studiomspinfit.com served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; sunairdeveloper.com served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; terresactives.com served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; thautango.fr served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; thecraftofliving.com served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; therendleshamincident.co.uk served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; thermalkurhotel-quellenhof.de served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; tidlust.se served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; tk-ansagen.com served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; toshi-kabu.com served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; tusvideoclips.com served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; tweultrawineracks.com served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; ulisesacosta.com served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; universunmondeencouleur.com served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; vaninabanana.com served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; vbulletin-mods.co.uk served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; vctconsultores.com served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; vetklap.fr served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; vtvindonesia.com served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; wigwambakery.co.uk served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; yeniyolpaslanmaz.com served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; yukselsentetik.com served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; zenetbienetre.fr served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; zobal.se served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; zonapaytrenuym.com served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of service, #2 Affidavit of service, #3 Affidavit of service)(Gaffigan, Stephen)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Granting #5 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 10/5/2019. See attached document for full details. (ar2)
October 2, 2019 Filing 24 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Roy K. Altman: Preliminary Injunction Hearing held on 10/2/2019 re #5 Plaintiff's EX PARTE MOTION for Entry of Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof filed by Abercrombie & Fitch Trading Co. Total time in court: 0 hours : 8 minutes. Court Reporter: Francine Salopek, 954-769-5686 / Francine_Salopek@flsd.uscourts.gov. (jrf)
October 2, 2019 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Abercrombie & Fitch Trading Co. re 20 Notice re Hearing via Publication (Wiborg-Rodriguez, T.)
October 2, 2019 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Abercrombie & Fitch Trading Co. re 20 Notice re Hearing upon Defendants via Registrar (Wiborg-Rodriguez, T.)
October 2, 2019 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Abercrombie & Fitch Trading Co. re 20 Notice re Hearing upon Defendants via Electronic Mail (Wiborg-Rodriguez, T.)
October 2, 2019 Filing 20 PAPERLESS NOTICE of Hearing: **TIME CHANGE ONLY** Preliminary Injunction Hearing reset for 10/2/2019 at 04:30 PM in Fort Lauderdale Division, Courtroom 207A before Judge Roy K. Altman. (jrf)
October 2, 2019 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Abercrombie & Fitch Trading Co. re 16 Notice re Hearing via Publication (Wiborg-Rodriguez, T.)
October 2, 2019 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Abercrombie & Fitch Trading Co. re 16 Notice re Hearing upon Defendants via Registrar (Wiborg-Rodriguez, T.)
October 2, 2019 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Abercrombie & Fitch Trading Co. re 16 Notice re Hearing upon Defendants via Electronic Mail (Wiborg-Rodriguez, T.)
October 2, 2019 Filing 16 PAPERLESS NOTICE of Hearing: **TIME CHANGE ONLY** Preliminary Injunction Hearing reset for 10/2/2019 at 03:00 PM in Fort Lauderdale Division, Courtroom 207A before Judge Roy K. Altman. (jrf)
September 30, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Abercrombie & Fitch Trading Co. re #4 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement, #3 Form AO 120/121, #10 Notice of Filing Proposed Summons(es), #7 Order on Ex Parte Motion,, #8 Order on Ex Parte Motion, 2 Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment,, #5 Plaintiff's EX PARTE MOTION for Entry of Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof, #1 Complaint, #6 Plaintiff's EX PARTE MOTION for Order Authorizing Alternate Service of Process on Defendants Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(f)(3) via Publication (Gaffigan, Stephen)
September 30, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Abercrombie & Fitch Trading Co. re #7 Order on Ex Parte Motion,, #5 Plaintiff's EX PARTE MOTION for Entry of Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof, #1 Complaint, upon Defendants via Registrar (Gaffigan, Stephen)
September 30, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Abercrombie & Fitch Trading Co. re #7 Order on Ex Parte Motion,, #5 Plaintiff's EX PARTE MOTION for Entry of Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof, #1 Complaint, upon Defendants via Electronic Mail (Gaffigan, Stephen)
September 25, 2019 Filing 12 Notice of Filing Bond posted by Abercrombie & Fitch Trading Co. Approved by Judge Roy K. Altman (ar2)
September 25, 2019 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to All Defendants listed in Schedule A. (lk)
September 24, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Abercrombie & Fitch Trading Co. re #8 Order on Ex Parte Motion, (Attachments: #1 Summon(s)) (Gigante, Virgilio)
September 24, 2019 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE of Compliance by Unsealing #5 , #6 pursuant to #7 Order (nc)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Granting #6 Ex Parte Motion for Order Authorizing Alternate Service of Process on Defendants Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(f)(3). Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 9/23/2019. See attached document for full details. (nc)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Granting #5 Ex Parte Motion for Entry of Temporary Restraining Order. Any response or opposition to the Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction must be filed and served on Plaintiff's counsel by 9/26/2019. Plaintiff shall file any Reply Memorandum on or before 9/30/2019. Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for Wednesday, 10/2/2019 02:00 PM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Roy K. Altman. The Clerk is directed to UNSEAL all docket entries in this case. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 9/23/2019. See attached document for full details. (nc)
September 16, 2019 Filing 6 Plaintiff's EX PARTE MOTION for Order Authorizing Alternate Service of Process on Defendants Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(f)(3) by Abercrombie & Fitch Trading Co.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Virgilio Gigante in Support Thereof, #2 Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Virgilio Gigante, #3 Text of Proposed Order) (Gigante, Virgilio) Modified by Unsealing Document per #7 Order on 9/24/2019 (nc).
September 16, 2019 Filing 5 Plaintiff's EX PARTE MOTION for Entry of Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof by Abercrombie & Fitch Trading Co.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Seth Wood in Support Thereof, #2 Declaration of Virgilio Gigante in Support Thereof, #3 Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Virgilio Gigante, #4 Text of Proposed Order) (Gigante, Virgilio) Modified by Unsealing Document per #7 Order on 9/24/2019 (nc).
September 16, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Abercrombie & Fitch Trading Co. identifying Corporate Parent Abercrombie & Fitch Co., Corporate Parent J.M.H. Trademark, Inc. for Abercrombie & Fitch Trading Co. (Gigante, Virgilio)
September 13, 2019 Filing 3 FORM AO 120 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. PATENT AND TRADEMARK (ar2)
September 13, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Roy K. Altman and Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ar2)
September 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Injunctive Relief And Damages against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11981335, filed by Abercrombie & Fitch Trading Co.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 to the Complaint - Certificates of Registration for the Abercrombie Trademarks, #3 Exhibit 2 to the Complaint - Website Captures)(Gaffigan, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abercrombie & Fitch Trading Co. v. hollisteraustraliaonline.biz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: guiglakatsarava.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: bpwhamm.de
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: hollistershopschweiz.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: kree8zoriginals.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: fajartotabuan.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: kbtrout.co.nz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: pvcdemirdograma.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: stitchaholic.de
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: mfkapollo.se
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: natashacphotography.co.nz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: anasewatenda.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: limeta.pl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: hollisterhenley.se
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: vetklap.fr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: akhbarmoufida.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: hollisterrebajas.es
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: sakasuantalya.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: fvo-boehlen.de
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: hcopolosaleau.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: repacom.es
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: demetrahotelrome.fr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: abraj-news.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: tusvideoclips.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: vtvindonesia.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: giyimalisverissiteleri.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: hollisterturkiye.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: magasinhollister.fr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: evdenevesikayet.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: jonathanthomas.se
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: studiomspinfit.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: vbulletin-mods.co.uk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ditchthealarmclock.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: stpaulsrcchurch.org.uk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: zobal.se
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: andysdeliny.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: cfmt.fr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: karpathosfm.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: carolinarailing.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: senihozay.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: hollistervintage.fr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: snapschotts.co.uk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: mintydj.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: hollistersverigehoodie.se
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: imagineatomic.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: enlineaes.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: hollisteronline.in
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: redhat20-cdg.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: moncoachetmoi.fr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: armazenarbr.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: klussenier-renehaufe.de
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: horrorinthehammer.ca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: vctconsultores.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: hollisterwebshop.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: karsserboyder.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: alexandrojack.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: alattastravel.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: zonapaytrenuym.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: hollisterpromo.fr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: samsonind.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: hollistersale.fr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: lighthouseinnovations.ca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: thecraftofliving.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: hollistersverigebutiker.se
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: eshopoblecenie.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: hollisterzlavy.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: elitesse.pl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: manskincare.co.uk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: casanovoestilo.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: mendocinobirth.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: jordanbonser.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: wigwambakery.co.uk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: portraiture.co.nz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: achtungbeauty.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ajerseysoccer.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: refere-backlink.fr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: toshi-kabu.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: hollisterwebshopsverige.se
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: soyredactordigital.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: edesebedrijven.nl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: handywaren.de
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ibailuxuryworld.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: newarsaasingers.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: gujaratbirdclub.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: zenetbienetre.fr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: hollisterberlin.de
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: bmjohnsonphoto.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: easysolutions.cz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: cvzigoiy.xyz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: simaghafaseh.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: melhoridadeaia.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: haberelestiri.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ahangdoni.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: s-thielen.de
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: hollisteroutlettiendas.es
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: hollister-canadas.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: yeniyolpaslanmaz.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ogorodniku.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: hollisterwebsite.co.uk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: happyhoovesllc.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: mbsaechw.xyz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: oaqservices.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: fullmoviec.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: sunairdeveloper.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: chenchen21.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: terresactives.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: cuddlecutscharlotte.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: tidlust.se
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: pizzeria-nancy.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: faulkeproperty.co.nz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: nord-est-services.fr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: nba-catclub.co.uk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: narvacangov.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: thautango.fr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: anakapallenews.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ringathailand.se
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: mk1photography.co.uk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: hollisterhenley.pl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: yukselsentetik.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: rfabulousfoods.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: organicapremier.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: runeverywhere.fr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ulisesacosta.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: universunmondeencouleur.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: hollistersk.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: proffsteam.se
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: sabadeo.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: monolithdesigners.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: prediksilajubet.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: meteoryt.fr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: moneyparati.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: mommieslife.nl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: shalina.fr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: enkelipuoti.fi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: tk-ansagen.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: hollisteraustraliaonline.biz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: city-repair.de
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: hollistersale.ch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: banburyselfpick.co.uk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: alquilernavesenvigo.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: tweultrawineracks.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: pestcontrolinnorthlondon.co.uk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: vaninabanana.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: roupasportugal.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: rajatsynergygroup.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: hollisterstockholm.se
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: series-decoration.fr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: silentarena.de
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: stopconduite91.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: drfish-spa.co.uk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: therendleshamincident.co.uk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: bevscraftworks.co.uk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: hollistersale.it
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: best-essentialoils.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: modeblogueuse.fr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: buyallwear.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: segodeporte.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: thermalkurhotel-quellenhof.de
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: decobol.fr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abercrombie & Fitch Trading Co.
Represented By: Stephen Michael Gaffigan
Represented By: T. Raquel Wiborg-Rodriguez
Represented By: Virgilio Gigante
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?