McCormack v. Caribbean Airlines Limited Co.
Plaintiff: Marjorie McCormack
Defendant: Caribbean Airlines Limited Co.
Case Number: 0:2019cv62359
Filed: September 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Rodney Smith
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PAPERLESS NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE ON NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT. THIS CAUSE is before the Court on the #8 Joint Notice of Settlement, which indicates that the parties have reached a settlement of all claims in this matter. Upon consideration, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file the appropriate dismissal documents in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41 by no later than December 9, 2019. Failure to comply with this Order may result in the final dismissal of this case. All pending motions not otherwise ruled upon are DENIED AS MOOT, all hearings including the trial are CANCELLED, and all deadlines are TERMINATED. This case is CLOSED. Motions terminated: #9 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to comply with scheduling order dated October 18, 2019 re #6 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report, filed by Marjorie McCormack. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 11/12/2019. (dco)
November 9, 2019 Filing 12 Second SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Marjorie McCormack (Fazio, Vivian)
November 9, 2019 Filing 11 First SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Marjorie McCormack (Fazio, Vivian)
November 8, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION by Marjorie McCormack re #7 MOTION for Settlement filed by Marjorie McCormack (Fazio, Vivian)
November 8, 2019 Filing 9 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to comply with scheduling order dated October 18, 2019 re #6 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report, by Marjorie McCormack. Responses due by 11/22/2019 (Fazio, Vivian)
November 8, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Settlement JOINT by Marjorie McCormack (Fazio, Vivian)
November 8, 2019 Filing 7 (WITHDRAWN PER DE#10) MOTION for Settlement by Marjorie McCormack. Responses due by 11/22/2019 (Fazio, Vivian)Text Modified on 11/8/2019 (cqs).
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REQUIRING JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT, CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES AND CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Joint Scheduling Report due by 11/8/2019. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 10/18/2019. See attached document for full details. (dco)
September 23, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Caribbean Airlines Limited Co., filed by Marjorie McCormack.(Fazio, Vivian)
September 23, 2019 Filing 4 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. The Clerks Office confirmed Broward (Office - Ft Lauderdale) as the county with the filer. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (cds)
September 23, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Caribbean Airlines Limited Co.. (cds)
September 23, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodney Smith. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (cds)
September 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Caribbean Airlines Limited Co.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-12005076, filed by Marjorie McCormack. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Fazio, Vivian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCormack v. Caribbean Airlines Limited Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marjorie McCormack
Represented By: Vivian Hattem Fazio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caribbean Airlines Limited Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?