Great American Insurance Company v. U.S. Stem Cell Clinic, LLC. et al
Plaintiff: Great American Insurance Company
Defendant: U.S. Stem Cell Clinic, LLC., Theodore Gradel and Kristin C. Comella
Case Number: 0:2019cv62373
Filed: September 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Jose E Martinez
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Change of Address by Alan Fiedel (Fiedel, Alan)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #18 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney(s) James K. Thurston. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 10/11/2019. (mws)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #20 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney(s) Erik J. Tomberg. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 10/11/2019. (mws)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #19 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney(s) Daniel E. Tranen. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 10/11/2019. (mws)
October 10, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Erik J. Tomberg, Esquire. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-12055214 by Great American Insurance Company. Responses due by 10/24/2019 (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Fiedel, Alan)
October 10, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Daniel E. Tranen, Esquire. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-12053678 by Great American Insurance Company. Responses due by 10/24/2019 (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Fiedel, Alan)
October 4, 2019 Filing 18 Amended MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for James K. Thurston, Esquire. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Amended/Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filed - Filing Fees Previously Paid. See #16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, by Great American Insurance Company. Responses due by 10/18/2019 (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Fiedel, Alan)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 PAPERLESS ORDER denying without prejudice #16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney James K. Thurston. Local counsel Mr. Fiedel is presently not permitted to practice law in Florida. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 10/4/2019. (mws)
October 4, 2019 Attorney James K. Thurston representing Great American Insurance Company (Plaintiff) Activated. (pt)
October 3, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for James K. Thurston, Esquire. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-12035986 by Great American Insurance Company. Responses due by 10/17/2019 (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Fiedel, Alan)
October 2, 2019 Filing 15 Certificate of Other Affiliates by Great American Insurance Company (Fiedel, Alan)
October 2, 2019 Filing 14 Clerks Notice to Filer re #13 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Parties Not Added; ERROR - The Filer failed to add all parties from the complaint/petition/removal, etc. or the mediator. Filer is instructed to file a Notice of Entry of Parties Listed into CM/ECF and add the additional parties. (jas)
October 2, 2019 Filing 13 First Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Great American Insurance Company (Fiedel, Alan)
October 2, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE by Great American Insurance Company re #11 Waiver of Service Executed, #10 Waiver of Service Executed (Fiedel, Alan)
October 2, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Great American Insurance Company. Kristin C. Comella waiver sent on 9/27/2019, answer due 11/26/2019. (Fiedel, Alan)
October 2, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Great American Insurance Company. U.S. Stem Cell Clinic, LLC. waiver sent on 9/27/2019, answer due 11/26/2019. (Fiedel, Alan)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Amended Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 9/25/2019. See attached document for full details. (dq)
September 25, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Kristin C. Comella, Theodore Gradel, U.S. Stem Cell Clinic, LLC.. (mc)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 9/25/2019. See attached document for full details. (dq)
September 25, 2019 Filing 6 Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Daniel E. Tranen, Erik J. Tomberg, James K. Thurston, mailing date September 25, 2019, (cco)
September 25, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) U.S. Stem Cell Clinic, LLC by Great American Insurance Company re #1 Complaint, filed by Great American Insurance Company (Fiedel, Alan)
September 25, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) Theodore Gradel by Great American Insurance Company re #1 Complaint, filed by Great American Insurance Company (Fiedel, Alan)
September 25, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) Kristin C. Comella by Great American Insurance Company re #1 Complaint, filed by Great American Insurance Company (Fiedel, Alan)
September 24, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Jose E. Martinez. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ebz)
September 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Great American Insurance Company against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00. Pay.gov Agency Tracking ID 113C-12009527, payment transferred from : 19CV62370, filed by Great American Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6)(Davis, Catherine) Modified text on 10/17/2019 to reflect correct case number (bb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Great American Insurance Company v. U.S. Stem Cell Clinic, LLC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Stem Cell Clinic, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theodore Gradel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristin C. Comella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Great American Insurance Company
Represented By: Alan Fiedel
Represented By: James K. Thurston
Represented By: Erik J. Tomberg
Represented By: Daniel E. Tranen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?