Intermedix Corporaton v. Urgent Care of Mountain View PLLC
Plaintiff: Intermedix Corporaton
Defendant: Urgent Care of Mountain View PLLC
Case Number: 0:2019cv62399
Filed: September 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Beth Bloom
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2019 Filing 14 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT as to #6 Order Remanding Case to State Court, #7 Transmittal Letter Sent (cds)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Denying as moot #12 Motion to Reopen Case. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 10/4/2019. See attached document for full details. (cds)
October 4, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Reopen Case by Urgent Care of Mountain View PLLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Notice o Removal)(Bridwell, Maegan)
October 4, 2019 Attorney Maegan Fay Bridwell terminated for Intermedix Corporaton. Maegan Fay Bridwell was incorrectly added as plaintiff's attorney. (jua)
October 3, 2019 Filing 11 Clerks Notice to Filer re #9 Notice (Other). Wrong Event Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. The document was re-docketed by the Clerk, see [de#10]. It is not necessary to refile this document. (cqs)
October 2, 2019 Filing 10 AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL(For image see DE#9) (STATE COURT COMPLAINT ) Filing fee $400.00, filed by Urgent Care of Mountain View PLLC.(cqs) Modified to correct the filer on 10/4/2019 (jua).
October 2, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE by Urgent Care of Mountain View PLLC re #5 Order, of Amended Notice of Removal (Bridwell, Maegan)
October 2, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by Urgent Care of Mountain View PLLC . Attorney Maegan Fay Bridwell added to party Urgent Care of Mountain View PLLC(pty:dft). (Bridwell, Maegan)
October 1, 2019 Filing 7 Transmittal Letter Sent with with Certified Copy of Order to: Seventeenth Judicial Circuit. State Court Case Number: CACE-19-017415 (cds)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Remanding Case to State Court Closing Case. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 10/1/2019. See attached document for full details. (cds)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REQUIRING AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL. ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that Defendant shall file an amended notice satisfying its burden of showing the existence of subject matter jurisdiction on or before September 30, 2019. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 9/26/2019. See attached document for full details. (cds)
September 26, 2019 Filing 4 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Beth Bloom. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (lk)
September 26, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Limited Attorney Appearance of Sean-Kelly Xenakis by Intermedix Corporaton (lk)
September 26, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Receipt for New Case received on 9/26/2019 in the amount of $ 400.00, receipt number #FLS000012244 (lk)
September 26, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - 19-017415-div-4) Filing fee $400.00 Receipt#: FLS000012244, filed by Intermedix Corporaton. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(lk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Intermedix Corporaton v. Urgent Care of Mountain View PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Intermedix Corporaton
Represented By: Scott Stephen Gallagher
Represented By: Maegan Fay Bridwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Urgent Care of Mountain View PLLC
Represented By: Sean-Kelly Xenakis
Represented By: Maegan Fay Bridwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?