Woodard v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Plaintiff: Damon Woodard
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 0:2019cv62289
Filed: September 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: William P Dimitrouleas
Referring Judge: Lurana S Snow
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Denying #12 Motion for Clarification. The Court denies a Certificate of Appealabilty. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 10/9/2019. See attached document for full details. (cds)
October 8, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for clarification #11 Order by Damon Woodard. Responses due by 10/22/2019 (Malove, Robert)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 FINAL JUDGMENT AND ORDER DISMISSING AND DENYING MOTIONS TO VACATE. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 10/8/2019. See attached document for full details. (cds)
October 8, 2019 Filing 10 FINAL JUDGMENT in favor of United States of America against Damon Woodard. The Court denies a certificate of appealability. Closing Case. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 10/8/2019. See attached document for full details. (cds)
September 26, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE to #4 Order, 7 Motion (Complaint) to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) by United States of America. (Shick, Alicia)
September 20, 2019 Filing 8 Clerks Notice to Filer re #6 Amended Complaint. Wrong Event Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. The document was re-docketed by the Clerk, see [de#7]. It is not necessary to refile this document. (cqs)
September 19, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED MOTION (Complaint) (FOR IMAGE SEE DE#6) to Vacate Sentence (2255). NOTE: All further docketing is to be done in the civil case. (Criminal Case # 18cr60065), filed by Damon Woodard.(cqs)
September 19, 2019 Filing 6 (SEE DE#7) AMENDED COMPLAINT 28 U.S.C. 2255 against UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, filed by Damon Woodard.(Malove, Robert) Modified on 9/20/2019 (cqs).
September 18, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alicia E. Shick on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Attorney Alicia E. Shick added to party UNITED STATES OF AMERICA(pty:dft). (Shick, Alicia)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER to defer ruling re #1 Motion (Complaint) to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) and #3 Supplemental Memorandum. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 9/16/2019. See attached document for full details. (cds) Modified text on 9/16/2019 (asl).
September 16, 2019 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM Re: Timeliness of Motion to Accept Motion to Vacate, Set Aside, or Correct Illegal Sentence re #1 Motion (Complaint) to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) by Damon Woodard. (cds) Modified title text on 9/16/2019 (asl).
September 16, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge William P. Dimitrouleas and Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow. (cds)
September 16, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION (Complaint) to Vacate, Set Aside Or Correct Sentence (2255) . NOTE: All further docketing is to be done in the civil case. (Criminal Case # 18cr60065), filed by Damon Woodard. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Re: Timeliness)(White, Charles) Text Modified on 9/16/2019 (cds).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Woodard v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Damon Woodard
Represented By: Charles Garret White
Represented By: Robert David Malove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Noticing 2255 US Attorney
Represented By: Alicia E. Shick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?