North Broward Hospital District v. Celtic Insurance Company
Plaintiff: North Broward Hospital District
Defendant: Celtic Insurance Company
Case Number: 0:2019cv62283
Filed: September 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Federico A Moreno
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Granting #6 Motion to Dismiss Without Prejudice. Closing Case. Motions Terminated: #6 Defendant's MOTION to Stay re #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), and MOTION to Compel Arbitration or, Alternatively MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Celtic Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 11/20/2019. See attached document for full details. (mmc)
September 27, 2019 Filing 8 STATUS REPORT (Removal) by Celtic Insurance Company (Pegg, Allen)
September 26, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Celtic Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Centene Corporation, Corporate Parent Celtic Group, Inc. for Celtic Insurance Company (Pegg, Allen)
September 26, 2019 Filing 6 Defendant's MOTION to Stay re #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), and ( Responses due by 10/10/2019), MOTION to Compel Arbitration or, Alternatively, MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM ( Responses due by 10/10/2019) by Celtic Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Pegg, Allen)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to a Complaint or Other Case Initiating Document Celtic Insurance Company. Answer due 9/26/2019. Re: #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), filed by Celtic Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 9/20/2019. (mmc)
September 18, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Court Practice in Removal Cases. Removal Status Report due September 27, 2019. Failure to file report by this date will result in remand. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 9/18/2019. See attached document for full details. (mmc)
September 18, 2019 Filing 3 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), by Celtic Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pegg, Allen)
September 13, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Federico A. Moreno. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (ebz)
September 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Amended Complaint for Damages) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11982171, filed by Celtic Insurance Company. No Motion to Dismiss and/or Answer has been attached. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - State Court Filings, #4 Exhibit C)(Pegg, Allen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: North Broward Hospital District v. Celtic Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: North Broward Hospital District
Represented By: Edward M. Harvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Celtic Insurance Company
Represented By: Craig Hamilton Smith
Represented By: Allen Paige Pegg
Represented By: James Leo VanLandingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?